10.07.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] |
26.06.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] |
05.06.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.07.2020 [2020/28] |
29.05.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.07.2020 [2020/27] |
13.03.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.04.2020 [2020/16] |
11.10.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.11.2019 [2019/46] |
22.02.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.03.2019 [2019/13] |
15.02.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.03.2019 [2019/12] |
25.01.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.02.2019 [2019/09] |
21.12.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.01.2019 [2019/04] |
23.11.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.12.2018 [2018/52] |
21.09.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.10.2018 [2018/43] |
24.08.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.09.2018 [2018/39] |
29.06.2018 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 01.08.2018 [2018/31] |
08.06.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.07.2018 [2018/28] |
01.06.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.07.2018 [2018/27] |
25.05.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.06.2018 [2018/26] |
11.05.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.06.2018 [2018/24] |
04.05.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.06.2018 [2018/23] |
20.04.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.05.2018 [2018/21] |
09.03.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.04.2018 [2018/15] |
23.02.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.03.2018 [2018/13] |
16.02.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.03.2018 [2018/12] |
09.02.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.03.2018 [2018/11] |
26.01.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.02.2018 [2018/09] |
19.01.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.02.2018 [2018/08] |
12.01.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.02.2018 [2018/07] |
21.07.2017 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 23.08.2017 [2017/34] |
19.07.2017 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
19.07.2017 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
18.07.2017 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
03.04.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
20.03.2017 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
06.04.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
01.05.2015 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 03.06.2015 [2015/23] |
01.05.2015 |
Change - designated states |
published on 03.06.2015 [2015/23] |
28.04.2015 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
02.04.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
19.09.2014 |
Publication of search report |
published on 22.10.2014 [2014/43] |
19.09.2014 |
Change - classification |
published on 22.10.2014 [2014/43] |
19.09.2014 |
Change - classification |
published on 22.10.2014 [2014/43] |
29.03.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
11.09.2012 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 12.09.2012 [2012/37] |