23.07.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.08.2021 [2021/34] |
09.07.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.08.2021 [2021/32] |
28.05.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.06.2021 [2021/26] |
20.03.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.04.2020 [2020/17] |
28.02.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.04.2020 [2020/14] |
09.08.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.09.2019 [2019/37] |
19.07.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.08.2019 [2019/34] |
12.07.2019 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 14.08.2019 [2019/33] |
24.05.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.06.2019 [2019/26] |
10.05.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.06.2019 [2019/24] |
03.05.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.06.2019 [2019/23] |
26.04.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.05.2019 [2019/22] |
19.04.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.05.2019 [2019/21] |
12.04.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.05.2019 [2019/20] |
22.02.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.03.2019 [2019/13] |
08.02.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.03.2019 [2019/11] |
01.02.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.03.2019 [2019/10] |
18.01.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.02.2019 [2019/08] |
11.01.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.02.2019 [2019/07] |
03.08.2018 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 05.09.2018 [2018/36] |
31.07.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
12.06.2018 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
12.06.2018 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
11.06.2018 |
Change: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
11.06.2018 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
29.01.2018 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
27.07.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
20.03.2017 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
18.11.2016 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
26.07.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
17.06.2016 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
20.04.2016 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
15.12.2015 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
04.12.2015 |
First examination report |
|
27.07.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
26.07.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
07.08.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
11.01.2013 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 13.02.2013 [2013/07] |
04.01.2013 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
06.08.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
03.08.2012 |
Change - inventor |
published on 05.09.2012 [2012/36] |
19.06.2012 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 20.06.2012 [2012/25] |
23.03.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|