EP2631010 - VINYLPYRIDINE RESIN FOR CATALYST CARRIERS AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2013/35] | Vinylpyridine resin for catalyst carriers and method of manufacturing the same | ||
[2019/52] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.06.2021 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.07.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.02.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.07.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Chiyoda Corporation 4-6-2, Minatomirai Nishi-ku, Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 220-8765 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2020/32] | For all designated states Chiyoda Corporation 4-6-2, Minatomirai,…Nishi-ku, Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 220-8765 / JP | ||
Former [2013/35] | For all designated states Chiyoda Corporation 12-1 Tsurumi-chuo 2-chome Tsurumi-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 230-8601 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Zhixiong, You c/o Chiyoda Corporation 4-6-2, Minatomirai Nishi-ku, Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 220-8765 / JP | 02 /
Takeshi, Minami c/o Chiyoda Corporation 4-6-2, Minatomirai Nishi-ku, Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 220-8765 / JP | 03 /
Chikako, Hashimoto c/o Chiyoda Corporation 4-6-2, Minatomirai Nishi-ku, Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 220-8765 / JP | 04 /
Yoichi, Umehara c/o Chiyoda Corporation 4-6-2, Minatomirai Nishi-ku, Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 220-8765 / JP | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/32] | 01 /
Zhixiong, You c/o Chiyoda Corporation 4-6-2, Minatomirai Nishi-ku, Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 220-8765 / JP | ||
02 /
Takeshi, Minami c/o Chiyoda Corporation 4-6-2, Minatomirai Nishi-ku, Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 220-8765 / JP | |||
03 /
Chikako, Hashimoto c/o Chiyoda Corporation 4-6-2, Minatomirai Nishi-ku, Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 220-8765 / JP | |||
04 /
Yoichi, Umehara c/o Chiyoda Corporation 4-6-2, Minatomirai Nishi-ku, Yikohama-shi Kanagawa 220-8765 / JP | |||
Former [2013/35] | 01 /
Zhixiong, You c/o Chiyoda Corporation 12-1 Tsurumi-chuo 2-chome Tsurumi-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 230-8601 / JP | ||
02 /
Takeshi, Minami c/o Chiyoda Corporation 12-1 Tsurumi-chuo 2-chome Tsurumi-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 230-8601 / JP | |||
03 /
Chikako, Hashimoto c/o Chiyoda Corporation 12-1 Tsurumi-chuo 2-chome Tsurumi-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 230-8601 / JP | |||
04 /
Yoichi, Umehara c/o Chiyoda Corporation 12-1 Tsurumi-chuo 2-chome Tsurumi-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 230-8601 / JP | Representative(s) | Blodig, Wolfgang Wächtershäuser & Hartz Patentanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Weinstrasse 8 80333 München / DE | [2020/32] |
