EP2749095 - METHODS FOR DETERMINING A BEAM-FORMING GAIN PARAMETER, USER EQUIPMENT, BASE STATION, COMPUTER PROGRAMS AND COMPUTER PROGRAM PRODUCTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.12.2017 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 13.01.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL, IS | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | [2017/07] |
Former [2014/27] | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget L M Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIU, Weihong Room 28-5-501 Tiantongyuan Changping District Beijing 102218 / CN | 02 /
HU, Jia Room 3-201 Building 17 Longyuesanque Huilongguan, Changping District Beijing 102208 / CN | 03 /
HUANG, Licong No. 5 Lize East Street Chaoyang District Beijing 100102 / CN | [2014/27] | Representative(s) | Brann AB P.O. Box 3690 Sveavägen 63 103 59 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/07] | Brann AB P.O. Box 3690 Drottninggatan 27 103 59 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [2014/27] | Kühn, Friedrich Heinrich Ericsson AB Patent Unit Kista RAN 1 Torshamnsgatan 23 164 80 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 11879146.6 | 28.12.2011 | [2017/07] | WO2011CN84811 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013097111 | Date: | 04.07.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2749095 | Date: | 02.07.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.07.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2749095 | Date: | 15.02.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 04.07.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.09.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H04W52/42, H04W24/08, H04B7/06, H04B17/00 | [2014/44] | CPC: |
H04B17/309 (EP,US);
H04B7/0617 (EP,US);
H04W24/08 (EP,US);
H04B17/318 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2014/27] | H04W52/42, H04W24/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/27] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR BESTIMMUNG EINES STRAHLFORMUNGSVERSTÄRKUNGSPARAMETERS, BENUTZERVORRICHTUNG, BASISSTATION, COMPUTERPROGRAMME UND COMPUTERPROGRAMMPRODUKTE | [2014/27] | English: | METHODS FOR DETERMINING A BEAM-FORMING GAIN PARAMETER, USER EQUIPMENT, BASE STATION, COMPUTER PROGRAMS AND COMPUTER PROGRAM PRODUCTS | [2014/27] | French: | PROCÉDÉS POUR LA DÉTERMINATION D'UN PARAMÈTRE DE GAIN DE FORMATION DE FAISCEAU, ÉQUIPEMENT D'UTILISATEUR, STATION DE BASE, PROGRAMMES INFORMATIQUES ET PRODUITS PROGRAMMES D'ORDINATEUR | [2014/27] | Entry into regional phase | 24.03.2014 | National basic fee paid | 24.03.2014 | Search fee paid | 24.03.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.03.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.03.2014 | Examination requested [2014/27] | 17.10.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.02.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.08.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.10.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.12.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.12.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 15.12.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.12.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.10.2014 | Opposition(s) | 16.11.