Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2011050015 | Global Dossier | 05.07.2012 | A3 | WO2011050015 | 28.04.2011 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US60328509 | 21.10.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2011214732 | Global Dossier | 08.09.2011 | A1 | US8012788 | 06.09.2011 | B1 | Priority number | Date | US201113052618 | 21.03.2011 | US60328509 | 21.10.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7910396 | Global Dossier | 22.03.2011 | B2 | US2010294346 | 25.11.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US60328509 | 21.10.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2494614 | Global Dossier | 23.12.2020 | B1 | EP2494614 | 05.09.2012 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2010US53293 | 20.10.2010 | US60328509 | 21.10.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2854848T | 23.09.2021 | T3 | Priority number | Date | WO2010US53293 | 20.10.2010 | US60328509 | 21.10.2009 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2503589 | Global Dossier | 11.01.2017 | B1 | EP2503589 | 28.11.2012 | A3 | EP2503589 | 26.09.2012 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US201113052618 | 21.03.2011 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2620286T | 28.06.2017 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US201113052618 | 21.03.2011 |