EP2618144 - Method and container for loading a measuring device with measuring units [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.07.2014 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.07.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.08.2014 [2014/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Medical Device UG Oldenburgerstrasse 17 429 Rheine / DE | [2013/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bartetzko, Norbert Stockum 6a 48301 Nottuln / DE | 02 /
Bartetzko, Robert Beverfördering 52 59071 Hamm / DE | [2013/30] | Application number, filing date | 12000258.9 | 18.01.2012 | [2013/30] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2618144 | Date: | 24.07.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.06.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/487 | [2013/30] | CPC: |
G01N33/48757 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/30] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren und Behälter zum Beladen eines Messgeräts mit Messmitteleinheiten | [2013/30] | English: | Method and container for loading a measuring device with measuring units | [2013/30] | French: | Procédé et récipient de chargement d'un appareil de mesure doté d'unités de moyens de mesure | [2013/30] | Examination procedure | 25.01.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/32] | 04.03.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2014/32] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2014 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2006266765 (PUGH JERRY T [US]) [X] 1,6,10,12,13 * paragraphs [0055] - [0059]; figures 11A-11D *; | [XY]US2005186162 (SATO YOSHIHARU [JP]) [X] 1,6,10-12 * abstract * [Y] 2-5,7-9; | [Y]US2008021296 (CREAVEN JOHN P [US]) [Y] 2-5,7-9 * abstract *; | [X]US2007080093 (BOOZER BRAD [US], et al) [X] 6,10 * abstract * | by applicant | EP1352611 | EP1854738 | US6508380 | WO2008125244 | EP2157428 |