EP2461203 - Image presentation and micro-optic security system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 25.12.2020 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.11.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.12.2020 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 27.01.2021 [2021/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Visual Physics, LLC 1245 Old Alpharetta Road Alpharetta, GA 30005 / US | [2012/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Steenblik, Richard, A. PMB 244 POB 223300 Princeville, HI 96722 / US | 02 /
Hurt, Mark, J. 2241 Makana Ano Place Kilauea, HI 96754 / US | 03 /
Jordan, Gregory, R. 1520 Dunn Road Cumming, GA 30040 / US | [2013/40] |
Former [2012/23] | 01 /
Steenblik, Richard, A. PMB 244 POB 223300 Princeville, HI 96722 / US | ||
02 /
Hurt, Mark, J. 3816 Tumberry Court Duluth, GA 30096 / US | |||
03 /
Jordan, Gregory, R. 1520 Dunn Road Cumming, GA 30040 / US | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2017/50] |
Former [2012/23] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12000103.7 | 18.05.2006 | [2012/23] | Priority number, date | US20050682231P | 18.05.2005 Original published format: US 682231 P | US20050683037P | 20.05.2005 Original published format: US 683037 P | [2012/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2461203 | Date: | 06.06.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/23] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2461203 | Date: | 09.01.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2461203 | Date: | 13.12.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/50] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP2461203 | Date: | 27.01.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.12.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G02B27/10, B42D15/00, B42D25/30, B42D25/29, B42D25/342 | [2017/36] | CPC: |
B42D25/324 (EP,US);
G02B27/10 (KR);
B42D25/29 (US);
B42D25/328 (EP,US);
B42D25/342 (US);
B42D25/351 (EP);
B42D25/355 (EP,US);
B42D25/36 (EP);
B42D25/369 (EP);
B42D25/373 (EP);
B42D25/378 (EP);
B42D25/391 (EP,US);
B42D25/425 (EP,US);
B42D25/43 (EP,US);
G02B30/27 (EP,US);
G03H1/0244 (EP,US);
B42D2033/10 (EP);
B42D2033/16 (EP);
B42D2033/18 (EP);
B42D2033/20 (EP);
B42D2033/24 (EP);
B42D2035/08 (EP);
B42D2035/20 (EP);
B42D2035/26 (EP);
B42D2035/36 (EP);
B42D2035/44 (EP);
B42D25/382 (EP,US);
B42D25/387 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2012/23] | G02B27/10, B42D15/00, B42D15/10, D21C9/10 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2012/23] | Title | German: | Bilddarstellung und mikrooptisches Sicherheitssystem | [2012/23] | English: | Image presentation and micro-optic security system | [2012/23] | French: | Présentation d'images et système de sécurité micro-optique | [2012/23] | Examination procedure | 10.01.2012 | Examination requested [2012/23] | 19.06.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.02.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.05.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.07.2017 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 06.07.2017 | 06.07.2017 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 22.09.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.11.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 03.11.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.11.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP06784452.2 / EP1893074 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20060784452) is 21.07.2011 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
13.09.2018
18.09.2017
ADMISSIBLE Giesecke+Devrient Currency Technology GmbH Prinzregentenstraße 159 81677 München / DE | [2019/07] |
Former [2018/43] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
13.09.2018
18.09.2017
