Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
18.07.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] |
18.03.2014 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
05.03.2014 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | |
20.12.2013 | Change - representative | published on 22.01.2014 [2014/04] |
23.07.2013 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 24.07.2013 [2013/30] |