EP2798596 - RANGE BASED USER IDENTIFICATION AND PROFILE DETERMINATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 28.06.2019 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.06.2019 | Refusal of application | published on 31.07.2019 [2019/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Intel Corporation 2200 Mission College Boulevard Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | [2014/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHUAPRASORT, Michelle, H. 13880 NW Hogan Street Portland, Oregon 97229 / US | 02 /
DURHAM, David, M. 2043 SW Tremont Way Beaverton, Oregon 97007 / US | 03 /
BOUCHER, Mark, D. 2057 Arrowood Lane San Jose, California 95130 / US | 04 /
BAKSHI, Sanjay 15222 NW red Cedar Ct. Portland, Oregon 97231 / US | [2014/45] | Representative(s) | Rummler, Felix Maucher Jenkins Seventh Floor Offices Artillery House 11-19 Artillery Row London SW1P 1RT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/45] | Rummler, Felix R.G.C. Jenkins & Co 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 11878617.7 | 30.12.2011 | WO2011US68039 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013101157 | Date: | 04.07.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2798596 | Date: | 05.11.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.07.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 04.07.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.07.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q30/02 | [2014/45] | CPC: |
G06Q30/02 (EP,US);
H04L63/0876 (US);
G06F21/35 (US);
G06Q10/10 (EP,US);
H04L67/306 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/45] | Title | German: | BEREICHSBASIERTE BENUTZERIDENTIFIKATION UND PROFILBESTIMMUNG | [2014/45] | English: | RANGE BASED USER IDENTIFICATION AND PROFILE DETERMINATION | [2014/45] | French: | IDENTIFICATION UTILISATEUR EN FONCTION D'UNE PORTÉE ET DÉTERMINATION DE PROFIL | [2014/45] | Entry into regional phase | 26.06.2014 | National basic fee paid | 26.06.2014 | Search fee paid | 26.06.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.06.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.06.2014 | Examination requested [2014/45] | 24.02.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.03.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.08.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.02.2019 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 27.02.2019 | 27.02.2019 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 13.03.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2019/31] | 23.03.2019 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2019/31] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.03.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2004128389 (KOPCHIK KURT [US]) [X] 1-9,13-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0004] , [0006] , [0016] , [0017] , [0020] , [0022] - [0024] - [0027] , [0029] , [0031] - [0032] - [0038] , [0042] , [0044] * [I] 10-12; | [A]US2006214773 (WAGNER JAMES D [US], et al) [A] 12* paragraph [0041] *; | [I]US2008256536 (ZHAO XIAOMING [CN], et al) [I] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0016] - [0018] - [0020] , [0025] , [0032] , [0036] , [0037] , [0043] - [0068] *; | [XI]US2011302297 (KRUGLICK EZEKIEL [US]) [X] 1,3,13-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0004] , [0006] , [0015] , [0017] , [0022] , [0024] , [0025] , [0027] , [0029] , [0030] , [0033] - [0035] - [0037] - [0048] - [0051] * [I] 2,4-12 | International search | [A]US2003114104 (WANT ROY [US], et al); | [Y]KR20070030355 (ICASH CORP.); | [Y]US2011047242 (SINHA RAJ [US]); | [A]KR20110096011 (JUNG YOUNG SUN [KR]) | by applicant | US2004128389 | US2008256536 | US2011302297 |