EP2776621 - METHOD FOR LIGNIN SEPARATION FROM BLACK LIQUOR INVOLVING MULTIPLE ACIDIFICATION STEPS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.06.2017 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Valmet Aktiebolag 851 94 Sundsvall / SE | [2015/31] |
Former [2014/38] | For all designated states Valmet Power AB Box 8734 402 75 Göteborg / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WIMBY, Martin Flygtornsvägen 20 SE-423 36 Torslanda / SE | 02 /
SVENSSON, Mattias Själevadsgatan 16 891 32 Örnsköldsvik / SE | 03 /
WALLMO, Henrik Kyrkvägen 38 SE-441 60 Alingsås / SE | 04 /
ÖHMAN, Fredrik Murmästargatan 41 F SE-802 70 Gävle / SE | 05 /
TOMANI, Per Repslagarvägen 17 SE-141 41 Huddinge / SE | 06 /
ÅKERLUND, Lars-Erik Västervägen 35 1 tr SE-191 46 Sollentuna / SE | [2016/30] |
Former [2014/38] | 01 /
WIMBY, Martin Flygtornsvägen 20 SE-423 36 Torslanda / SE | ||
02 /
SVENSSON, Mattias Nygatan 19 SE-891 33 Örnsköldsvik / SE | |||
03 /
WALLMO, Henrik Kyrkvägen 38 SE-441 60 Alingsås / SE | |||
04 /
ÖHMAN, Fredrik Murmästargatan 41 F SE-802 70 Gävle / SE | |||
05 /
TOMANI, Per Repslagarvägen 17 SE-141 41 Huddinge / SE | |||
06 /
ÅKERLUND, Lars-Erik Västervägen 35 1 tr SE-191 46 Sollentuna / SE | Representative(s) | Andréasson, Ivar Hynell Intellectual Property AB Hammarbybacken 27 120 30 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/38] | Andréasson, Ivar Hynell Patenttjänst AB P.O. Box 138 683 23 Hagfors / SE | Application number, filing date | 11875496.9 | 11.11.2011 | [2016/30] | WO2011SE51360 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013070130 | Date: | 16.05.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2776621 | Date: | 17.09.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.05.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2776621 | Date: | 27.07.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 16.05.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.05.2015 | Classification | IPC: | D21C11/00, C08H8/00 | [2014/38] | CPC: |
D21C11/0007 (EP,US);
C08H6/00 (EP,US);
C08H8/00 (EP,US);
C08L97/005 (EP,US);
C08L2205/18 (EP,US);
Y02P40/40 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/38] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ABSCHEIDUNG VON LIGNIN AUS SCHWARZLAUGE MIT MEHREREN SÄUERUNGSSTUFEN | [2014/38] | English: | METHOD FOR LIGNIN SEPARATION FROM BLACK LIQUOR INVOLVING MULTIPLE ACIDIFICATION STEPS | [2014/38] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE SÉPARATION DE LA LIGNINE À PARTIR DE LIQUEUR NOIRE COMPRENANT DE MULTIPLES ÉTAPES D'ACIDIFICATION | [2014/38] | Entry into regional phase | 09.06.2014 | National basic fee paid | 09.06.2014 | Search fee paid | 09.06.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.06.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.06.2014 | Examination requested [2014/38] | 30.11.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.02.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.06.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 17.06.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.06.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.02.2016 | Opposition(s) | 02.05.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 11.11.2011 | AL | 27.07.2016 | BE | 27.07.2016 | CY | 27.07.2016 | CZ | 27.07.2016 | DK | 27.07.2016 | EE | 27.07.2016 | HR | 27.07.2016 | IT | 27.07.2016 | LT | 27.07.2016 | LV | 27.07.2016 | MC | 27.07.2016 | MK | 27.07.2016 | NL | 27.07.2016 | PL | 27.07.2016 | RO | 27.07.2016 | RS | 27.07.2016 | SI | 27.07.2016 | SK | 27.07.2016 | SM | 27.07.2016 | TR | 27.07.2016 | BG | 27.10.2016 | NO | 27.10.2016 | GR | 28.10.2016 | GB | 11.11.2016 | IE | 11.11.2016 | MT | 11.11.2016 | IS | 27.11.2016 | CH | 30.11.2016 | LI | 30.11.2016 | LU | 30.11.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/45] | HU | 11.11.2011 | |
