EP2472473 - Image analysis device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.04.2017 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Olympus Corporation 2951 Ishikawa-machi, Hachioji-shi Tokyo 192-8507 / JP | [2016/40] |
Former [2016/39] | For all designated states Olympus Corporation 43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | ||
Former [2015/44] | For all designated states Olympus Corporation 43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [2012/27] | For all designated states Olympus Medical Systems Corp. 43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tanaka, Hideki OLYMPUS CORPORATION 2951 Ishikawa-machi Hachioji-shi, Tokyo 195-8507 / JP | 02 /
Nishimura, Hirokazu OLYMPUS CORPORATION 2951 Ishikawa-machi Hachioji-shi, Tokyo 195-8507 / JP | 03 /
Nakamura, Kenji OLYMPUS CORPORATION 2951 Ishikawa-machi Hachioji-shi, Tokyo 195-8507 / JP | 04 /
Inoue, Ryoko OLYMPUS CORPORATION 2951 Ishikawa-machi Hachioji-shi, Tokyo 195-8507 / JP | 05 /
Sawa, Miho OLYMPUS CORPORATION 2951 Ishikawa-machi Hachioji-shi, Tokyo 195-8507 / JP | [2016/43] |
Former [2016/25] | 01 /
Tanaka, Hideki c/o OLYMPUS MEDICAL SYSTEMS CORP. 43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | ||
02 /
Nishimura, Hirokazu c/o OLYMPUS MEDICAL SYSTEMS CORP. 43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | |||
03 /
Nakamura, Kenji c/o OLYMPUS MEDICAL SYSTEMS CORP. 43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | |||
04 /
Inoue, Ryoko c/o OLYMPUS MEDICAL SYSTEMS CORP. 43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | |||
05 /
Sawa, Miho c/o OLYMPUS MEDICAL SYSTEMS CORP. 43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | |||
Former [2012/27] | 01 /
Tanaka, Hideki c/o Olympus Medical Systems Corp. 43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | ||
02 /
Nishimura, Hirokazu c/o Olympus Medical Systems Corp. 43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | |||
03 /
Nakamura, Kenji c/o Olympus Medical Systems Corp. 43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | |||
04 /
Inoue, Ryoko c/o Olympus Medical Systems Corp. 43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | |||
05 /
Sawa, Miho c/o Olympus Medical Systems Corp. 43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | Representative(s) | Frenkel, Matthias Alexander Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/25] | Frenkel, Matthias Alexander Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | ||
Former [2012/27] | Frenkel, Matthias Alexander Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12001445.1 | 05.03.2007 | [2012/27] | Priority number, date | JP20060069818 | 14.03.2006 Original published format: JP 2006069818 | [2012/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2472473 | Date: | 04.07.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2472473 | Date: | 22.06.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.06.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G06T7/00, G06K9/46 | [2012/27] | CPC: |
G06T7/0012 (EP,US);
G06T7/74 (EP,US);
G06V10/443 (EP,US);
G06T2207/10068 (EP,US);
G06T2207/30028 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2012/27] | Title | German: | Bildanalysevorrichtung | [2012/27] | English: | Image analysis device | [2012/27] | French: | Dispositif d'analyse d'images | [2012/27] | Examination procedure | 02.03.2012 | Examination requested [2012/27] | 19.10.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.11.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.02.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.12.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.03.2016 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 28.04.