Former [2013/35] | Blodig, Wolfgang Wächtershäuser & Hartz Patentanwälte Weinstraße 8 D-80333 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12001284.4 | 27.02.2012 | [2013/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2631010 | Date: | 28.08.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2631010 | Date: | 05.08.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.10.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B01J31/08, B01J37/00, B01J35/10, C08F2/18, C08F26/06, // B01J31/20 | [2013/35] | CPC: |
B01J31/165 (EP);
B01J31/08 (EP);
C08F26/06 (EP);
C08F4/027 (EP);
C08F4/38 (EP);
B01J2231/34 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/32] |
Former [2013/35] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VINYLPYRIDINHARZ FÜR KATALYSATORTRÄGER UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DAVON | [2020/11] | English: | VINYLPYRIDINE RESIN FOR CATALYST CARRIERS AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURING THE SAME | [2019/52] | French: | RÉSINE DE VINYLPYRIDINE POUR SUPPORTS DE CATALYSEUR ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION | [2020/11] |
Former [2013/35] | Vinylpyridinharz für Katalysatorträger und Verfahren zur Herstellung davon | ||
Former [2013/35] | Vinylpyridine resin for catalyst carriers and method of manufacturing the same | ||
Former [2013/35] | Résine de vinylpyridine pour supports de catalyseur et son procédé de fabrication | Examination procedure | 26.02.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.02.2014 | Examination requested [2014/15] | 13.07.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 18.09.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.12.2019 | Date of oral proceedings | 11.02.2020 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 17.02.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.06.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 29.06.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.06.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP20187357.7 / EP3747540 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.07.2018 | Opposition(s) | 07.05.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 27.02.2012 | AL | 05.08.2020 | AT | 05.08.2020 | CY | 05.08.2020 | CZ | 05.08.2020 | DK | 05.08.2020 | EE | 05.08.2020 | ES | 05.08.2020 | FI | 05.08.2020 | HR | 05.08.2020 | IT | 05.08.2020 | LT | 05.08.2020 | LV | 05.08.2020 | MC | 05.08.2020 | MK | 05.08.2020 | MT | 05.08.2020 | NL | 05.08.2020 | PL | 05.08.2020 | RO | 05.08.2020 | RS | 05.08.2020 | SE | 05.08.2020 | SI | 05.08.2020 | SK | 05.08.2020 | SM | 05.08.2020 | TR | 05.08.2020 | BG | 05.11.2020 | NO | 05.11.2020 | GR | 06.11.2020 | IS | 05.12.2020 | PT | 07.12.2020 | GB | 27.02.2021 | IE | 27.02.2021 | LU | 27.02.2021 | BE | 28.02.2021 | CH | 28.02.2021 | FR | 28.02.2021 | LI | 28.02.2021 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 27.02.2012 | |
AL | 05.08.2020 | ||
AT | 05.08.2020 | ||
CY | 05.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 05.08.2020 | ||
DK | 05.08.2020 | ||
EE | 05.08.2020 | ||
ES | 05.08.2020 | ||
FI | 05.08.2020 | ||
HR | 05.08.2020 | ||
IT | 05.08.2020 | ||
LT | 05.08.2020 | ||
LV | 05.08.2020 | ||