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.12.2011 | AL | 15.02.2017 | AT | 15.02.2017 | CY | 15.02.2017 | CZ | 15.02.2017 | DK | 15.02.2017 | EE | 15.02.2017 | ES | 15.02.2017 | FI | 15.02.2017 | HR | 15.02.2017 | IT | 15.02.2017 | LT | 15.02.2017 | LV | 15.02.2017 | MC | 15.02.2017 | MK | 15.02.2017 | NL | 15.02.2017 | PL | 15.02.2017 | RO | 15.02.2017 | RS | 15.02.2017 | SE | 15.02.2017 | SI | 15.02.2017 | SK | 15.02.2017 | SM | 15.02.2017 | TR | 15.02.2017 | BG | 15.05.2017 | NO | 15.05.2017 | GR | 16.05.2017 | IS | 15.06.2017 | PT | 15.06.2017 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 28.12.2011 | |
AT | 15.02.2017 | ||
CY | 15.02.2017 | ||
CZ | 15.02.2017 | ||
DK | 15.02.2017 | ||
EE | 15.02.2017 | ||
ES | 15.02.2017 | ||
FI | 15.02.2017 | ||
HR | 15.02.2017 | ||
IT | 15.02.2017 | ||
LT | 15.02.2017 | ||
LV | 15.02.2017 | ||
MC | 15.02.2017 | ||
MK | 15.02.2017 | ||
NL | 15.02.2017 | ||
PL | 15.02.2017 | ||
RO | 15.02.2017 | ||
RS | 15.02.2017 | ||
SE | 15.02.2017 | ||
SI | 15.02.2017 | ||
SK | 15.02.2017 | ||
SM | 15.02.2017 | ||
TR | 15.02.2017 | ||
BG | 15.05.2017 | ||
NO | 15.05.2017 | ||
GR | 16.05.2017 | ||
PT | 15.06.2017 | ||
Former [2019/51] | HU | 28.12.2011 | |
AT | 15.02.2017 | ||
CY | 15.02.2017 | ||
CZ | 15.02.2017 | ||
DK | 15.02.2017 | ||
EE | 15.02.2017 | ||
ES | 15.02.2017 | ||
FI | 15.02.2017 | ||
HR | 15.02.2017 | ||
IT | 15.02.2017 | ||
LT | 15.02.2017 | ||
LV | 15.02.2017 | ||
MC | 15.02.2017 | ||
MK | 15.02.2017 | ||
NL | 15.02.2017 | ||
PL | 15.02.2017 | ||
RO | 15.02.2017 | ||
RS | 15.02.2017 | ||
SE | 15.02.2017 | ||
SI | 15.02.2017 | ||
SK | 15.02.2017 | ||
SM | 15.02.2017 | ||
BG | 15.05.2017 | ||
NO | 15.05.2017 | ||
GR | 16.05.2017 | ||
PT | 15.06.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 28.12.2011 | |
AT | 15.02.2017 | ||
CY | 15.02.2017 | ||
CZ | 15.02.2017 | ||
DK | 15.02.2017 | ||
EE | 15.02.2017 | ||
ES | 15.02.2017 | ||
FI | 15.02.2017 | ||
HR | 15.02.2017 | ||
IT | 15.02.2017 | ||
LT | 15.02.2017 | ||
LV | 15.02.2017 | ||
MC | 15.02.2017 | ||
NL | 15.02.2017 | ||
PL | 15.02.2017 | ||
RO | 15.02.2017 | ||
RS | 15.02.2017 | ||
SE | 15.02.2017 | ||
SI | 15.02.2017 | ||
SK | 15.02.2017 | ||
SM | 15.02.2017 | ||
BG | 15.05.2017 | ||
NO | 15.05.2017 | ||
GR | 16.05.2017 | ||
PT | 15.06.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 28.12.2011 | |
AT | 15.02.2017 | ||
CZ | 15.02.2017 | ||
DK | 15.02.2017 | ||
EE | 15.02.2017 | ||
ES | 15.02.2017 | ||
FI | 15.02.2017 | ||
HR | 15.02.2017 | ||
IT | 15.02.2017 | ||
LT | 15.02.2017 | ||
LV | 15.02.2017 | ||
MC | 15.02.2017 | ||
NL | 15.02.2017 | ||
PL | 15.02.2017 | ||
RO | 15.02.2017 | ||
RS | 15.02.2017 | ||
SE | 15.02.2017 | ||
SI | 15.02.2017 | ||
SK | 15.02.2017 | ||
SM | 15.02.2017 | ||
BG | 15.05.2017 | ||
NO | 15.05.2017 | ||
GR | 16.05.2017 | ||
PT | 15.06.2017 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AT | 15.02.2017 | |
CZ | 15.02.2017 | ||
DK | 15.02.2017 | ||
EE | 15.02.2017 | ||
ES | 15.02.2017 | ||
FI | 15.02.2017 | ||
HR | 15.02.2017 | ||
IT | 15.02.2017 | ||
LT | 15.02.2017 | ||
LV | 15.02.2017 | ||
MC | 15.02.2017 | ||
NL | 15.02.2017 | ||
PL | 15.02.2017 | ||
RO | 15.02.2017 | ||
RS | 15.02.2017 | ||
SE | 15.02.2017 | ||
SI | 15.02.2017 | ||
SK | 15.02.2017 | ||
SM | 15.02.2017 | ||
BG | 15.05.2017 | ||
NO | 15.05.2017 | ||
GR | 16.05.2017 | ||