BE | 27.07.2016 | ||
CY | 27.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 27.07.2016 | ||
DK | 27.07.2016 | ||
EE | 27.07.2016 | ||
HR | 27.07.2016 | ||
IT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LV | 27.07.2016 | ||
MC | 27.07.2016 | ||
MK | 27.07.2016 | ||
NL | 27.07.2016 | ||
PL | 27.07.2016 | ||
RO | 27.07.2016 | ||
RS | 27.07.2016 | ||
SI | 27.07.2016 | ||
SK | 27.07.2016 | ||
SM | 27.07.2016 | ||
TR | 27.07.2016 | ||
BG | 27.10.2016 | ||
NO | 27.10.2016 | ||
GR | 28.10.2016 | ||
GB | 11.11.2016 | ||
IE | 11.11.2016 | ||
MT | 11.11.2016 | ||
IS | 27.11.2016 | ||
CH | 30.11.2016 | ||
LI | 30.11.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
Former [2018/43] | HU | 11.11.2011 | |
BE | 27.07.2016 | ||
CY | 27.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 27.07.2016 | ||
DK | 27.07.2016 | ||
EE | 27.07.2016 | ||
HR | 27.07.2016 | ||
IT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LV | 27.07.2016 | ||
MC | 27.07.2016 | ||
MK | 27.07.2016 | ||
NL | 27.07.2016 | ||
PL | 27.07.2016 | ||
RO | 27.07.2016 | ||
RS | 27.07.2016 | ||
SI | 27.07.2016 | ||
SK | 27.07.2016 | ||
SM | 27.07.2016 | ||
BG | 27.10.2016 | ||
NO | 27.10.2016 | ||
GR | 28.10.2016 | ||
GB | 11.11.2016 | ||
IE | 11.11.2016 | ||
MT | 11.11.2016 | ||
IS | 27.11.2016 | ||
CH | 30.11.2016 | ||
LI | 30.11.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
Former [2018/30] | HU | 11.11.2011 | |
BE | 27.07.2016 | ||
CY | 27.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 27.07.2016 | ||
DK | 27.07.2016 | ||
EE | 27.07.2016 | ||
HR | 27.07.2016 | ||
IT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LV | 27.07.2016 | ||
MC | 27.07.2016 | ||
MK | 27.07.2016 | ||
NL | 27.07.2016 | ||
PL | 27.07.2016 | ||
RO | 27.07.2016 | ||
RS | 27.07.2016 | ||
SI | 27.07.2016 | ||
SK | 27.07.2016 | ||
SM | 27.07.2016 | ||
BG | 27.10.2016 | ||
NO | 27.10.2016 | ||
GR | 28.10.2016 | ||
GB | 11.11.2016 | ||
IE | 11.11.2016 | ||
IS | 27.11.2016 | ||
CH | 30.11.2016 | ||
LI | 30.11.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/51] | BE | 27.07.2016 | |
CZ | 27.07.2016 | ||
DK | 27.07.2016 | ||
EE | 27.07.2016 | ||
HR | 27.07.2016 | ||
IT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LV | 27.07.2016 | ||
NL | 27.07.2016 | ||
PL | 27.07.2016 | ||
RO | 27.07.2016 | ||
RS | 27.07.2016 | ||
SI | 27.07.2016 | ||
SK | 27.07.2016 | ||
SM | 27.07.2016 | ||
BG | 27.10.2016 | ||
NO | 27.10.2016 | ||
GR | 28.10.2016 | ||
GB | 11.11.2016 | ||
IE | 11.11.2016 | ||
IS | 27.11.2016 | ||
CH | 30.11.2016 | ||
LI | 30.11.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/43] | BE | 27.07.2016 | |
CZ | 27.07.2016 | ||
DK | 27.07.2016 | ||
EE | 27.07.2016 | ||
HR | 27.07.2016 | ||
IT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LV | 27.07.2016 | ||
NL | 27.07.2016 | ||
PL | 27.07.2016 | ||
RO | 27.07.2016 | ||
RS | 27.07.2016 | ||
SI | 27.07.2016 | ||
SK | 27.07.2016 | ||
SM | 27.07.2016 | ||
BG | 27.10.2016 | ||
