EP2505328 - Method for producing a foamed plastic board and plastic board produced according to the method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.08.2015 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VPW Nink GmbH Allstedter Strasse 71 06526 Sangerhausen / DE | [2012/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Deinert, Jürgen Tiftlingeröder Strasse 14 37115 Duderstadt / DE | 02 /
Würz, Peter Von Galen Strasse 32 48712 Gescher / DE | [2012/40] | Representative(s) | Lins, Edgar, et al Gramm, Lins & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Theodor-Heuss-Strasse 1 38122 Braunschweig / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/40] | Lins, Edgar, et al Gramm, Lins & Partner GbR Theodor-Heuss-Strasse 1 38122 Braunschweig / DE | ||
Former [2012/40] | Lins, Edgar, et al Gramm, Lins & Partner GbR Theodor-Heuss-Strasse 1 38122 Braunschweig / DE | Application number, filing date | 12001976.5 | 21.03.2012 | [2012/40] | Priority number, date | DE20111015511 | 28.03.2011 Original published format: DE102011015511 | [2012/40] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2505328 | Date: | 03.10.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2505328 | Date: | 16.10.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2505328 | Date: | 01.10.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.09.2013 | Classification | IPC: | B29C44/12, B29C44/34, C08J9/00 | [2013/42] | CPC: |
B29C44/12 (EP);
B29C44/3469 (EP);
C08J9/0066 (EP);
C08J2203/02 (EP);
C08J2203/06 (EP);
C08J2203/14 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2012/40] | B29C44/12, B29C44/34 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/40] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung einer geschäumten Kunststoffplatte und nach dem Verfahren herstellbare Kunststoffplatte | [2012/40] | English: | Method for producing a foamed plastic board and plastic board produced according to the method | [2012/40] | French: | Procédé de fabrication d'une plaque en matière synthétique expansée et plaque en matière synthétique pouvant être fabriquée selon ce procédé | [2012/40] | Examination procedure | 13.11.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.11.2013 | Examination requested [2013/52] | 25.04.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.08.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 20.08.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.08.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.04.2014 | Opposition(s) | 02.07.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 01.10.2014 | BG | 01.10.2014 | CY | 01.10.2014 | EE | 01.10.2014 | ES | 01.10.2014 | FI | 01.10.2014 | HR | 01.10.2014 | IT | 01.10.2014 | LT | 01.10.2014 | LV | 01.10.2014 | MC | 01.10.2014 | MK | 01.10.2014 | MT | 01.10.2014 | RO | 01.10.2014 | RS | 01.10.2014 | SI | 01.10.2014 | SK | 01.10.2014 | SM | 01.10.2014 | TR | 01.10.2014 | NO | 01.01.2015 | GR | 02.01.2015 | IS | 01.02.2015 | PT | 02.02.2015 | IE | 21.03.2015 | LU | 21.03.2015 | CH | 31.03.2015 | LI | 31.03.2015 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | BG | 01.10.2014 | |
CY | 01.10.2014 | ||
EE | 01.10.2014 | ||
ES | 01.10.2014 | ||
FI | 01.10.2014 | ||
HR | 01.10.2014 | ||
IT | 01.10.2014 | ||
LT | 01.10.2014 | ||
LV | 01.10.2014 | ||
MC | 01.10.2014 | ||
MK | 01.10.2014 | ||
MT | 01.10.2014 | ||
RO | 01.10.2014 | ||
RS | 01.10.2014 | ||
SI | 01.10.2014 | ||
SK | 01.10.2014 | ||
SM | 01.10.2014 | ||
TR | 01.10.2014 | ||
NO | 01.01.2015 | ||
GR | 02.01.2015 | ||
IS | 01.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.02.2015 | ||
IE | 21.03.2015 | ||
LU | 21.03.2015 | ||
CH | 31.03.2015 | ||
LI | 31.03.2015 | ||
Former [2017/38] | BG | 01.10.2014 | |
CY | 01.10.2014 | ||
EE | 01.10.2014 | ||
ES | 01.10.2014 | ||
FI | 01.10.2014 | ||
HR | 01.10.2014 | ||
IT | 01.10.2014 | ||
LT | 01.10.2014 | ||
LV | 01.10.2014 | ||
MC | 01.10.2014 | ||
MT | 01.10.2014 | ||
RO | 01.10.2014 | ||
RS | 01.10.2014 | ||
SI | 01.10.2014 | ||
SK | 01.10.2014 | ||
SM | 01.10.2014 | ||
TR | 01.10.2014 | ||
NO | 01.01.2015 | ||
GR | 02.01.2015 | ||
IS | 01.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.02.2015 | ||
IE | 21.03.2015 | ||
LU | 21.03.2015 | ||
CH | 31.03.2015 | ||
LI | 31.03.2015 | ||
Former [2017/03] | CY | 01.10.2014 | |
EE | 01.10.2014 | ||
ES | 01.10.2014 | ||
FI | 01.10.2014 | ||
HR | 01.10.2014 | ||
IT | 01.10.2014 | ||
LT | 01.10.2014 | ||
LV | 01.10.2014 | ||
MC | 01.10.2014 | ||
MT | 01.10.2014 | ||
RO | 01.10.2014 | ||
RS | 01.10.2014 | ||
