EP2634351 - Joint fitting [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.08.2014 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.08.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.10.2014 [2014/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ehrmann, Fred Franz Heinrich Haselnussweg 2 69126 Heidelberg / DE | [2013/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ehrmann, Fred Franz Franklin Schlesierstrasse 2 69190 Walldorf / DE | [2013/36] | Representative(s) | Meyer-Roedern, Giso Bergheimer Strasse 10-12 69115 Heidelberg / DE | [2013/36] | Application number, filing date | 12001454.3 | 03.03.2012 | [2013/36] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2634351 | Date: | 04.09.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.06.2012 | Classification | IPC: | E06B7/36, E05D7/00, E05D7/08 | [2013/36] | CPC: |
E05D7/081 (EP);
E06B7/362 (EP);
E05D11/1028 (EP);
E05D7/009 (EP);
E05Y2800/262 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/36] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Gelenkbeschlag | [2013/36] | English: | Joint fitting | [2013/36] | French: | Système d'articulation | [2013/36] | Examination procedure | 05.03.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/40] | 14.04.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2014/40] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2014 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP2071114 (DORMA GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [X] 1-4,6-8,10 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] , [0022] * [I] 5,9 | by applicant | DE29804499U | DE29622610U | DE7730007U | DE19526618 |