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.05.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 11.05.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.05.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP07737789.3 / EP1994880 | Opposition(s) | 23.03.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 19.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 17.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 05.03.2007 | AT | 22.06.2016 | BE | 22.06.2016 | BG | 22.06.2016 | CY | 22.06.2016 | CZ | 22.06.2016 | DK | 22.06.2016 | EE | 22.06.2016 | ES | 22.06.2016 | FI | 22.06.2016 | IT | 22.06.2016 | LT | 22.06.2016 | LV | 22.06.2016 | MC | 22.06.2016 | NL | 22.06.2016 | PL | 22.06.2016 | RO | 22.06.2016 | SE | 22.06.2016 | SI | 22.06.2016 | SK | 22.06.2016 | TR | 22.06.2016 | GR | 23.09.2016 | IS | 22.10.2016 | PT | 24.10.2016 | GB | 05.03.2017 | IE | 05.03.2017 | LU | 05.03.2017 | MT | 05.03.2017 | [2020/15] |
Former [2019/46] | HU | 05.03.2007 | |
AT | 22.06.2016 | ||
BE | 22.06.2016 | ||
BG | 22.06.2016 | ||
CY | 22.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 22.06.2016 | ||
DK | 22.06.2016 | ||
EE | 22.06.2016 | ||
ES | 22.06.2016 | ||
FI | 22.06.2016 | ||
IT | 22.06.2016 | ||
LT | 22.06.2016 | ||
LV | 22.06.2016 | ||
MC | 22.06.2016 | ||
NL | 22.06.2016 | ||
PL | 22.06.2016 | ||
RO | 22.06.2016 | ||
SE | 22.06.2016 | ||
SI | 22.06.2016 | ||
SK | 22.06.2016 | ||
GR | 23.09.2016 | ||
IS | 22.10.2016 | ||
PT | 24.10.2016 | ||
GB | 05.03.2017 | ||
IE | 05.03.2017 | ||
LU | 05.03.2017 | ||
MT | 05.03.2017 | ||
Former [2019/39] | HU | 05.03.2007 | |
AT | 22.06.2016 | ||
BE | 22.06.2016 | ||
BG | 22.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 22.06.2016 | ||
DK | 22.06.2016 | ||
EE | 22.06.2016 | ||
ES | 22.06.2016 | ||
FI | 22.06.2016 | ||
IT | 22.06.2016 | ||
LT | 22.06.2016 | ||
LV | 22.06.2016 | ||
MC | 22.06.2016 | ||
NL | 22.06.2016 | ||
PL | 22.06.2016 | ||
RO | 22.06.2016 | ||
SE | 22.06.2016 | ||
SI | 22.06.2016 | ||
SK | 22.06.2016 | ||
GR | 23.09.2016 | ||
IS | 22.10.2016 | ||
PT | 24.10.2016 | ||
GB | 05.03.2017 | ||
IE | 05.03.2017 | ||
LU | 05.03.2017 | ||
MT | 05.03.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 05.03.2007 | |
AT | 22.06.2016 | ||
BE | 22.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 22.06.2016 | ||
DK | 22.06.2016 | ||
EE | 22.06.2016 | ||
ES | 22.06.2016 | ||
FI | 22.06.2016 | ||
IT | 22.06.2016 | ||
LT | 22.06.2016 | ||
LV | 22.06.2016 | ||
MC | 22.06.2016 | ||
NL | 22.06.2016 | ||
PL | 22.06.2016 | ||
RO | 22.06.2016 | ||
SE | 22.06.2016 | ||
SI | 22.06.2016 | ||
SK | 22.06.2016 | ||
GR | 23.09.2016 | ||
IS | 22.10.2016 | ||
PT | 24.10.2016 | ||
GB | 05.03.2017 | ||
IE | 05.03.2017 | ||
LU | 05.03.2017 | ||
MT | 05.03.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 22.06.2016 | |
BE | 22.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 22.06.2016 | ||
DK | 22.06.2016 | ||
EE | 22.06.2016 | ||
ES | 22.06.2016 | ||
FI | 22.06.2016 | ||
IT | 22.06.2016 | ||
LT | 22.06.2016 | ||
LV | 22.06.2016 | ||
MC | 22.06.2016 | ||
NL | 22.06.2016 | ||
PL | 22.06.2016 | ||
RO | 22.06.2016 | ||
SE | 22.06.2016 | ||
SI | 22.06.2016 | ||
SK | 22.06.2016 | ||
GR | 23.09.2016 | ||
IS | 22.10.2016 | ||
PT | 24.10.2016 | ||
GB | 05.03.2017 | ||
IE | 05.03.2017 | ||
LU | 05.03.2017 | ||
MT | 05.03.2017 | ||
Former [2018/13] | AT | 22.06.2016 | |
BE | 22.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 22.06.2016 | ||
DK | 22.06.2016 | ||
EE | 22.06.2016 | ||
ES | 22.06.2016 | ||
FI | 22.06.2016 | ||
IT | 22.06.2016 | ||
LT | 22.06.2016 | ||
