Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
11.07.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.08.2014 [2014/33] |
01.04.2014 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | |
18.03.2014 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
06.08.2013 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 07.08.2013 [2013/32] |