blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2475213

EP2475213 - Apparatuses and methods for handling mobility magement (MM) back-offs [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  07.02.2014
Database last updated on 09.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip07.02.2014Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 12.03.2014  [2014/11]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
HTC Corporation
No. 23, Xinghua Road Taoyuan City
Taoyuan County 330 / TW
[2012/28]
Inventor(s)01 / Liao, Ching-Yu
HTC Corporation
No. 23, Xinghua Rd.
Taoyuan City Taoyuan County 330 / TW
 [2012/28]
Representative(s)Emde, Eric, et al
Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft mbB
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Gewürzmühlstrasse 5
80538 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2012/28]Emde, Eric, et al
Wagner & Geyer Gewürzmühlstrasse 5
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date12000141.711.01.2012
[2012/28]
Priority number, dateUS201161431546P11.01.2011         Original published format: US 201161431546 P
[2012/42]
Former [2012/28]US20111343154611.01.2011
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2475213
Date:11.07.2012
Language:EN
[2012/28]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2475213
Date:08.08.2012
[2012/32]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.07.2012
ClassificationIPC:H04W76/02, H04W88/06, // H04W60/00
[2012/32]
CPC:
H04W60/00 (EP,US); H04W74/08 (KR); H04W8/02 (KR);
H04W48/18 (EP,US); H04W60/04 (EP,US); H04W76/18 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/28]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Vorrichtungen und Verfahren zur Handhabung von MM-Backoffs[2012/28]
English:Apparatuses and methods for handling mobility magement (MM) back-offs[2012/28]
French:Appareils et procédés pour la mise en ouvre de temporisateurs pour un délai d'attente dans les procédures de gestion de mobilité[2012/28]
Examination procedure11.01.2012Examination requested  [2012/28]
18.07.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
23.01.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.04.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
15.10.2013Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2014/11]
07.11.2013Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2014/11]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  18.07.2012
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]US2008220772  (ISLAM M KHALEDUL [CA], et al) [A] 9-15 * paragraph [0045] ** claims 1-14 *;
 [Y]EP2194744  (HTC CORP [TW]) [Y] 9-15 * paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0021] * * figures 1-4; claims 1-6 *;
 [AD]  - 3rd Generation Partnership Project; Technical Specification Group Services and System Aspects; General Packet Radio Service (GPRS) enhancements for Evolved Universal Terrestrial Radio Access Network (E-UTRAN) access (Release 10), 3GPP STANDARD; 3GPP TS 23.401, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, PAGE(S) 1 - 276, (20101220), XP050462136 [AD] 1-15 * page 29, paragraph 4.3.7.4.2.3 *
 [X]  - HUAWEI ET AL, "EMM NAS level rejection for APN based congestion control", 3GPP DRAFT; C1-103696_EMM NAS LEVEL REJECTION FOR APN BASED CONGESTION CONTROL, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20101004), vol. CT WG1, no. Barcelona; 20101011, XP050444442 [X] 1-8 * page 3, paragraph 5.5.1.1 - page 7, paragraph 5.5..1.2.5 *
 [XA]  - ETRI, "NAS-level back-off timer to. reject Attach request", 3GPP DRAFT; C1-103895, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20101004), vol. CT WG1, no. Barcelona; 20101011, XP050444552 [X] 1-3,5-7 * paragraph [5.5.1.1] - paragraph [5.5.1.2.5] * [A] 4,8
 [Y]  - NOKIA SIEMENS NETWORKS ET AL, "Clarification of back-off timer usage", 3GPP DRAFT; S2-104939, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20101006), vol. SA WG2, no. Prague; 20101011, XP050459721 [Y] 9-15 * paragraph [4.3.7.4.1] - paragraph [4.3.7.4.2] *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.