EP2481935 - Method for fitting a component and fixing clip [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.06.2017 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ITW Fastener Products GmbH Liegnitzer Str. 1 58642 Iserlohn / DE | [2017/07] |
Former [2012/31] | For all designated states TRW Automotive Electronics & Components GmbH Industriestrasse 2-8 78315 Radolfzell / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Demerath, Michael Friedhofstr. 10 66909 Hueffler / DE | 02 /
Fischer, Anton Weihergasse 4 73579 Schechingen Leinweiler / DE | [2012/43] |
Former [2012/31] | 01 /
Demerath, Michael Friedhofstr. 10 66909 Hueffler / DE | ||
02 /
Fisher, Anton Weihergasse 4 73579 Schechingen Leinweiler / DE | Representative(s) | Hauck Patentanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Postfach 11 31 53 20431 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/31] | Prinz & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Rundfunkplatz 2 80335 München / DE | ||
Former [2012/31] | Prinz & Partner Patentanwälte Rundfunkplatz 2 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12000206.8 | 13.01.2012 | [2012/31] | Priority number, date | DE20111009683 | 28.01.2011 Original published format: DE102011009683 | [2012/31] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2481935 | Date: | 01.08.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/31] | Type: | A8 Corrected patent application | No.: | EP2481935 | Date: | 24.10.2012 | [2012/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2481935 | Date: | 03.08.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.06.2012 | Classification | IPC: | F16B1/00, F16B19/10, F16B5/06, B60R21/217, B60R13/02, F16B5/12, F16B21/06, // F16B21/07, F16B21/08 | [2016/07] | CPC: |
B60R13/0206 (EP,US);
B60R16/02 (KR);
B60R21/217 (EP,US);
B62D25/00 (KR);
F16B19/1081 (EP,US);
F16B2/20 (KR);
F16B21/065 (EP,US);
F16B5/0685 (EP,US);
F16B21/076 (EP,US);
F16B21/086 (EP,US);
F16B2200/95 (EP,US);
F16B5/125 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2012/31] | F16B1/00, F16B19/10, F16B5/06, B60R21/217, // F16B21/07, F16B21/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/31] |
Former [2012/31] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Montieren eines Bauteils und Befestigungsclip | [2012/31] | English: | Method for fitting a component and fixing clip | [2012/31] | French: | Procédé de montage d'un composant et clip de fixation | [2012/31] | Examination procedure | 09.10.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.10.2012 | Examination requested [2012/47] | 26.11.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.01.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.02.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.05.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.09.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.01.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.01.2016 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 13.01.2016 | 13.01.2016 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 04.03.