NO | 27.10.2016 | ||
GR | 28.10.2016 | ||
IS | 27.11.2016 | ||
CH | 30.11.2016 | ||
LI | 30.11.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | BE | 27.07.2016 | |
CZ | 27.07.2016 | ||
DK | 27.07.2016 | ||
EE | 27.07.2016 | ||
HR | 27.07.2016 | ||
IT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LV | 27.07.2016 | ||
NL | 27.07.2016 | ||
PL | 27.07.2016 | ||
RO | 27.07.2016 | ||
RS | 27.07.2016 | ||
SI | 27.07.2016 | ||
SK | 27.07.2016 | ||
SM | 27.07.2016 | ||
BG | 27.10.2016 | ||
NO | 27.10.2016 | ||
GR | 28.10.2016 | ||
IS | 27.11.2016 | ||
CH | 30.11.2016 | ||
LI | 30.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/35] | BE | 27.07.2016 | |
CZ | 27.07.2016 | ||
DK | 27.07.2016 | ||
EE | 27.07.2016 | ||
HR | 27.07.2016 | ||
IT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LV | 27.07.2016 | ||
NL | 27.07.2016 | ||
PL | 27.07.2016 | ||
RO | 27.07.2016 | ||
RS | 27.07.2016 | ||
SK | 27.07.2016 | ||
SM | 27.07.2016 | ||
BG | 27.10.2016 | ||
NO | 27.10.2016 | ||
GR | 28.10.2016 | ||
IS | 27.11.2016 | ||
CH | 30.11.2016 | ||
LI | 30.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/32] | BE | 27.07.2016 | |
CZ | 27.07.2016 | ||
DK | 27.07.2016 | ||
EE | 27.07.2016 | ||
HR | 27.07.2016 | ||
IT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LV | 27.07.2016 | ||
NL | 27.07.2016 | ||
PL | 27.07.2016 | ||
RO | 27.07.2016 | ||
RS | 27.07.2016 | ||
SK | 27.07.2016 | ||
SM | 27.07.2016 | ||
BG | 27.10.2016 | ||
NO | 27.10.2016 | ||
GR | 28.10.2016 | ||
IS | 27.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/13] | BE | 27.07.2016 | |
HR | 27.07.2016 | ||
IT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LV | 27.07.2016 | ||
NL | 27.07.2016 | ||
PL | 27.07.2016 | ||
RS | 27.07.2016 | ||
NO | 27.10.2016 | ||
GR | 28.10.2016 | ||
IS | 27.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | BE | 27.07.2016 | |
HR | 27.07.2016 | ||
IT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LT | 27.07.2016 | ||
NL | 27.07.2016 | ||
PL | 27.07.2016 | ||
RS | 27.07.2016 | ||
NO | 27.10.2016 | ||
GR | 28.10.2016 | ||
IS | 27.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | IT | 27.07.2016 | |
LT | 27.07.2016 | ||
NL | 27.07.2016 | ||
NO | 27.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | LT | 27.07.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2006031175 (STFI PACKFORSK AB [SE], et al) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2010143997 (METSO POWER AB [SE], et al) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2008079072 (KIRAM AB [SE], et al) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A]GB664811 (SMITH PAPER MILLS LTD HOWARD) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2004074415 (LINDE AG [DE], et al) [A] 1-10 * the whole document * | [A] - DAVY M F ET AL, "Economic evaluation of black liquor treatment processes for incremental kraft pulp production", ANNUAL MEETING. TECHNICAL SECTION. CPPA, XX, XX, (19970128), pages 1 - 8, XP002993835 [A] 1-10 * the whole document * | International search | [A]WO2011037967 (LAKE MICHAEL A [US], et al); | [A]WO2009028969 (BIOJOULE LTD [NZ], et al); | [A]US4764596 (LORA JAIRO H [US], et al); | [A]US2008214796 (TOMANI PER [SE], et al); | [A]WO2004013409 (COFFIN WORLD WATER SYSTEMS [US], et al); | [A]US5777068 (TANAKA AKIRA [JP], et al) | by applicant | WO2006031175 | WO2006038863 | WO2010143997 | WO2011037967 | WO2009028969 |