LV | 22.06.2016 | ||
MC | 22.06.2016 | ||
NL | 22.06.2016 | ||
PL | 22.06.2016 | ||
RO | 22.06.2016 | ||
SE | 22.06.2016 | ||
SI | 22.06.2016 | ||
SK | 22.06.2016 | ||
GR | 23.09.2016 | ||
IS | 22.10.2016 | ||
PT | 24.10.2016 | ||
GB | 05.03.2017 | ||
IE | 05.03.2017 | ||
LU | 05.03.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 22.06.2016 | |
BE | 22.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 22.06.2016 | ||
DK | 22.06.2016 | ||
EE | 22.06.2016 | ||
ES | 22.06.2016 | ||
FI | 22.06.2016 | ||
IT | 22.06.2016 | ||
LT | 22.06.2016 | ||
LV | 22.06.2016 | ||
MC | 22.06.2016 | ||
NL | 22.06.2016 | ||
PL | 22.06.2016 | ||
RO | 22.06.2016 | ||
SE | 22.06.2016 | ||
SI | 22.06.2016 | ||
SK | 22.06.2016 | ||
GR | 23.09.2016 | ||
IS | 22.10.2016 | ||
PT | 24.10.2016 | ||
LU | 05.03.2017 | ||
Former [2018/01] | AT | 22.06.2016 | |
BE | 22.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 22.06.2016 | ||
DK | 22.06.2016 | ||
EE | 22.06.2016 | ||
ES | 22.06.2016 | ||
FI | 22.06.2016 | ||
IT | 22.06.2016 | ||
LT | 22.06.2016 | ||
LV | 22.06.2016 | ||
MC | 22.06.2016 | ||
NL | 22.06.2016 | ||
PL | 22.06.2016 | ||
RO | 22.06.2016 | ||
SE | 22.06.2016 | ||
SI | 22.06.2016 | ||
SK | 22.06.2016 | ||
GR | 23.09.2016 | ||
IS | 22.10.2016 | ||
PT | 24.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/38] | AT | 22.06.2016 | |
BE | 22.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 22.06.2016 | ||
DK | 22.06.2016 | ||
EE | 22.06.2016 | ||
ES | 22.06.2016 | ||
FI | 22.06.2016 | ||
IT | 22.06.2016 | ||
LT | 22.06.2016 | ||
LV | 22.06.2016 | ||
NL | 22.06.2016 | ||
PL | 22.06.2016 | ||
RO | 22.06.2016 | ||
SE | 22.06.2016 | ||
SI | 22.06.2016 | ||
SK | 22.06.2016 | ||
GR | 23.09.2016 | ||
IS | 22.10.2016 | ||
PT | 24.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | AT | 22.06.2016 | |
BE | 22.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 22.06.2016 | ||
EE | 22.06.2016 | ||
ES | 22.06.2016 | ||
FI | 22.06.2016 | ||
IT | 22.06.2016 | ||
LT | 22.06.2016 | ||
LV | 22.06.2016 | ||
NL | 22.06.2016 | ||
PL | 22.06.2016 | ||
RO | 22.06.2016 | ||
SE | 22.06.2016 | ||
SK | 22.06.2016 | ||
GR | 23.09.2016 | ||
IS | 22.10.2016 | ||
PT | 24.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | BE | 22.06.2016 | |
CZ | 22.06.2016 | ||
EE | 22.06.2016 | ||
FI | 22.06.2016 | ||
IT | 22.06.2016 | ||
LT | 22.06.2016 | ||
LV | 22.06.2016 | ||
NL | 22.06.2016 | ||
PL | 22.06.2016 | ||
RO | 22.06.2016 | ||
SE | 22.06.2016 | ||
SK | 22.06.2016 | ||
GR | 23.09.2016 | ||
IS | 22.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | CZ | 22.06.2016 | |
EE | 22.06.2016 | ||
FI | 22.06.2016 | ||
IT | 22.06.2016 | ||
LT | 22.06.2016 | ||
LV | 22.06.2016 | ||
NL | 22.06.2016 | ||
RO | 22.06.2016 | ||
SE | 22.06.2016 | ||
GR | 23.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/52] | FI | 22.06.2016 | |
LT | 22.06.2016 | ||
LV | 22.06.2016 | ||
NL | 22.06.2016 | ||
SE | 22.06.2016 | ||
GR | 23.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | FI | 22.06.2016 | |
LT | 22.06.2016 | ||
LV | 22.06.2016 | ||
GR | 23.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | FI | 22.06.2016 | |
LT | 22.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | LT | 22.06.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2005031648 (SIEMENS MEDICAL SOLUTIONS [US], et al) [X] 1,2 * page 6 - page 8; figure 1 *; | [A]WO2005050544 (SIEMENS CORP RES INC [US], et al) [A] 1,2* pages 6,7 *; | [X]WO2005101314 (GEN HOSPITAL CORP [US], et al) [X] 1,2 * paragraphs [0050] , [0 85] - [0089] * | by applicant | JP2005157902 | JP2006069818 | - DIGESTIVE ENDOSCOPY, (2001), vol. 13, no. 3, pages 349 - 354 |