EP2468212 - Computer-implemented method for digitally designing a dental restoration [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.11.2015 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Straumann Holding AG Peter Merian-Weg 12 4002 Basel / CH | [2012/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Manzer, Martin c/o Straumann CADCAM GmbH Rodower Chaussee 29 12489 Berlin / DE | 02 /
Lawitschka, Uwe c/o Straumann CADCAM GmbH Rudower Chaussee 29 12489 Berlin / DE | 03 /
Meier, Marcus c/o Institut Straumann AG Peter Merian-Weg 12 4002 Basel / CH | 04 /
Welge, Melanie c/o Straumann CADCAM GmbH Lochhamer Schlag 6 82166 Gräfelfing / DE | [2012/26] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/26] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12001137.4 | 18.03.2011 | [2012/26] | Priority number, date | EP20100009047 | 31.08.2010 Original published format: EP 10009047 | EP20100009046 | 31.08.2010 Original published format: EP 10009046 | [2012/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2468212 | Date: | 27.06.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2468212 | Date: | 03.10.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2468212 | Date: | 21.01.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.09.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A61C13/00 | [2012/26] | CPC: |
A61C13/0004 (EP,US);
G06F30/00 (US);
A61C5/77 (EP,US);
G16H20/40 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/26] | Title | German: | Computerimplementiertes Verfahren für die digitale Planung eines Zahnersatzes | [2012/26] | English: | Computer-implemented method for digitally designing a dental restoration | [2012/26] | French: | Procédé informatique pour concevoir de manière numérique une prothèse dentaire | [2012/26] | Examination procedure | 08.10.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.10.2012 | Examination requested [2012/47] | 17.12.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.03.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.01.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.05.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.08.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.12.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 05.12.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.12.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP11002250.6 / EP2422742 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20110002250) is 02.03.2012 | Opposition(s) | 22.10.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/53] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 18.03.2011 | AL | 21.01.2015 | AT | 21.01.2015 | BE | 21.01.2015 | CY | 21.01.2015 | CZ | 21.01.2015 | DK | 21.01.2015 | EE | 21.01.2015 | ES | 21.01.2015 | FI | 21.01.2015 | HR | 21.01.2015 | IT | 21.01.2015 | LT | 21.01.2015 | LV | 21.01.2015 | MC | 21.01.2015 | MK | 21.01.2015 | MT | 21.01.2015 | NL | 21.01.2015 | PL | 21.01.2015 | RO | 21.01.2015 | RS | 21.01.2015 | SE | 21.01.2015 | SI | 21.01.2015 | SK | 21.01.2015 | SM | 21.01.2015 | TR | 21.01.2015 | IE | 18.03.2015 | LU | 18.03.2015 | FR | 31.03.2015 | BG | 21.04.2015 | NO | 21.04.2015 | GR | 22.04.2015 | IS | 21.05.2015 | PT | 21.05.2015 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 18.03.2011 | |
AT | 21.01.2015 | ||
BE | 21.01.2015 | ||
CY | 21.01.2015 | ||
CZ | 21.01.2015 | ||
DK | 21.01.2015 | ||
EE | 21.01.2015 | ||
ES | 21.01.2015 | ||
FI | 21.01.2015 | ||
HR | 21.01.2015 | ||
IT | 21.01.2015 | ||
LT | 21.01.2015 | ||
LV | 21.01.2015 | ||
