EP2481954 - Assembly with a planetary gear for motor vehicle, motor vehicle and method for operating a planetary gear [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 15.08.2014 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2014 | Withdrawal of application | published on 17.09.2014 [2014/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Audi AG 85045 Ingolstadt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/31] | For all designated states Audi AG 85045 Ingolstadt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Misala, Andreas Sersheimer Strasse 50 74343 Sachsenheim / DE | [2012/31] | Representative(s) | Lehle, Josef AUDI AG Patentabteilung 85045 Ingolstadt / DE | [2012/31] | Application number, filing date | 12000522.8 | 27.01.2012 | [2012/31] | Priority number, date | DE20111010086 | 01.02.2011 Original published format: DE102011010086 | [2012/31] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2481954 | Date: | 01.08.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.05.2012 | Classification | IPC: | F16H55/36, F16H3/54, B60K25/02, F02B67/06, F16D27/00 | [2012/31] | CPC: |
F16H55/36 (EP,US);
F16D27/004 (EP,US);
F16D47/04 (EP,US);
F16H3/54 (EP,US);
B60K17/02 (EP,US);
B60K2025/024 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/31] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Anordnung mit einem Planetengetriebe für Kraftfahrzeug, Kraftfahrzeug sowie Verfahren zum Betreiben eines Planetengetriebes | [2012/31] | English: | Assembly with a planetary gear for motor vehicle, motor vehicle and method for operating a planetary gear | [2012/31] | French: | Agencement doté d'un engrenage épicycloïdal pour véhicules automobiles, véhicule automobile ainsi que procédé de fonctionnement d'un engrenage épicycloïdal | [2012/31] | Examination procedure | 16.11.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.02.2013 | Examination requested [2013/11] | 25.07.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.11.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.08.2014 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2014/38] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.07.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAY]EP1555456 (LUK LAMELLEN & KUPPLUNGSBAU [DE]) [X] 15-17 * paragraphs [0001] , [0003] , [0008] , [0060]; figure 14 * [A] 5-8,10 [Y] 1-4,9,11-14; | [XAY]DE102006053139 (COMPACT DYNAMICS GMBH [DE], et al) [X] 15-17 * paragraphs [0038] - [0053]; figure 3; claims 1,8,27 * [A] 3-14 [Y] 1,2; | [XY]JPS56148133U (UNKNOWN) [X] 15-17 * figure 1 * [Y] 1,2; | [Y]WO2010144753 (CZERO INC [US], et al) [Y] 1-4,9,11-14 * paragraphs [0147] - [0151]; figures 28-31 *; | [Y]JP2004245316 (NTN TOYO BEARING CO LTD) [Y] 1-4,9,11-14 * abstract *; | [AD]DE19941705 (LUK LAMELLEN & KUPPLUNGSBAU [DE]) [AD] 1,8 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1459931 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [A] 1-17 * paragraphs [0013] - [0048]; figures 1,2 * | by applicant | DE19822426 | DE19941705 | EP1282772 |