Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2466694 | Global Dossier | 05.09.2018 | B1 | EP2466694 | 20.06.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2006199815 | 21.07.2006 | EP07013726 | 12.07.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7794276 | Global Dossier | 14.09.2010 | B2 | US2008020619 | 24.01.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2006199815 | 21.07.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR100908534B | Global Dossier | 20.07.2009 | B1 | KR20080008961 | 24.01.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2006199815 | 21.07.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4175402B | Global Dossier | 05.11.2008 | B2 | JP2008023112 | 07.02.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2006199815 | 21.07.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1881567 | Global Dossier | 23.05.2012 | B1 | EP1881567 | 23.01.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2006199815 | 21.07.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101111134 | 23.01.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2006199815 | 21.07.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN201069885Y | 04.06.2008 | Y | Priority number | Date | JP2006199815 | 21.07.2006 | Type | Earlier application | EP1881567 |