MC | 05.08.2020 | ||
MK | 05.08.2020 | ||
NL | 05.08.2020 | ||
PL | 05.08.2020 | ||
RO | 05.08.2020 | ||
RS | 05.08.2020 | ||
SE | 05.08.2020 | ||
SI | 05.08.2020 | ||
SK | 05.08.2020 | ||
SM | 05.08.2020 | ||
TR | 05.08.2020 | ||
BG | 05.11.2020 | ||
NO | 05.11.2020 | ||
GR | 06.11.2020 | ||
IS | 05.12.2020 | ||
PT | 07.12.2020 | ||
GB | 27.02.2021 | ||
IE | 27.02.2021 | ||
LU | 27.02.2021 | ||
BE | 28.02.2021 | ||
CH | 28.02.2021 | ||
FR | 28.02.2021 | ||
LI | 28.02.2021 | ||
Former [2024/22] | HU | 27.02.2012 | |
AL | 05.08.2020 | ||
AT | 05.08.2020 | ||
CY | 05.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 05.08.2020 | ||
DK | 05.08.2020 | ||
EE | 05.08.2020 | ||
ES | 05.08.2020 | ||
FI | 05.08.2020 | ||
HR | 05.08.2020 | ||
IT | 05.08.2020 | ||
LT | 05.08.2020 | ||
LV | 05.08.2020 | ||
MC | 05.08.2020 | ||
MK | 05.08.2020 | ||
NL | 05.08.2020 | ||
PL | 05.08.2020 | ||
RO | 05.08.2020 | ||
RS | 05.08.2020 | ||
SE | 05.08.2020 | ||
SI | 05.08.2020 | ||
SK | 05.08.2020 | ||
SM | 05.08.2020 | ||
BG | 05.11.2020 | ||
NO | 05.11.2020 | ||
GR | 06.11.2020 | ||
IS | 05.12.2020 | ||
PT | 07.12.2020 | ||
GB | 27.02.2021 | ||
IE | 27.02.2021 | ||
LU | 27.02.2021 | ||
BE | 28.02.2021 | ||
CH | 28.02.2021 | ||
FR | 28.02.2021 | ||
LI | 28.02.2021 | ||
Former [2023/27] | HU | 27.02.2012 | |
AL | 05.08.2020 | ||
AT | 05.08.2020 | ||
CY | 05.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 05.08.2020 | ||
DK | 05.08.2020 | ||
EE | 05.08.2020 | ||
ES | 05.08.2020 | ||
FI | 05.08.2020 | ||
HR | 05.08.2020 | ||
IT | 05.08.2020 | ||
LT | 05.08.2020 | ||
LV | 05.08.2020 | ||
MC | 05.08.2020 | ||
NL | 05.08.2020 | ||
PL | 05.08.2020 | ||
RO | 05.08.2020 | ||
RS | 05.08.2020 | ||
SE | 05.08.2020 | ||
SI | 05.08.2020 | ||
SK | 05.08.2020 | ||
SM | 05.08.2020 | ||
BG | 05.11.2020 | ||
NO | 05.11.2020 | ||
GR | 06.11.2020 | ||
IS | 05.12.2020 | ||
PT | 07.12.2020 | ||
GB | 27.02.2021 | ||
IE | 27.02.2021 | ||
LU | 27.02.2021 | ||
BE | 28.02.2021 | ||
CH | 28.02.2021 | ||
FR | 28.02.2021 | ||
LI | 28.02.2021 | ||
Former [2023/24] | AL | 05.08.2020 | |
AT | 05.08.2020 | ||
CY | 05.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 05.08.2020 | ||
DK | 05.08.2020 | ||
EE | 05.08.2020 | ||
ES | 05.08.2020 | ||
FI | 05.08.2020 | ||
HR | 05.08.2020 | ||
IT | 05.08.2020 | ||
LT | 05.08.2020 | ||
LV | 05.08.2020 | ||
MC | 05.08.2020 | ||
NL | 05.08.2020 | ||
PL | 05.08.2020 | ||
RO | 05.08.2020 | ||
RS | 05.08.2020 | ||
SE | 05.08.2020 | ||
SI | 05.08.2020 | ||
SK | 05.08.2020 | ||
SM | 05.08.2020 | ||
BG | 05.11.2020 | ||
NO | 05.11.2020 | ||
GR | 06.11.2020 | ||
IS | 05.12.2020 | ||
PT | 07.12.2020 | ||
GB | 27.02.2021 | ||
IE | 27.02.2021 | ||
LU | 27.02.2021 | ||
BE | 28.02.2021 | ||
CH | 28.02.2021 | ||
FR | 28.02.2021 | ||
LI | 28.02.2021 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AL | 05.08.2020 | |
AT | 05.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 05.08.2020 | ||
DK | 05.08.2020 | ||
EE | 05.08.2020 | ||
ES | 05.08.2020 | ||
FI | 05.08.2020 | ||
HR | 05.08.2020 | ||
IT | 05.08.2020 | ||
LT | 05.08.2020 | ||
LV | 05.08.2020 | ||