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.06.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 21.06.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.06.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.11.2012 | Opposition(s) | 04.05.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 13.01.2012 | AL | 03.08.2016 | CY | 03.08.2016 | CZ | 03.08.2016 | DK | 03.08.2016 | EE | 03.08.2016 | FI | 03.08.2016 | HR | 03.08.2016 | LT | 03.08.2016 | LV | 03.08.2016 | MC | 03.08.2016 | MK | 03.08.2016 | MT | 03.08.2016 | NL | 03.08.2016 | PL | 03.08.2016 | RO | 03.08.2016 | RS | 03.08.2016 | SE | 03.08.2016 | SI | 03.08.2016 | SK | 03.08.2016 | SM | 03.08.2016 | TR | 03.08.2016 | BG | 03.11.2016 | NO | 03.11.2016 | GR | 04.11.2016 | IS | 03.12.2016 | PT | 05.12.2016 | AT | 13.01.2017 | IE | 13.01.2017 | LU | 13.01.2017 | BE | 31.01.2017 | CH | 31.01.2017 | LI | 31.01.2017 | [2020/15] |
Former [2019/51] | HU | 13.01.2012 | |
AL | 03.08.2016 | ||
CY | 03.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 03.08.2016 | ||
DK | 03.08.2016 | ||
EE | 03.08.2016 | ||
FI | 03.08.2016 | ||
HR | 03.08.2016 | ||
LT | 03.08.2016 | ||
LV | 03.08.2016 | ||
MC | 03.08.2016 | ||
MK | 03.08.2016 | ||
MT | 03.08.2016 | ||
NL | 03.08.2016 | ||
PL | 03.08.2016 | ||
RO | 03.08.2016 | ||
RS | 03.08.2016 | ||
SE | 03.08.2016 | ||
SI | 03.08.2016 | ||
SK | 03.08.2016 | ||
SM | 03.08.2016 | ||
BG | 03.11.2016 | ||
NO | 03.11.2016 | ||
GR | 04.11.2016 | ||
IS | 03.12.2016 | ||
PT | 05.12.2016 | ||
AT | 13.01.2017 | ||
IE | 13.01.2017 | ||
LU | 13.01.2017 | ||
BE | 31.01.2017 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 13.01.2012 | |
AL | 03.08.2016 | ||
CY | 03.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 03.08.2016 | ||
DK | 03.08.2016 | ||
EE | 03.08.2016 | ||
FI | 03.08.2016 | ||
HR | 03.08.2016 | ||
LT | 03.08.2016 | ||
LV | 03.08.2016 | ||
MC | 03.08.2016 | ||
MT | 03.08.2016 | ||
NL | 03.08.2016 | ||
PL | 03.08.2016 | ||
RO | 03.08.2016 | ||
RS | 03.08.2016 | ||
SE | 03.08.2016 | ||
SI | 03.08.2016 | ||
SK | 03.08.2016 | ||
SM | 03.08.2016 | ||
BG | 03.11.2016 | ||
NO | 03.11.2016 | ||
GR | 04.11.2016 | ||
IS | 03.12.2016 | ||
PT | 05.12.2016 | ||
AT | 13.01.2017 | ||
IE | 13.01.2017 | ||
LU | 13.01.2017 | ||
BE | 31.01.2017 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 13.01.2012 | |
AL | 03.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 03.08.2016 | ||
DK | 03.08.2016 | ||
EE | 03.08.2016 | ||
FI | 03.08.2016 | ||
HR | 03.08.2016 | ||
LT | 03.08.2016 | ||
LV | 03.08.2016 | ||
MC | 03.08.2016 | ||
MT | 03.08.2016 | ||
NL | 03.08.2016 | ||
PL | 03.08.2016 | ||
RO | 03.08.2016 | ||
RS | 03.08.2016 | ||
SE | 03.08.2016 | ||
SI | 03.08.2016 | ||
SK | 03.08.2016 | ||
SM | 03.08.2016 | ||
BG | 03.11.2016 | ||
NO | 03.11.2016 | ||
GR | 04.11.2016 | ||
IS | 03.12.2016 | ||
PT | 05.12.2016 | ||
AT | 13.01.2017 | ||
IE | 13.01.2017 | ||
LU | 13.01.2017 | ||
BE | 31.01.2017 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
Former [2018/46] | AL | 03.08.2016 | |
CZ | 03.08.2016 | ||