MC | 21.01.2015 | ||
MK | 21.01.2015 | ||
MT | 21.01.2015 | ||
NL | 21.01.2015 | ||
PL | 21.01.2015 | ||
RO | 21.01.2015 | ||
RS | 21.01.2015 | ||
SE | 21.01.2015 | ||
SI | 21.01.2015 | ||
SK | 21.01.2015 | ||
SM | 21.01.2015 | ||
TR | 21.01.2015 | ||
IE | 18.03.2015 | ||
LU | 18.03.2015 | ||
FR | 31.03.2015 | ||
BG | 21.04.2015 | ||
NO | 21.04.2015 | ||
GR | 22.04.2015 | ||
IS | 21.05.2015 | ||
PT | 21.05.2015 | ||
Former [2017/38] | HU | 18.03.2011 | |
AT | 21.01.2015 | ||
BE | 21.01.2015 | ||
CY | 21.01.2015 | ||
CZ | 21.01.2015 | ||
DK | 21.01.2015 | ||
EE | 21.01.2015 | ||
ES | 21.01.2015 | ||
FI | 21.01.2015 | ||
HR | 21.01.2015 | ||
IT | 21.01.2015 | ||
LT | 21.01.2015 | ||
LV | 21.01.2015 | ||
MC | 21.01.2015 | ||
MT | 21.01.2015 | ||
NL | 21.01.2015 | ||
PL | 21.01.2015 | ||
RO | 21.01.2015 | ||
RS | 21.01.2015 | ||
SE | 21.01.2015 | ||
SI | 21.01.2015 | ||
SK | 21.01.2015 | ||
SM | 21.01.2015 | ||
TR | 21.01.2015 | ||
IE | 18.03.2015 | ||
LU | 18.03.2015 | ||
FR | 31.03.2015 | ||
BG | 21.04.2015 | ||
NO | 21.04.2015 | ||
GR | 22.04.2015 | ||
IS | 21.05.2015 | ||
PT | 21.05.2015 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 21.01.2015 | |
BE | 21.01.2015 | ||
CZ | 21.01.2015 | ||
DK | 21.01.2015 | ||
EE | 21.01.2015 | ||
ES | 21.01.2015 | ||
FI | 21.01.2015 | ||
HR | 21.01.2015 | ||
IT | 21.01.2015 | ||
LT | 21.01.2015 | ||
LV | 21.01.2015 | ||
MC | 21.01.2015 | ||
MT | 21.01.2015 | ||
NL | 21.01.2015 | ||
PL | 21.01.2015 | ||
RO | 21.01.2015 | ||
RS | 21.01.2015 | ||
SE | 21.01.2015 | ||
SI | 21.01.2015 | ||
SK | 21.01.2015 | ||
IE | 18.03.2015 | ||
LU | 18.03.2015 | ||
FR | 31.03.2015 | ||
BG | 21.04.2015 | ||
NO | 21.04.2015 | ||
GR | 22.04.2015 | ||
IS | 21.05.2015 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 21.01.2015 | |
BE | 21.01.2015 | ||
CZ | 21.01.2015 | ||
DK | 21.01.2015 | ||
EE | 21.01.2015 | ||
ES | 21.01.2015 | ||
FI | 21.01.2015 | ||
HR | 21.01.2015 | ||
IT | 21.01.2015 | ||
LT | 21.01.2015 | ||
LV | 21.01.2015 | ||
MC | 21.01.2015 | ||
NL | 21.01.2015 | ||
PL | 21.01.2015 | ||
RO | 21.01.2015 | ||
RS | 21.01.2015 | ||
SE | 21.01.2015 | ||
SI | 21.01.2015 | ||
SK | 21.01.2015 | ||
IE | 18.03.2015 | ||
LU | 18.03.2015 | ||
FR | 31.03.2015 | ||
BG | 21.04.2015 | ||
NO | 21.04.2015 | ||
GR | 22.04.2015 | ||
IS | 21.05.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 21.01.2015 | |
CZ | 21.01.2015 | ||
DK | 21.01.2015 | ||
EE | 21.01.2015 | ||
ES | 21.01.2015 | ||
FI | 21.01.2015 | ||
HR | 21.01.2015 | ||
IT | 21.01.2015 | ||
LT | 21.01.2015 | ||
LV | 21.01.2015 | ||
MC | 21.01.2015 | ||
NL | 21.01.2015 | ||
PL | 21.01.2015 | ||
RO | 21.01.2015 | ||
RS | 21.01.2015 | ||
SE | 21.01.2015 | ||
SI | 21.01.2015 | ||
SK | 21.01.2015 | ||
IE | 18.03.2015 | ||
LU | 18.03.2015 | ||
FR | 31.03.2015 | ||
BG | 21.04.2015 | ||
NO | 21.04.2015 | ||
GR | 22.04.2015 | ||
IS | 21.05.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | AT | 21.01.2015 | |
CZ | 21.01.2015 | ||
DK | 21.01.2015 | ||
EE | 21.01.2015 | ||
ES | 21.01.2015 | ||
FI | 21.01.2015 | ||
HR | 21.01.2015 | ||
IT | 21.01.2015 | ||
LT | 21.01.2015 | ||
LV | 21.01.2015 | ||
MC | 21.01.2015 | ||
NL | 21.01.2015 | ||
PL | 21.01.2015 | ||
RO | 21.01.2015 | ||
RS | 21.01.2015 | ||
SE | 21.01.2015 | ||
SK | 21.01.2015 | ||
IE | 18.03.2015 | ||
LU | 18.03.2015 | ||
BG | 21.04.2015 | ||
NO | 21.04.2015 | ||
GR | 22.04.2015 | ||
IS | 21.05.2015 | ||
Former [2016/03] | AT | 21.01.2015 | |
CZ | 21.01.2015 | ||
DK | 21.01.2015 | ||
EE | 21.01.2015 | ||
ES | 21.01.2015 | ||