MC | 05.08.2020 | ||
NL | 05.08.2020 | ||
PL | 05.08.2020 | ||
RO | 05.08.2020 | ||
RS | 05.08.2020 | ||
SE | 05.08.2020 | ||
SI | 05.08.2020 | ||
SK | 05.08.2020 | ||
SM | 05.08.2020 | ||
BG | 05.11.2020 | ||
NO | 05.11.2020 | ||
GR | 06.11.2020 | ||
IS | 05.12.2020 | ||
PT | 07.12.2020 | ||
GB | 27.02.2021 | ||
IE | 27.02.2021 | ||
LU | 27.02.2021 | ||
BE | 28.02.2021 | ||
CH | 28.02.2021 | ||
FR | 28.02.2021 | ||
LI | 28.02.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AL | 05.08.2020 | |
AT | 05.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 05.08.2020 | ||
DK | 05.08.2020 | ||
EE | 05.08.2020 | ||
ES | 05.08.2020 | ||
FI | 05.08.2020 | ||
HR | 05.08.2020 | ||
IT | 05.08.2020 | ||
LT | 05.08.2020 | ||
LV | 05.08.2020 | ||
MC | 05.08.2020 | ||
NL | 05.08.2020 | ||
PL | 05.08.2020 | ||
RO | 05.08.2020 | ||
RS | 05.08.2020 | ||
SE | 05.08.2020 | ||
SI | 05.08.2020 | ||
SK | 05.08.2020 | ||
SM | 05.08.2020 | ||
BG | 05.11.2020 | ||
NO | 05.11.2020 | ||
GR | 06.11.2020 | ||
IS | 05.12.2020 | ||
PT | 07.12.2020 | ||
GB | 27.02.2021 | ||
IE | 27.02.2021 | ||
LU | 27.02.2021 | ||
CH | 28.02.2021 | ||
FR | 28.02.2021 | ||
LI | 28.02.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AL | 05.08.2020 | |
AT | 05.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 05.08.2020 | ||
DK | 05.08.2020 | ||
EE | 05.08.2020 | ||
ES | 05.08.2020 | ||
FI | 05.08.2020 | ||
HR | 05.08.2020 | ||
IT | 05.08.2020 | ||
LT | 05.08.2020 | ||
LV | 05.08.2020 | ||
MC | 05.08.2020 | ||
NL | 05.08.2020 | ||
PL | 05.08.2020 | ||
RO | 05.08.2020 | ||
RS | 05.08.2020 | ||
SE | 05.08.2020 | ||
SI | 05.08.2020 | ||
SK | 05.08.2020 | ||
SM | 05.08.2020 | ||
BG | 05.11.2020 | ||
NO | 05.11.2020 | ||
GR | 06.11.2020 | ||
IS | 05.12.2020 | ||
PT | 07.12.2020 | ||
IE | 27.02.2021 | ||
LU | 27.02.2021 | ||
CH | 28.02.2021 | ||
FR | 28.02.2021 | ||
LI | 28.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/47] | AL | 05.08.2020 | |
AT | 05.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 05.08.2020 | ||
DK | 05.08.2020 | ||
EE | 05.08.2020 | ||
ES | 05.08.2020 | ||
FI | 05.08.2020 | ||
HR | 05.08.2020 | ||
IT | 05.08.2020 | ||
LT | 05.08.2020 | ||
LV | 05.08.2020 | ||
MC | 05.08.2020 | ||
NL | 05.08.2020 | ||
PL | 05.08.2020 | ||
RO | 05.08.2020 | ||
RS | 05.08.2020 | ||
SE | 05.08.2020 | ||
SI | 05.08.2020 | ||
SK | 05.08.2020 | ||
SM | 05.08.2020 | ||
BG | 05.11.2020 | ||
NO | 05.11.2020 | ||
GR | 06.11.2020 | ||
IS | 05.12.2020 | ||
PT | 07.12.2020 | ||
LU | 27.02.2021 | ||
CH | 28.02.2021 | ||
LI | 28.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/41] | AL | 05.08.2020 | |
AT | 05.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 05.08.2020 | ||
DK | 05.08.2020 | ||
EE | 05.08.2020 | ||
ES | 05.08.2020 | ||
FI | 05.08.2020 | ||
HR | 05.08.2020 | ||
IT | 05.08.2020 | ||
LT | 05.08.2020 | ||
LV | 05.08.2020 | ||
MC | 05.08.2020 | ||
NL | 05.08.2020 | ||
PL | 05.08.2020 | ||
RO | 05.08.2020 | ||
RS | 05.08.2020 | ||
SE | 05.08.2020 | ||
SI | 05.08.2020 | ||
SK | 05.08.2020 | ||
SM | 05.08.2020 | ||
BG | 05.11.2020 | ||
NO | 05.11.2020 | ||
GR | 06.11.2020 | ||
