EP2772668 - CONTROL DEVICE FOR VEHICULAR CONTINUOUSLY VARIABLE TRANSMISSION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.12.2016 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.12.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.01.2017 [2017/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1 Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi 471-8571 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2014/36] | For all designated states Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1 Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi 471-8571 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ISHIKAWA Shuhei c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1 Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi 471-8571 / JP | 02 /
KIMURA Motonori c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1 Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi 471-8571 / JP | 03 /
AYABE Atsushi c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1 Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi 471-8571 / JP | 04 /
TOYODA Shinya c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1 Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi 471-8571 / JP | [2014/36] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [2014/36] | Application number, filing date | 11874520.7 | 28.10.2011 | WO2011JP74980 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013061465 | Date: | 02.05.2013 | Language: | JA | [2013/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2772668 | Date: | 03.09.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 02.05.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.12.2015 | Classification | IPC: | F16H61/02 | [2014/36] | CPC: |
F16H61/66259 (EP,US);
F16H61/0204 (CN);
B60W10/101 (US);
B60W10/02 (US);
B60W2510/0208 (US);
B60W2520/105 (US);
B60W2710/1005 (US);
B60Y2300/18083 (EP,US);
F16H2061/0234 (CN);
F16H2061/6605 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/36] | Title | German: | STEUERVORRICHTUNG FÜR EIN STUFENLOSES GETRIEBE EINES FAHRZEUGES | [2014/36] | English: | CONTROL DEVICE FOR VEHICULAR CONTINUOUSLY VARIABLE TRANSMISSION | [2014/36] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE POUR TRANSMISSION À VARIATION CONTINUE DE VÉHICULE | [2014/36] | Entry into regional phase | 14.05.2014 | Translation filed | 14.05.2014 | National basic fee paid | 14.05.2014 | Search fee paid | 14.05.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.05.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.07.2013 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 14.05.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.05.2014 | Examination requested [2014/36] | 22.07.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/03] | 30.08.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2016 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS6253248 (FUJI HEAVY IND LTD) [A] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [A]DE3640157 (NISSAN MOTOR [JP]) [A] 1-6* the whole document *; | [AD]JP2003226166 (DAIHATSU MOTOR CO LTD) [AD] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [AD]JP2005163906 (FUJI HEAVY IND LTD) [AD] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [A]JP2009092208 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD) [A] 1-6 * the whole document * | International search | [Y]JPS6253248 (FUJI HEAVY IND LTD); | [Y]JPS62122834 (NISSAN MOTOR); | [A]JPH05322023 (MITSUBISHI MOTORS CORP); | [A]JP2005172010 (FUJI HEAVY IND LTD); | [Y]JP2009092208 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD) | by applicant | JP2003226166 | JP2005163906 |