EP2797796 - SYSTEMS, METHODS, AND APPARATUS FOR CONTROLLING GESTURE INITIATION AND TERMINATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.03.2020 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.05.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.03.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.04.2020 [2020/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Intel Corporation 2200 Mission College Boulevard Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | [2014/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GRAUMANN, David, L. 4559 NW Silverleaf Drive Portland, OR 97229 / US | [2014/45] | Representative(s) | Goddar, Heinz J., et al Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/45] | Goddar, Heinz J., et al Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11879089.8 | 29.12.2011 | WO2011US67837 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013101058 | Date: | 04.07.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2797796 | Date: | 05.11.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.07.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 04.07.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.08.2015 | Classification | IPC: | B60W50/08, B60K28/02, G06F3/00, G06F3/01, G06F3/023, G06F3/03, B60K28/06, B60K37/06 | [2015/38] | CPC: |
B60W50/08 (EP,CN,US);
G06F3/04883 (US);
B60K28/02 (EP,CN);
B60K28/066 (EP,CN);
B60K35/10 (EP,CN,US);
B60K35/85 (EP,US);
G06F3/005 (CN,US);
G06F3/012 (CN,US);
G06F3/017 (EP,CN,US);
G06F3/023 (EP,CN,US);
G06F3/0304 (EP,CN,US);
B60K2360/145 (EP,CN,US);
B60K2360/146 (EP,CN,US);
B60K2360/1464 (EP,US);
B60K2360/21 (EP,CN,US);
|
Former IPC [2014/45] | B60W50/08, B60K28/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/45] | Title | German: | SYSTEME, VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR STEUERUNG VON GESTENINITIIERUNGEN UND -BEENDIGUNGEN | [2014/45] | English: | SYSTEMS, METHODS, AND APPARATUS FOR CONTROLLING GESTURE INITIATION AND TERMINATION | [2014/45] | French: | SYSTÈMES, PROCÉDÉS ET APPAREIL POUR COMMANDER UN DÉBUT ET UN ACHÈVEMENT DE GESTE | [2014/45] | Entry into regional phase | 16.06.2014 | National basic fee paid | 16.06.2014 | Search fee paid | 16.06.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.06.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.06.2014 | Examination requested [2014/45] | 07.03.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.05.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.09.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.05.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.11.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/18] | 20.12.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/18] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.05.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2019 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP2367140 (OMRON TATEISI ELECTRONICS CO [JP]); | [E]WO2013063767 (INTEL CORP [US], et al) | International search | [X]JP2009248629 (HITACHI LTD); | [A]US2009278915 (KRAMER KWINDLA HULTMAN [US], et al); | [A]US2010052931 (KOLPASKY KEVIN G [US], et al); | [X]JP2010184600 (AUTONETWORKS TECHNOLOGIES LTD, et al) |