IS | 05.12.2020 | ||
PT | 07.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AL | 05.08.2020 | |
AT | 05.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 05.08.2020 | ||
DK | 05.08.2020 | ||
EE | 05.08.2020 | ||
ES | 05.08.2020 | ||
FI | 05.08.2020 | ||
HR | 05.08.2020 | ||
IT | 05.08.2020 | ||
LT | 05.08.2020 | ||
LV | 05.08.2020 | ||
NL | 05.08.2020 | ||
PL | 05.08.2020 | ||
RO | 05.08.2020 | ||
RS | 05.08.2020 | ||
SE | 05.08.2020 | ||
SI | 05.08.2020 | ||
SK | 05.08.2020 | ||
SM | 05.08.2020 | ||
BG | 05.11.2020 | ||
NO | 05.11.2020 | ||
GR | 06.11.2020 | ||
IS | 05.12.2020 | ||
PT | 07.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/34] | AL | 05.08.2020 | |
AT | 05.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 05.08.2020 | ||
DK | 05.08.2020 | ||
EE | 05.08.2020 | ||
ES | 05.08.2020 | ||
FI | 05.08.2020 | ||
HR | 05.08.2020 | ||
IT | 05.08.2020 | ||
LT | 05.08.2020 | ||
LV | 05.08.2020 | ||
NL | 05.08.2020 | ||
PL | 05.08.2020 | ||
RO | 05.08.2020 | ||
RS | 05.08.2020 | ||
SE | 05.08.2020 | ||
SK | 05.08.2020 | ||
SM | 05.08.2020 | ||
BG | 05.11.2020 | ||
NO | 05.11.2020 | ||
GR | 06.11.2020 | ||
IS | 05.12.2020 | ||
PT | 07.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/28] | AL | 05.08.2020 | |
AT | 05.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 05.08.2020 | ||
DK | 05.08.2020 | ||
EE | 05.08.2020 | ||
ES | 05.08.2020 | ||
FI | 05.08.2020 | ||
HR | 05.08.2020 | ||
LT | 05.08.2020 | ||
LV | 05.08.2020 | ||
NL | 05.08.2020 | ||
PL | 05.08.2020 | ||
RO | 05.08.2020 | ||
RS | 05.08.2020 | ||
SE | 05.08.2020 | ||
SK | 05.08.2020 | ||
SM | 05.08.2020 | ||
BG | 05.11.2020 | ||
NO | 05.11.2020 | ||
GR | 06.11.2020 | ||
IS | 05.12.2020 | ||
PT | 07.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/25] | AL | 05.08.2020 | |
AT | 05.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 05.08.2020 | ||
DK | 05.08.2020 | ||
EE | 05.08.2020 | ||
ES | 05.08.2020 | ||
FI | 05.08.2020 | ||
HR | 05.08.2020 | ||
LT | 05.08.2020 | ||
LV | 05.08.2020 | ||
NL | 05.08.2020 | ||
PL | 05.08.2020 | ||
RO | 05.08.2020 | ||
RS | 05.08.2020 | ||
SE | 05.08.2020 | ||
SM | 05.08.2020 | ||
BG | 05.11.2020 | ||
NO | 05.11.2020 | ||
GR | 06.11.2020 | ||
IS | 05.12.2020 | ||
PT | 07.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/23] | AT | 05.08.2020 | |
CZ | 05.08.2020 | ||
DK | 05.08.2020 | ||
EE | 05.08.2020 | ||
ES | 05.08.2020 | ||
FI | 05.08.2020 | ||
HR | 05.08.2020 | ||
LT | 05.08.2020 | ||
LV | 05.08.2020 | ||
NL | 05.08.2020 | ||
PL | 05.08.2020 | ||
RO | 05.08.2020 | ||
RS | 05.08.2020 | ||
SE | 05.08.2020 | ||
SM | 05.08.2020 | ||
BG | 05.11.2020 | ||
NO | 05.11.2020 | ||
GR | 06.11.2020 | ||
IS | 05.12.2020 | ||
PT | 07.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/22] | AT | 05.08.2020 | |
CZ | 05.08.2020 | ||
DK | 05.08.2020 | ||
EE | 05.08.2020 | ||
ES | 05.08.2020 | ||
FI | 05.08.2020 | ||
HR | 05.08.2020 | ||
LT | 05.08.2020 | ||
LV | 05.08.2020 | ||
NL | 05.08.2020 | ||
PL | 05.08.2020 | ||
RO | 05.08.2020 | ||
RS | 05.08.2020 | ||
SE | 05.08.2020 | ||
BG | 05.11.2020 | ||
NO | 05.11.2020 | ||