SI | 01.10.2014 | ||
SK | 01.10.2014 | ||
NO | 01.01.2015 | ||
GR | 02.01.2015 | ||
IS | 01.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.02.2015 | ||
IE | 21.03.2015 | ||
LU | 21.03.2015 | ||
CH | 31.03.2015 | ||
LI | 31.03.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | CY | 01.10.2014 | |
EE | 01.10.2014 | ||
ES | 01.10.2014 | ||
FI | 01.10.2014 | ||
HR | 01.10.2014 | ||
IT | 01.10.2014 | ||
LT | 01.10.2014 | ||
LV | 01.10.2014 | ||
MC | 01.10.2014 | ||
RO | 01.10.2014 | ||
RS | 01.10.2014 | ||
SI | 01.10.2014 | ||
SK | 01.10.2014 | ||
NO | 01.01.2015 | ||
GR | 02.01.2015 | ||
IS | 01.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.02.2015 | ||
IE | 21.03.2015 | ||
LU | 21.03.2015 | ||
CH | 31.03.2015 | ||
LI | 31.03.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | CY | 01.10.2014 | |
EE | 01.10.2014 | ||
ES | 01.10.2014 | ||
FI | 01.10.2014 | ||
HR | 01.10.2014 | ||
IT | 01.10.2014 | ||
LT | 01.10.2014 | ||
LV | 01.10.2014 | ||
MC | 01.10.2014 | ||
RO | 01.10.2014 | ||
RS | 01.10.2014 | ||
SK | 01.10.2014 | ||
NO | 01.01.2015 | ||
GR | 02.01.2015 | ||
IS | 01.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.02.2015 | ||
IE | 21.03.2015 | ||
LU | 21.03.2015 | ||
CH | 31.03.2015 | ||
LI | 31.03.2015 | ||
Former [2016/06] | CY | 01.10.2014 | |
EE | 01.10.2014 | ||
ES | 01.10.2014 | ||
FI | 01.10.2014 | ||
HR | 01.10.2014 | ||
IT | 01.10.2014 | ||
LT | 01.10.2014 | ||
LV | 01.10.2014 | ||
MC | 01.10.2014 | ||
RO | 01.10.2014 | ||
RS | 01.10.2014 | ||
SK | 01.10.2014 | ||
NO | 01.01.2015 | ||
GR | 02.01.2015 | ||
IS | 01.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.02.2015 | ||
LU | 21.03.2015 | ||
CH | 31.03.2015 | ||
LI | 31.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/47] | CY | 01.10.2014 | |
EE | 01.10.2014 | ||
ES | 01.10.2014 | ||
FI | 01.10.2014 | ||
HR | 01.10.2014 | ||
IT | 01.10.2014 | ||
LT | 01.10.2014 | ||
LV | 01.10.2014 | ||
MC | 01.10.2014 | ||
RO | 01.10.2014 | ||
RS | 01.10.2014 | ||
SK | 01.10.2014 | ||
NO | 01.01.2015 | ||
GR | 02.01.2015 | ||
IS | 01.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.02.2015 | ||
LU | 21.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/46] | CY | 01.10.2014 | |
EE | 01.10.2014 | ||
ES | 01.10.2014 | ||
FI | 01.10.2014 | ||
HR | 01.10.2014 | ||
IT | 01.10.2014 | ||
LT | 01.10.2014 | ||
LV | 01.10.2014 | ||
MC | 01.10.2014 | ||
RO | 01.10.2014 | ||
RS | 01.10.2014 | ||
SK | 01.10.2014 | ||
NO | 01.01.2015 | ||
GR | 02.01.2015 | ||
IS | 01.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | CY | 01.10.2014 | |
EE | 01.10.2014 | ||
ES | 01.10.2014 | ||
FI | 01.10.2014 | ||
HR | 01.10.2014 | ||
IT | 01.10.2014 | ||
LT | 01.10.2014 | ||
LV | 01.10.2014 | ||
RO | 01.10.2014 | ||
RS | 01.10.2014 | ||
SK | 01.10.2014 | ||
NO | 01.01.2015 | ||
GR | 02.01.2015 | ||
IS | 01.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | CY | 01.10.2014 | |
EE | 01.10.2014 | ||
ES | 01.10.2014 | ||
FI | 01.10.2014 | ||
HR | 01.10.2014 | ||
LT | 01.10.2014 | ||
LV | 01.10.2014 | ||
RO | 01.10.2014 | ||
RS | 01.10.2014 | ||
NO | 01.01.2015 | ||
GR | 02.01.2015 | ||
IS | 01.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | CY | 01.10.2014 | |
EE | 01.10.2014 | ||
ES | 01.10.2014 | ||
FI | 01.10.2014 | ||
HR | 01.10.2014 | ||
LT | 01.10.2014 | ||
LV | 01.10.2014 | ||
RS | 01.10.2014 | ||
NO | 01.01.2015 | ||
GR | 02.01.2015 | ||
IS | 01.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/26] | CY | 01.10.2014 | |
ES | 01.10.2014 | ||
FI | 01.10.2014 | ||
HR | 01.10.2014 | ||
LT | 01.10.2014 | ||
LV | 01.10.2014 | ||
RS | 01.10.2014 | ||
NO | 01.01.2015 | ||
GR | 02.01.2015 | ||
IS | 01.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/24] | ES | 01.10.2014 | |
FI | 01.10.2014 | ||
HR | 01.10.2014 | ||
LT | 01.10.2014 | ||
LV | 01.10.2014 | ||
RS | 01.10.2014 | ||
NO | 01.01.2015 | ||
GR | 02.01.2015 | ||
IS | 01.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/23] | ES | 01.10.2014 | |
FI | 01.10.2014 | ||
LT | 01.10.2014 | ||
NO | 01.01.2015 | ||
IS | 01.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/22] | LT | 01.10.2014 | |
NO | 01.01.2015 | ||
PT | 02.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/21] | LT | 01.10.2014 | |
NO | 01.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/20] | LT | 01.10.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP0148693 (SHINETSU CHEMICAL CO [JP]) [X] 12 * page 3, lines 27-31 * * page 4, line 11 - page 5, line 4 * * page 9, line 9 - page 10, line 2 * * page 22, lines 20-26 * * table 1 * * claim 1 * [I] 1-11 |