FI | 21.01.2015 | ||
HR | 21.01.2015 | ||
IT | 21.01.2015 | ||
LT | 21.01.2015 | ||
LV | 21.01.2015 | ||
MC | 21.01.2015 | ||
NL | 21.01.2015 | ||
PL | 21.01.2015 | ||
RO | 21.01.2015 | ||
RS | 21.01.2015 | ||
SE | 21.01.2015 | ||
SK | 21.01.2015 | ||
LU | 18.03.2015 | ||
BG | 21.04.2015 | ||
NO | 21.04.2015 | ||
GR | 22.04.2015 | ||
IS | 21.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | AT | 21.01.2015 | |
CZ | 21.01.2015 | ||
DK | 21.01.2015 | ||
EE | 21.01.2015 | ||
ES | 21.01.2015 | ||
FI | 21.01.2015 | ||
HR | 21.01.2015 | ||
LT | 21.01.2015 | ||
LV | 21.01.2015 | ||
MC | 21.01.2015 | ||
NL | 21.01.2015 | ||
PL | 21.01.2015 | ||
RO | 21.01.2015 | ||
RS | 21.01.2015 | ||
SE | 21.01.2015 | ||
SK | 21.01.2015 | ||
LU | 18.03.2015 | ||
BG | 21.04.2015 | ||
NO | 21.04.2015 | ||
GR | 22.04.2015 | ||
IS | 21.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/47] | AT | 21.01.2015 | |
ES | 21.01.2015 | ||
FI | 21.01.2015 | ||
HR | 21.01.2015 | ||
LT | 21.01.2015 | ||
LV | 21.01.2015 | ||
MC | 21.01.2015 | ||
NL | 21.01.2015 | ||
PL | 21.01.2015 | ||
RS | 21.01.2015 | ||
SE | 21.01.2015 | ||
LU | 18.03.2015 | ||
BG | 21.04.2015 | ||
NO | 21.04.2015 | ||
GR | 22.04.2015 | ||
IS | 21.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/46] | AT | 21.01.2015 | |
ES | 21.01.2015 | ||
FI | 21.01.2015 | ||
HR | 21.01.2015 | ||
LT | 21.01.2015 | ||
LV | 21.01.2015 | ||
MC | 21.01.2015 | ||
NL | 21.01.2015 | ||
PL | 21.01.2015 | ||
RS | 21.01.2015 | ||
SE | 21.01.2015 | ||
BG | 21.04.2015 | ||
NO | 21.04.2015 | ||
GR | 22.04.2015 | ||
IS | 21.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/39] | AT | 21.01.2015 | |
ES | 21.01.2015 | ||
FI | 21.01.2015 | ||
HR | 21.01.2015 | ||
LT | 21.01.2015 | ||
LV | 21.01.2015 | ||
NL | 21.01.2015 | ||
PL | 21.01.2015 | ||
RS | 21.01.2015 | ||
SE | 21.01.2015 | ||
BG | 21.04.2015 | ||
NO | 21.04.2015 | ||
GR | 22.04.2015 | ||
IS | 21.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/38] | AT | 21.01.2015 | |
ES | 21.01.2015 | ||
FI | 21.01.2015 | ||
HR | 21.01.2015 | ||
LT | 21.01.2015 | ||
PL | 21.01.2015 | ||
SE | 21.01.2015 | ||
BG | 21.04.2015 | ||
NO | 21.04.2015 | ||
GR | 22.04.2015 | ||
IS | 21.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | ES | 21.01.2015 | |
FI | 21.01.2015 | ||
HR | 21.01.2015 | ||
LT | 21.01.2015 | ||
PL | 21.01.2015 | ||
SE | 21.01.2015 | ||
BG | 21.04.2015 | ||
NO | 21.04.2015 | ||
GR | 22.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | ES | 21.01.2015 | |
FI | 21.01.2015 | ||
HR | 21.01.2015 | ||
LT | 21.01.2015 | ||
SE | 21.01.2015 | ||
BG | 21.04.2015 | ||
NO | 21.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | ES | 21.01.2015 | |
LT | 21.01.2015 | ||
NO | 21.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/33] | ES | 21.01.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2009246726 (CHELNOKOV FEDOR [RU], et al) [A] 1-15* paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0122]; figures 1-12 *; | [A] - STEINBRECHER T ET AL, "Dental inlay and onlay construction by iterative laplacian surface editing", COMPUTER GRAPHICS FORUM, WILEY-BLACKWELL PUBLISHING LTD, GB, (20080702), vol. 27, no. 5, doi:10.1111/J.1467-8659.2008.01284.X, ISSN 0167-7055, pages 1441 - 1447, XP002616277 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1467-8659.2008.01284.x | by applicant | - T. STEINBRECHER ET AL., "Dental inlay and onlay construction by iterative Laplacian surface editing", EUROGRAPHICS SYMPOSIUM ON GEOMETRY PROCESSING 2008, (20080702), vol. 27, no. 5, pages 1441 - 1447 |