19.10.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.11.2018 [2018/47] |
17.08.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.09.2018 [2018/38] |
13.07.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.08.2018 [2018/33] |
29.06.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.08.2018 [2018/31] |
15.06.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.07.2018 [2018/29] |
08.06.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.07.2018 [2018/28] |
20.10.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.11.2017 [2017/47] |
13.01.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.02.2017 [2017/07] |
14.10.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.11.2016 [2016/46] |
23.09.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.10.2016 [2016/43] |
16.09.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.10.2016 [2016/42] |
05.08.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.09.2016 [2016/36] |
01.07.2016 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 03.08.2016 [2016/31] |
13.05.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.06.2016 [2016/24] |
06.05.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.06.2016 [2016/23] |
29.04.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.06.2016 [2016/22] |
22.04.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.05.2016 [2016/21] |
15.04.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.05.2016 [2016/20] |
04.03.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.04.2016 [2016/14] |
12.02.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.03.2016 [2016/11] |
05.02.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.03.2016 [2016/10] |
29.01.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.03.2016 [2016/09] |
22.01.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.02.2016 [2016/08] |
15.01.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.02.2016 [2016/07] |
24.07.2015 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 26.08.2015 [2015/35] |
22.07.2015 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
21.07.2015 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
21.07.2015 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
20.04.2015 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
13.03.2015 |
Change - classification |
published on 15.04.2015 [2015/16] |
03.03.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
14.11.2014 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
15.08.2014 |
First examination report |
|
13.08.2014 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
05.03.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
01.03.2013 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 03.04.2013 [2013/14] |
22.02.2013 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
21.08.2012 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 22.08.2012 [2012/34] |