Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL2497858T | 30.03.2018 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP12001624 | 09.03.2012 | DE102011013721 | 11.03.2011 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2497858 | Global Dossier | 23.08.2017 | B1 | EP2497858 | 22.10.2014 | A3 | EP2497858 | 12.09.2012 | A2 | Priority number | Date | DE102011013721 | 11.03.2011 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE102011013721 | 13.09.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102011013721 | 11.03.2011 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2642769T | 20.11.2017 | T3 | Priority number | Date | DE102011013721 | 11.03.2011 |