PT | 15.06.2017 | ||
Former [2018/14] | AT | 15.02.2017 | |
CZ | 15.02.2017 | ||
DK | 15.02.2017 | ||
EE | 15.02.2017 | ||
ES | 15.02.2017 | ||
FI | 15.02.2017 | ||
HR | 15.02.2017 | ||
IT | 15.02.2017 | ||
LT | 15.02.2017 | ||
LV | 15.02.2017 | ||
NL | 15.02.2017 | ||
PL | 15.02.2017 | ||
RO | 15.02.2017 | ||
RS | 15.02.2017 | ||
SE | 15.02.2017 | ||
SI | 15.02.2017 | ||
SK | 15.02.2017 | ||
SM | 15.02.2017 | ||
BG | 15.05.2017 | ||
NO | 15.05.2017 | ||
GR | 16.05.2017 | ||
PT | 15.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | AT | 15.02.2017 | |
CZ | 15.02.2017 | ||
DK | 15.02.2017 | ||
EE | 15.02.2017 | ||
ES | 15.02.2017 | ||
FI | 15.02.2017 | ||
HR | 15.02.2017 | ||
IT | 15.02.2017 | ||
LT | 15.02.2017 | ||
LV | 15.02.2017 | ||
NL | 15.02.2017 | ||
PL | 15.02.2017 | ||
RO | 15.02.2017 | ||
RS | 15.02.2017 | ||
SE | 15.02.2017 | ||
SK | 15.02.2017 | ||
SM | 15.02.2017 | ||
BG | 15.05.2017 | ||
NO | 15.05.2017 | ||
GR | 16.05.2017 | ||
PT | 15.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 15.02.2017 | |
CZ | 15.02.2017 | ||
DK | 15.02.2017 | ||
EE | 15.02.2017 | ||
ES | 15.02.2017 | ||
FI | 15.02.2017 | ||
HR | 15.02.2017 | ||
IT | 15.02.2017 | ||
LT | 15.02.2017 | ||
LV | 15.02.2017 | ||
NL | 15.02.2017 | ||
PL | 15.02.2017 | ||
RO | 15.02.2017 | ||
RS | 15.02.2017 | ||
SE | 15.02.2017 | ||
SK | 15.02.2017 | ||
BG | 15.05.2017 | ||
NO | 15.05.2017 | ||
GR | 16.05.2017 | ||
PT | 15.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 15.02.2017 | |
CZ | 15.02.2017 | ||
EE | 15.02.2017 | ||
ES | 15.02.2017 | ||
FI | 15.02.2017 | ||
HR | 15.02.2017 | ||
IT | 15.02.2017 | ||
LT | 15.02.2017 | ||
LV | 15.02.2017 | ||
NL | 15.02.2017 | ||
RO | 15.02.2017 | ||
RS | 15.02.2017 | ||
SE | 15.02.2017 | ||
SK | 15.02.2017 | ||
BG | 15.05.2017 | ||
NO | 15.05.2017 | ||
GR | 16.05.2017 | ||
PT | 15.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/48] | AT | 15.02.2017 | |
CZ | 15.02.2017 | ||
ES | 15.02.2017 | ||
FI | 15.02.2017 | ||
HR | 15.02.2017 | ||
LT | 15.02.2017 | ||
LV | 15.02.2017 | ||
NL | 15.02.2017 | ||
RS | 15.02.2017 | ||
SE | 15.02.2017 | ||
BG | 15.05.2017 | ||
NO | 15.05.2017 | ||
GR | 16.05.2017 | ||
PT | 15.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/41] | AT | 15.02.2017 | |
ES | 15.02.2017 | ||
FI | 15.02.2017 | ||
HR | 15.02.2017 | ||
LT | 15.02.2017 | ||
LV | 15.02.2017 | ||
NL | 15.02.2017 | ||
RS | 15.02.2017 | ||
SE | 15.02.2017 | ||
BG | 15.05.2017 | ||
NO | 15.05.2017 | ||
GR | 16.05.2017 | ||
PT | 15.06.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US2008031387 (SHIN YOUNG-WON [KR], et al) [X] 1-9 * abstract * * paragraph [0076]; figure 8 * * claims 1,4 * [Y] 10-18; | [YA] - QUALCOMM INCORPORATED, "Physical Layer Design Considerations for CLTD", 3GPP DRAFT; R1-110118_PHY_LAYER_DESIGN_CONSIDERATIONS_CLTD, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20110111), vol. RAN WG1, no. Dublin, Ireland; 20110117, XP050490082 [Y] 10-18 * section 3.2.1 "Dynamic Enabling and Disabling of CLTD operation via HS-SCCH orders" * [A] 1-9 | International search | [X]CN101527964 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD); | [A]CN101741445 (ZTE CORP); | [A]CN101902298 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD); | [A]US2011280333 (YANG LIN [US], et al) | Examination | US2011261868 |