EP2489895 - Synchronise fixed ball joint with parabolic track [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.07.2013 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.08.2013 [2013/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Neapco Europe GmbH Henry-Ford-Strasse 1 52351 Düren / DE | [2012/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Weissenfels, Mirko Heinrich-Böll-Str. 47 51371 Leverkusen / DE | 02 /
Bilz, Peter Brüchnergasse 4 63579 Freigericht / DE | [2012/34] | Representative(s) | Lohmanns, Bernard Patentanwälte Bauer Vorberg Kayser Partnerschaft mbB Goltsteinstrasse 87 50968 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/34] | Lohmanns, Bernard Bauer Vorberg Kayser Patentanwälte Goltsteinstrasse 87 50968 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 12000967.5 | 15.02.2012 | [2012/34] | Priority number, date | DE20111004430 | 18.02.2011 Original published format: DE102011004430 | DE20111076286 | 23.05.2011 Original published format: DE102011076286 | [2012/34] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2489895 | Date: | 22.08.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.07.2012 | Classification | IPC: | F16D3/22 | [2012/34] | CPC: |
F16D3/223 (EP);
F16D2003/22309 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/34] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Kugelgleichauffestgelenk mit parabelförmigen Kugelbahnverläufen | [2012/34] | English: | Synchronise fixed ball joint with parabolic track | [2012/34] | French: | Joint homocinétique de type fixe à billes doté d'un déroulement de roulement à billes parabolique | [2012/34] | Examination procedure | 23.02.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/35] | 09.04.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2013/35] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR2799519 (GUIMBRETIERE PIERRE [FR]) [X] 1-7 * page 8 - page 10; figures 1A-6A *; | [X]DE102004018721 (GKN DRIVELINE DEUTSCHLAND GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-7 * paragraph [0016]; figures 3b,3c *; | [X]FR2693521 (GKN AUTOMOTIVE AG [DE]) [X] 1-7 * figure 5b *; | [X]GB2131123 (LOEHR & BROMKAMP GMBH) [X] 1,4 * page 1, line 91 - line 119; claim 3 * |