GR | 06.11.2020 | ||
IS | 05.12.2020 | ||
PT | 07.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AT | 05.08.2020 | |
DK | 05.08.2020 | ||
ES | 05.08.2020 | ||
FI | 05.08.2020 | ||
HR | 05.08.2020 | ||
LT | 05.08.2020 | ||
LV | 05.08.2020 | ||
NL | 05.08.2020 | ||
PL | 05.08.2020 | ||
RS | 05.08.2020 | ||
SE | 05.08.2020 | ||
BG | 05.11.2020 | ||
NO | 05.11.2020 | ||
GR | 06.11.2020 | ||
IS | 05.12.2020 | ||
PT | 07.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/12] | AT | 05.08.2020 | |
ES | 05.08.2020 | ||
FI | 05.08.2020 | ||
HR | 05.08.2020 | ||
LT | 05.08.2020 | ||
LV | 05.08.2020 | ||
NL | 05.08.2020 | ||
PL | 05.08.2020 | ||
RS | 05.08.2020 | ||
SE | 05.08.2020 | ||
BG | 05.11.2020 | ||
NO | 05.11.2020 | ||
GR | 06.11.2020 | ||
IS | 05.12.2020 | ||
PT | 07.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AT | 05.08.2020 | |
ES | 05.08.2020 | ||
FI | 05.08.2020 | ||
HR | 05.08.2020 | ||
LT | 05.08.2020 | ||
LV | 05.08.2020 | ||
PL | 05.08.2020 | ||
RS | 05.08.2020 | ||
SE | 05.08.2020 | ||
BG | 05.11.2020 | ||
NO | 05.11.2020 | ||
GR | 06.11.2020 | ||
IS | 05.12.2020 | ||
PT | 07.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AT | 05.08.2020 | |
ES | 05.08.2020 | ||
FI | 05.08.2020 | ||
LT | 05.08.2020 | ||
SE | 05.08.2020 | ||
BG | 05.11.2020 | ||
NO | 05.11.2020 | ||
GR | 06.11.2020 | ||
PT | 07.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | ES | 05.08.2020 | |
FI | 05.08.2020 | ||
LT | 05.08.2020 | ||
SE | 05.08.2020 | ||
BG | 05.11.2020 | ||
NO | 05.11.2020 | ||
PT | 07.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/07] | FI | 05.08.2020 | |
LT | 05.08.2020 | ||
NO | 05.11.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]EP0277824 (REILLY TAR & CHEM CORP [US]) [AD] 1-4 * example 14; claims 1,2 *; | [E]JP2012081440 (CHIYODA CHEM ENG CONSTRUCT CO) [E] 1-4* the whole document *; | [XY] - RODRIGUES A S S ET AL, "Quaternization Reaction of 2-Vinylpyridine and 4-Vinylpyridine Network Copolymers for 4-Nitrophenol Adsorption", JOURNAL OF THE BRAZILIAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, (200703), vol. 18, no. 2, doi:10.1590/S0103-50532007000200028, ISSN 0103-5053, pages 431 - 436, XP002682307 [X] 1-3 * pages 431-434; figures 1,2; tables 1,2 * [Y] 4 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1590/S0103-50532007000200028 | [XYI] - MALIK M A ET AL, "Ion-exchange properties of 4-vinylpyridine-divinylbenzene-based anion exchangers for ferric chloride complex anions", REACTIVE & FUNCTIONAL POLYMERS, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS BV, NL, (20020601), vol. 51, no. 2-3, doi:10.1016/S1381-5148(02)00036-6, ISSN 1381-5148, pages 117 - 120, XP004355417 [X] 1,2 * the whole document * [Y] 4 [I] 3 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1381-5148(02)00036-6 | [Y] - JOSÉ M PINTO ET AL, "Optimization of a cocktail of initiators for suspension polymerization of vinyl chloride in batch reactors", CHEMICAL ENGINEERING SCIENCE, (20010201), vol. 56, no. 3, doi:10.1016/S0009-2509(00)00317-1, ISSN 0009-2509, pages 1021 - 1028, XP055036011 [Y] 4 