DK | 03.08.2016 | ||
EE | 03.08.2016 | ||
FI | 03.08.2016 | ||
HR | 03.08.2016 | ||
LT | 03.08.2016 | ||
LV | 03.08.2016 | ||
MC | 03.08.2016 | ||
MT | 03.08.2016 | ||
NL | 03.08.2016 | ||
PL | 03.08.2016 | ||
RO | 03.08.2016 | ||
RS | 03.08.2016 | ||
SE | 03.08.2016 | ||
SI | 03.08.2016 | ||
SK | 03.08.2016 | ||
SM | 03.08.2016 | ||
BG | 03.11.2016 | ||
NO | 03.11.2016 | ||
GR | 04.11.2016 | ||
IS | 03.12.2016 | ||
PT | 05.12.2016 | ||
AT | 13.01.2017 | ||
IE | 13.01.2017 | ||
LU | 13.01.2017 | ||
BE | 31.01.2017 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | CZ | 03.08.2016 | |
DK | 03.08.2016 | ||
EE | 03.08.2016 | ||
FI | 03.08.2016 | ||
HR | 03.08.2016 | ||
LT | 03.08.2016 | ||
LV | 03.08.2016 | ||
MC | 03.08.2016 | ||
MT | 03.08.2016 | ||
NL | 03.08.2016 | ||
PL | 03.08.2016 | ||
RO | 03.08.2016 | ||
RS | 03.08.2016 | ||
SE | 03.08.2016 | ||
SI | 03.08.2016 | ||
SK | 03.08.2016 | ||
SM | 03.08.2016 | ||
BG | 03.11.2016 | ||
NO | 03.11.2016 | ||
GR | 04.11.2016 | ||
IS | 03.12.2016 | ||
PT | 05.12.2016 | ||
AT | 13.01.2017 | ||
IE | 13.01.2017 | ||
LU | 13.01.2017 | ||
BE | 31.01.2017 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
Former [2018/24] | CZ | 03.08.2016 | |
DK | 03.08.2016 | ||
EE | 03.08.2016 | ||
FI | 03.08.2016 | ||
HR | 03.08.2016 | ||
LT | 03.08.2016 | ||
LV | 03.08.2016 | ||
MC | 03.08.2016 | ||
NL | 03.08.2016 | ||
PL | 03.08.2016 | ||
RO | 03.08.2016 | ||
RS | 03.08.2016 | ||
SE | 03.08.2016 | ||
SI | 03.08.2016 | ||
SK | 03.08.2016 | ||
SM | 03.08.2016 | ||
BG | 03.11.2016 | ||
NO | 03.11.2016 | ||
GR | 04.11.2016 | ||
IS | 03.12.2016 | ||
PT | 05.12.2016 | ||
AT | 13.01.2017 | ||
IE | 13.01.2017 | ||
LU | 13.01.2017 | ||
BE | 31.01.2017 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
Former [2018/13] | CZ | 03.08.2016 | |
DK | 03.08.2016 | ||
EE | 03.08.2016 | ||
FI | 03.08.2016 | ||
HR | 03.08.2016 | ||
LT | 03.08.2016 | ||
LV | 03.08.2016 | ||
MC | 03.08.2016 | ||
NL | 03.08.2016 | ||
PL | 03.08.2016 | ||
RO | 03.08.2016 | ||
RS | 03.08.2016 | ||
SE | 03.08.2016 | ||
SI | 03.08.2016 | ||
SK | 03.08.2016 | ||
SM | 03.08.2016 | ||
BG | 03.11.2016 | ||
NO | 03.11.2016 | ||
GR | 04.11.2016 | ||
IS | 03.12.2016 | ||
PT | 05.12.2016 | ||
IE | 13.01.2017 | ||
LU | 13.01.2017 | ||
BE | 31.01.2017 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | CZ | 03.08.2016 | |
DK | 03.08.2016 | ||
EE | 03.08.2016 | ||
FI | 03.08.2016 | ||
HR | 03.08.2016 | ||
LT | 03.08.2016 | ||
LV | 03.08.2016 | ||
MC | 03.08.2016 | ||
NL | 03.08.2016 | ||
PL | 03.08.2016 | ||
RO | 03.08.2016 | ||
RS | 03.08.2016 | ||
SE | 03.08.2016 | ||
SI | 03.08.2016 | ||
SK | 03.08.2016 | ||
SM | 03.08.2016 | ||
BG | 03.11.2016 | ||
NO | 03.11.2016 | ||
GR | 04.11.2016 | ||
IS | 03.12.2016 | ||
PT | 05.12.2016 | ||
LU | 13.01.2017 | ||
BE | 31.01.2017 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/45] | CZ | 03.08.2016 | |
DK | 03.08.2016 | ||
EE | 03.08.2016 | ||
FI | 03.08.2016 | ||
HR | 03.08.2016 | ||
LT | 03.08.2016 | ||
LV | 03.08.2016 | ||
MC | 03.08.2016 | ||
NL | 03.08.2016 | ||