ADMISSIBLE Giesecke+Devrient Currency Technology GmbH Prinzregentenstraße 159 81677 München / DE Opponent's representative Hackel, Stefanie Giesecke+Devrient Currency Technology GmbH Patent- und Lizenzabteilung Prinzregentenstraße 159 DE-81677 München / DE | 25.09.2018 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 31.01.2019 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 11.02.2020 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 11.02.2020 | Date of oral proceedings | 06.04.2020 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 06.04.2020 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 06.10.2020 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 21.12.2020 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 30.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 29.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 18.05.2006 | CY | 13.12.2017 | CZ | 13.12.2017 | DK | 13.12.2017 | EE | 13.12.2017 | FI | 13.12.2017 | LT | 13.12.2017 | LV | 13.12.2017 | MC | 13.12.2017 | PL | 13.12.2017 | PT | 13.12.2017 | RO | 13.12.2017 | SI | 13.12.2017 | SK | 13.12.2017 | TR | 13.12.2017 | BG | 13.03.2018 | GR | 14.03.2018 | IS | 13.04.2018 | IE | 18.05.2018 | LU | 18.05.2018 | BE | 31.05.2018 | [2020/27] |
Former [2020/16] | CY | 13.12.2017 | |
CZ | 13.12.2017 | ||
DK | 13.12.2017 | ||
EE | 13.12.2017 | ||
FI | 13.12.2017 | ||
LT | 13.12.2017 | ||
LV | 13.12.2017 | ||
MC | 13.12.2017 | ||
PL | 13.12.2017 | ||
RO | 13.12.2017 | ||
SI | 13.12.2017 | ||
SK | 13.12.2017 | ||
TR | 13.12.2017 | ||
BG | 13.03.2018 | ||
GR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IS | 13.04.2018 | ||
IE | 18.05.2018 | ||
LU | 18.05.2018 | ||
BE | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/24] | CY | 13.12.2017 | |
CZ | 13.12.2017 | ||
DK | 13.12.2017 | ||
EE | 13.12.2017 | ||
FI | 13.12.2017 | ||
LT | 13.12.2017 | ||
LV | 13.12.2017 | ||
MC | 13.12.2017 | ||
PL | 13.12.2017 | ||
RO | 13.12.2017 | ||
SI | 13.12.2017 | ||
SK | 13.12.2017 | ||
BG | 13.03.2018 | ||
GR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IS | 13.04.2018 | ||
IE | 18.05.2018 | ||
LU | 18.05.2018 | ||
BE | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/19] | CY | 13.12.2017 | |
CZ | 13.12.2017 | ||
DK | 13.12.2017 | ||
EE | 13.12.2017 | ||
FI | 13.12.2017 | ||
LT | 13.12.2017 | ||
LV | 13.12.2017 | ||
MC | 13.12.2017 | ||
PL | 13.12.2017 | ||
RO | 13.12.2017 | ||
SI | 13.12.2017 | ||
SK | 13.12.2017 | ||
BG | 13.03.2018 | ||
GR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IS | 13.04.2018 | ||
IE | 18.05.2018 | ||
LU | 18.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/17] | CY | 13.12.2017 | |
CZ | 13.12.2017 | ||
DK | 13.12.2017 | ||
EE | 13.12.2017 | ||
FI | 13.12.2017 | ||
LT | 13.12.2017 | ||
LV | 13.12.2017 | ||
MC | 13.12.2017 | ||
PL | 13.12.2017 | ||
RO | 13.12.2017 | ||
SI | 13.12.2017 | ||
SK | 13.12.2017 | ||
BG | 13.03.2018 | ||
GR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IS | 13.04.2018 | ||
LU | 18.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/13] | CY | 13.12.2017 | |
CZ | 13.12.2017 | ||
DK | 13.12.2017 | ||
EE | 13.12.2017 | ||
FI | 13.12.2017 | ||
LT | 13.12.2017 | ||
LV | 13.12.2017 | ||
MC | 13.12.2017 | ||
PL | 13.12.2017 | ||
RO | 13.12.2017 | ||
SI | 13.12.2017 | ||
SK | 13.12.2017 | ||
BG | 13.03.2018 | ||
GR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IS | 13.04.2018 | ||
Former [2019/06] | CY | 13.12.2017 | |
CZ | 13.12.2017 | ||
DK | 13.12.2017 | ||
EE | 13.12.2017 | ||
FI | 13.12.2017 | ||
LT | 13.12.2017 | ||
LV | 13.12.2017 | ||
MC | 13.12.2017 | ||
PL | 13.12.2017 | ||
RO | 13.12.2017 | ||
SK | 13.12.2017 | ||
BG | 13.03.2018 | ||
GR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IS | 13.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | CY | 13.12.2017 | |
CZ | 13.12.2017 | ||
DK | 13.12.2017 | ||
EE | 13.12.2017 | ||
FI | 13.12.2017 | ||
LT | 13.12.2017 | ||
LV | 13.12.2017 | ||
PL | 13.12.2017 | ||
RO | 13.12.2017 | ||
SK | 13.12.2017 | ||
BG | 13.03.2018 | ||
GR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IS | 13.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/41] | CY | 13.12.2017 | |
CZ | 13.12.2017 | ||
EE | 13.12.2017 | ||
FI | 13.12.2017 | ||
LT | 13.12.2017 | ||
LV | 13.12.2017 | ||
PL | 13.12.2017 | ||
RO | 13.12.2017 | ||
SK | 13.12.2017 | ||
BG | 13.03.2018 | ||
GR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IS | 13.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/38] | CY | 13.12.2017 | |
CZ | 13.12.2017 | ||
EE | 13.12.2017 | ||
FI | 13.12.2017 | ||
LT | 13.12.2017 | ||
LV | 13.12.2017 | ||
PL | 13.12.2017 | ||
SK | 13.12.2017 | ||
BG | 13.03.2018 | ||
GR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IS | 13.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | CY | 13.12.2017 | |
CZ | 13.12.2017 | ||