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0009-2509(00)00317-1 | [XA] - Malik M A, "Macroporous 4-vinylpyridine-divinylbenzene - Estimation of pore volume, surface area, and pore size distribution", E-Polymers, vol. 2006, ISSN 1618-7229, (20060719), Database accession no. 40, pages 1 - 8, URL: http://www.e-polymers.org/journal/papers/mamalik_190706.pdf, (20120821), XP002682308 [X] 2,3 * abstract * * pages 2-5; figures 2-4; table 1 * [A] 1,4 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1515/epoly.2006.6.1.524 | [XA] - MALIK M A ET AL, "Porous 4-Vinylpyridine-Divinylbenzene Copolymers Varying Porosity in Different Bead Sizes of a Single Batch", E-POLYMERS, vol. 2007, ISSN 1618-7229, (20071123), Database accession no. 135, pages 1 - 7, URL: http://www.e-polymers.org/journal/papers/mamalik_231107.pdf, (20120821), XP002682309 [X] 2 * page 2; table 1 * [A] 1,3,4 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1515/epoly.2007.7.1.1586 | [A] - ARSHADY R, "THE SYNTHESIS OF POLYMER SUPPORTS", ADVANCED MATERIALS, WILEY VCH VERLAG, DE, (19910401), vol. 3, no. 4, doi:10.1002/ADMA.19910030403, ISSN 0935-9648, pages 182 - 190, XP000306851 [A] 1-4 * page 185; figure 5; table 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/adma.19910030403 | [A] - ARSHADY R, "Suspension, emulsion, and dispersion polymerization: A methodological survey", COLLOID & POLYMER SCIENCE, (1992), vol. 270, no. 8, doi:10.1007/BF00776142, pages 717 - 732, XP002682310 [A] 1-4 * pages 717-723; figures 1,5 * * page 728; figure 14 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF00776142 | [A] - GIAMMATTEO ET AL, "Cross-linked poly-4-vinylpyridines as useful supports in metal catalysis: micro- and nanometer scale morphology", JOURNAL OF MOLECULAR CATALYSIS A: CHEMICAL, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20070330), vol. 268, no. 1-2, doi:10.1016/J.MOLCATA.2006.12.014, ISSN 1381-1169, pages 176 - 184, XP022008481 [A] 1 * pages 178-181; figures 1-3; tables 1-5 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.molcata.2006.12.014 | [A] - DOMBROWSKI R J ET AL, "A two-stage Horvath-Kawazoe adsorption model for pore size distribution analysis", STUDIES IN SURFACE SCIENCE AND CATALYSIS, (2002), vol. 144, doi:10.1016/S0167-2991(02)80225-7, pages 99 - 106, XP002682311 [A] 1 * page 99 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0167-2991(02)80225-7 | [A] - HERBERT GIESCHE, "Mercury Porosimetry: A General (Practical) Overview", PARTICLE & PARTICLE SYSTEMS CHARACTERIZATION, (20060601), vol. 23, no. 1, doi:10.1002/ppsc.200601009, ISSN 0934-0866, pages 9 - 19, XP055036551 [A] 1 * page 9 * * section 5.2: Compressibility; page 13 * * section 6.3: Surface Area; page 14 * * section 7: Conclusions; pages 17-18 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/ppsc.200601009 | [A] - Anonymous, "Autosorb-1 Series", (20080810), Quantachrome Instruments (Company Brochure), URL: http://www.quantachrome.com/pdf_brochures/07101.pdf, (20080823), XP002682312 [A] 1 * the whole document * | by applicant | JPS473334 | JPS6125731 | JPS63253047 | JPH05306253 | JPH05306254 | JPH06315637 |