PL | 03.08.2016 | ||
RO | 03.08.2016 | ||
RS | 03.08.2016 | ||
SE | 03.08.2016 | ||
SI | 03.08.2016 | ||
SK | 03.08.2016 | ||
SM | 03.08.2016 | ||
BG | 03.11.2016 | ||
NO | 03.11.2016 | ||
GR | 04.11.2016 | ||
IS | 03.12.2016 | ||
PT | 05.12.2016 | ||
BE | 31.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/37] | CZ | 03.08.2016 | |
DK | 03.08.2016 | ||
EE | 03.08.2016 | ||
FI | 03.08.2016 | ||
HR | 03.08.2016 | ||
LT | 03.08.2016 | ||
LV | 03.08.2016 | ||
NL | 03.08.2016 | ||
PL | 03.08.2016 | ||
RO | 03.08.2016 | ||
RS | 03.08.2016 | ||
SE | 03.08.2016 | ||
SI | 03.08.2016 | ||
SK | 03.08.2016 | ||
SM | 03.08.2016 | ||
BG | 03.11.2016 | ||
NO | 03.11.2016 | ||
GR | 04.11.2016 | ||
IS | 03.12.2016 | ||
PT | 05.12.2016 | ||
BE | 31.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/32] | CZ | 03.08.2016 | |
DK | 03.08.2016 | ||
EE | 03.08.2016 | ||
FI | 03.08.2016 | ||
HR | 03.08.2016 | ||
LT | 03.08.2016 | ||
LV | 03.08.2016 | ||
NL | 03.08.2016 | ||
PL | 03.08.2016 | ||
RO | 03.08.2016 | ||
RS | 03.08.2016 | ||
SE | 03.08.2016 | ||
SK | 03.08.2016 | ||
SM | 03.08.2016 | ||
BG | 03.11.2016 | ||
NO | 03.11.2016 | ||
GR | 04.11.2016 | ||
IS | 03.12.2016 | ||
PT | 05.12.2016 | ||
BE | 31.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/13] | FI | 03.08.2016 | |
HR | 03.08.2016 | ||
LT | 03.08.2016 | ||
LV | 03.08.2016 | ||
NL | 03.08.2016 | ||
PL | 03.08.2016 | ||
RS | 03.08.2016 | ||
SE | 03.08.2016 | ||
NO | 03.11.2016 | ||
GR | 04.11.2016 | ||
IS | 03.12.2016 | ||
PT | 05.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | FI | 03.08.2016 | |
HR | 03.08.2016 | ||
LT | 03.08.2016 | ||
NL | 03.08.2016 | ||
PL | 03.08.2016 | ||
RS | 03.08.2016 | ||
SE | 03.08.2016 | ||
NO | 03.11.2016 | ||
GR | 04.11.2016 | ||
IS | 03.12.2016 | ||
PT | 05.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | FI | 03.08.2016 | |
HR | 03.08.2016 | ||
LT | 03.08.2016 | ||
NL | 03.08.2016 | ||
PL | 03.08.2016 | ||
RS | 03.08.2016 | ||
SE | 03.08.2016 | ||
NO | 03.11.2016 | ||
IS | 03.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | FI | 03.08.2016 | |
LT | 03.08.2016 | ||
NL | 03.08.2016 | ||
NO | 03.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | LT | 03.08.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2239723 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [A] 2 * abstract *; | [X]WO0127906 (BROOKS CO E J [US]) [X] 1-15 * page 12, lines 3-23; figure - *; | [A]GB2364092 (TRW FASTENING SYSTEMS LTD [GB]) [A] 1,4 * abstract *; | [X]US2002146282 (WILKES DEREK ALAN [US], et al) [X] 1,4 * figure 23 *; | [A]US2005285377 (MEYENDORFF JOHN [US], et al) [A] 1,4* abstract *; | [X]DE202005018240U (TRW AUTOMOTIVE GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,4 * paragraphs [0021] - [0022]; figure - *; | [A]US2007145140 (YOSHIMURA KAZUO [US], et al) [A] 1,4 * abstract *; | [A]US2009044385 (NADERER JAMES P [US], et al) [A] 1,4 * paragraph [0022]; figure - *; | [A]US7677598 (RYAN SEAN TIMOTHY [US], et al) [A] 1,4 * column 5, lines 16-39; figure 4 *; | [A]JP2010077989 (FUJITANI KATSUMI) [A] 1,4 * abstract * |