EE | 13.12.2017 | ||
FI | 13.12.2017 | ||
LT | 13.12.2017 | ||
LV | 13.12.2017 | ||
PL | 13.12.2017 | ||
SK | 13.12.2017 | ||
BG | 13.03.2018 | ||
GR | 14.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/26] | FI | 13.12.2017 | |
LT | 13.12.2017 | ||
LV | 13.12.2017 | ||
BG | 13.03.2018 | ||
GR | 14.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/23] | FI | 13.12.2017 | |
LT | 13.12.2017 | ||
GR | 14.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/22] | FI | 13.12.2017 | |
LT | 13.12.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0090130 (SCHWARZ KLAUS BILLETT AUTOMAT [DE]) [Y] 10 * page 2, line 4 - line 20; figure 1 * * page 3, line 5 - line 10 * * page 4, line 34 - page 5, line 15 *; | [Y]US4417784 (KNOP KARL H [CH], et al) [Y] 9 * abstract * * column 1, line 6 - line 15 * * column 2, line 43 - line 56 * * column 4, line 64 - column 5, line 59 *; | [Y]US4662651 (MOWRY JR WILLIAM H [US]) [Y] 10 * abstract ** column 1, line 28 - column 2, line 24 *; | [Y]US5085514 (MALLIK DONALD W [US], et al) [Y] 5 * column 3, line 46 - column 4, line 3; figures 1-4,13 * * column 4, line 28 - line 35 * * column 4, line 59 - line 65 * * column 5, line 36 - line 49 * * column 7, line 50 - line 62 * * column 8, line 40 - line 62 *; | [Y]US6060143 (TOMPKIN WAYNE ROBERT [CH], et al) [Y] 8 * column 3, lines 1-37; figures 3-5-16 * * column 4, line 37 - column 5, line 9 * * column 6, line 9 - column 8, line 20 *; | [Y]GB2362493 (FLOATING IMAGES LTD [GB]) [Y] 6 * abstract * * pages 2-3 *; | [XYI]WO03061983 (NANOVENTIONS INC [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4,11-15 * abstract * * page 2, line 1 - line 15 * * page 5, line 24 - page 6, line 15 * * page 13, line 1 - page 14, line 13 * * page 15, line 29 - line 30 * * page 17, line 29 - page 18, line 12 * * page 31, line 15 - page 32, line 15 * * page 33, line 29 - page 34, line 12 * [Y] 5,7-10 [I] 3; | [Y]WO03061980 (RUE DE INT LTD [GB], et al) [Y] 8 * page 4, line 10 - line 31; figure 7; claims 10-12,20 * * page 8, line 19 - line 26 * * page 11, line 11 - page 12, line 34 *; | [Y]US6712399 (DRINKWATER KENNETH JOHN [GB], et al) [Y] 7,9 * abstract * * column 1, lines 9-22 * * column 2, line 66 - column 5, line 67 *; | [Y]JP2004262144 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD) [Y] 5 * abstract * * paragraph [0020] *; | [XPL]US2005180020 (STEENBLIK RICHARD A [US], et al) [XP] 1-15 * paragraphs [0082] , [0083] , [0087] , [0114] , [0126] , [0132] , [0144] , [0145] , [0180] , [0190] , [0191] , [0193]; figures 1a,7a-7c,8a,8b,9,16a-16f; claim 2 * * paragraphs [0218] - [0222] * [L] 1-15; | [XYI] - GALE M T ET AL, "MICRO OPTICS - Chap. 6 : Replication", MICRO-OPTICS: ELEMENTS, SYSTEMS AND APPLICATIONS, XX, XX, (19970101), pages 153 - 177, XP002322732 [X] 1,2,4,11-13 * pages 153,157; figures 6.1,6.2,6.11,6.16,6.17 * * page 169 - page 172 * [Y] 6-10 [I] 14 | [AP] - LEECH P W ET AL, "Printing via hot embossing of optically variable images in thermoplastic acrylic lacquer", MICROELECTRONIC ENGINEERING, ELSEVIER PUBLISHERS BV., AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 83, no. 10, doi:10.1016/J.MEE.2006.02.001, ISSN 0167-9317, (20061001), pages 1961 - 1965, (20061001), XP024954844 [AP] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.mee.2006.02.001 | [Y] - KAMAL H ET AL, "PROPERTIES OF MOIRE MAGNIFIERS", OPTICAL ENGINEERING, SOC. OF PHOTO-OPTICAL INSTRUMENTATION ENGINEERS, BELLINGHAM, (19981101), vol. 37, no. 11, doi:10.1117/1.601889, ISSN 0091-3286, pages 3007 - 3014, XP000788769 [Y] 6 * abstract * * chapter 7 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/1.601889 | [Y] - HUTLEY M C ET AL, "The moire magnifier", PURE AND APPLIED OPTICS. JOURNAL OF THE EUROPEAN OPTICAL SOCIETYPART A, INSTITUTE OF PHYSICS PUBLISHING, BRISTOL, GB, (19940301), vol. 3, no. 2, doi:10.1088/0963-9659/3/2/006, ISSN 0963-9659, pages 133 - 142, XP020071153 [Y] 6 * abstract * * chapters 1, 3 and 4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1088/0963-9659/3/2/006 | by applicant | US4534398 | US4892336 | US5712731 | Opposition | EP0439092 | US5538753 | US6144795 | JP2002169223 | JP2004163530 | WO2005052650 | US2005180020 | - "2.2 Gravure Printing", HELMUT KIPPHAN, Handbook of Print Media Technologies and production methods, (20010000), pages 369 - 371, XP055519906 |