EP2637000 - A weighing platform and a weighing system for dynamically weighing items [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.08.2014 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.09.2014 [2014/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Marel Iceland EHF Austurhraun 9 210 Gardabaer / IS | [2013/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Olafsson, Jon Thor Gigjulundi 8 210 Gardabaer / IS | [2013/37] | Representative(s) | Olesen, Kaj, et al Patentgruppen A/S Arosgaarden Aaboulevarden 31 8000 Aarhus C / DK | [2013/37] | Application number, filing date | 12001609.2 | 08.03.2012 | [2013/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2637000 | Date: | 11.09.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.08.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G01G11/00 | [2013/37] | CPC: |
G01G11/003 (EP,US);
G01G19/414 (US);
G01G21/23 (US);
G01G11/16 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/37] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Wiegeplattform und Wiegesystem zum dynamischen Wiegen von Artikeln | [2013/37] | English: | A weighing platform and a weighing system for dynamically weighing items | [2013/37] | French: | Plateforme de pesée et système de pesage d'éléments de pesage dynamiques | [2013/37] | Examination procedure | 12.03.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/38] | 22.04.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2014/38] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2014 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]GB1584981 (DAVY INSTR LTD) [X] 1 * figure 3 * * page 1, line 9 - line 35 * [I] 2-15; | [X]US5877456 (HOMER III JOHN C [US], et al) [X] 1 * abstract * * column 6, line 7 - line 23 *; | [X]US2003056995 (JOHNSON THOMAS HOWARD [US]) [X] 1 * abstract * |