EP2484743 - Liquid crystal display [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.06.2015 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 01.08.2018 [2018/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Merck Patent GmbH Frankfurter Strasse 250 64293 Darmstadt / DE | [2012/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Goetz, Achim Carlo-Mierendorf-Str. 14 64665 Alsbach-Haehnlein / DE | 02 /
Klasen-Memmer, Melanie Donnersberstr. 3 67259 Heuchelheim / DE | 03 /
Derow, Stephan Willy-Brandt-Allee 57 64347 Griesheim / DE | 04 /
Schoen, Sabine August-Schmidt-Str. 35 45701 Herten / DE | 05 /
Best, Peter Am Muehlrad 7 64832 Babenhausen-Hergershausen / DE | [2012/33] | Application number, filing date | 12002277.7 | 29.03.2010 | [2012/32] | Priority number, date | DE20091018625 | 23.04.2009 Original published format: DE102009018625 | [2012/32] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2484743 | Date: | 08.08.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/32] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2484743 | Date: | 16.01.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2484743 | Date: | 30.07.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.12.2012 | Classification | IPC: | C09K19/30, C09K19/12, C09K19/44, C09K19/34, C09K19/04, C09K19/54, G02F1/1337 | [2014/12] | CPC: |
C09K19/3003 (EP,KR,US);
C09K19/12 (EP,KR,US);
C09K19/3001 (EP,US);
C09K19/3066 (EP,US);
C09K19/3068 (EP,KR,US);
C09K19/3098 (EP,KR,US);
C09K19/3402 (EP,KR,US);
C09K19/44 (EP,KR,US);
G02F1/1337 (KR,US);
C09K2019/0407 (EP,KR,US);
C09K2019/0448 (EP,KR,US);
C09K2019/122 (EP,KR,US);
C09K2019/124 (EP,KR,US);
C09K2019/3015 (EP,US);
C09K2019/3021 (EP,US);
C09K2019/3025 (EP,US);
C09K2019/3422 (EP,US);
C09K2019/3425 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2013/03] | C09K19/30, C09K19/12, C09K19/44, C09K19/34 | ||
Former IPC [2012/32] | C09K19/30, C09K19/12, C09K19/44 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/32] | Title | German: | Flüssigkristallanzeige | [2012/32] | English: | Liquid crystal display | [2012/32] | French: | Dispositif d'affichage à base de cristaux liquides | [2014/12] |
Former [2012/32] | Affichage à cristaux liquides | Examination procedure | 30.03.2012 | Examination requested [2012/32] | 20.06.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.02.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.06.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 18.06.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.06.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP10003345.5 / EP2243812 | Opposition(s) | 04.05.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.03.2010 | CY | 30.07.2014 | CZ | 30.07.2014 | DK | 30.07.2014 | EE | 30.07.2014 | ES | 30.07.2014 | FI | 30.07.2014 | HR | 30.07.2014 | IT | 30.07.2014 | LT | 30.07.2014 | LV | 30.07.2014 | MC | 30.07.2014 | MK | 30.07.2014 | MT | 30.07.2014 | NL | 30.07.2014 | PL | 30.07.2014 | RO | 30.07.2014 | SE | 30.07.2014 | SI | 30.07.2014 | SK | 30.07.2014 | SM | 30.07.2014 | TR | 30.07.2014 | BG | 30.10.2014 | NO | 30.10.2014 | GR | 31.10.2014 | IS | 30.11.2014 | PT | 02.12.2014 | AT | 29.03.2015 | IE | 29.03.2015 | LU | 29.03.2015 | BE | 31.03.2015 | CH | 31.03.2015 | FR | 31.03.2015 | LI | 31.03.2015 | [2018/31] |
Former [2017/38] | HU | 29.03.2010 | |
CY | 30.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 30.07.2014 | ||
DK | 30.07.2014 | ||
EE | 30.07.2014 | ||
ES | 30.07.2014 | ||
FI | 30.07.2014 | ||
HR | 30.07.2014 | ||
IT | 30.07.2014 | ||
LT | 30.07.2014 | ||
LV | 30.07.2014 | ||
MC | 30.07.2014 | ||
MT | 30.07.2014 | ||
NL | 30.07.2014 | ||
PL | 30.07.2014 | ||
RO | 30.07.2014 | ||
SE | 30.07.2014 | ||
SI | 30.07.2014 | ||
SK | 30.07.2014 | ||
SM | 30.07.2014 | ||
TR | 30.07.2014 | ||
BG | 30.10.2014 | ||
NO | 30.10.2014 | ||
GR | 31.10.2014 | ||
IS | 30.11.2014 | ||
PT | 02.12.2014 | ||
AT | 29.03.2015 | ||
IE | 29.03.2015 | ||
LU | 29.03.2015 | ||
BE | 31.03.2015 | ||
CH | 31.03.2015 | ||
FR | 31.03.2015 | ||
LI | 31.03.2015 | ||
Former [2017/03] | CY | 30.07.2014 | |
CZ | 30.07.2014 | ||
DK | 30.07.2014 | ||
EE | 30.07.2014 | ||
ES | 30.07.2014 | ||
FI | 30.07.2014 | ||
HR | 30.07.2014 | ||
IT | 30.07.2014 | ||
LT | 30.07.2014 | ||
LV | 30.07.2014 | ||
MC | 30.07.2014 | ||
MT | 30.07.2014 | ||
NL | 30.07.2014 | ||
PL | 30.07.2014 | ||
RO | 30.07.2014 | ||
SE | 30.07.2014 | ||
SI | 30.07.2014 | ||
SK | 30.07.2014 | ||
BG | 30.10.2014 | ||
NO | 30.10.2014 | ||
GR | 31.10.2014 | ||
IS | 30.11.2014 | ||
PT | 02.12.2014 | ||
AT | 29.03.2015 | ||
IE | 29.03.2015 | ||
LU | 29.03.2015 | ||
CH | 31.03.2015 | ||
FR | 31.03.2015 | ||
LI | 31.03.2015 | ||
Former [2016/36] | CY | 30.07.2014 | |
CZ | 30.07.2014 | ||
DK | 30.07.2014 | ||
EE | 30.07.2014 | ||
ES | 30.07.2014 | ||
FI | 30.07.2014 | ||
HR | 30.07.2014 | ||
IT | 30.07.2014 | ||
LT | 30.07.2014 | ||
LV | 30.07.2014 | ||
MC | 30.07.2014 | ||
NL | 30.07.2014 | ||
PL | 30.07.2014 | ||
RO | 30.07.2014 | ||
SE | 30.07.2014 | ||
SI | 30.07.2014 | ||
SK | 30.07.2014 | ||
BG | 30.10.2014 | ||
NO | 30.10.2014 | ||
GR | 31.10.2014 | ||
IS | 30.11.2014 | ||
PT | 02.12.2014 | ||
AT | 29.03.2015 | ||
IE | 29.03.2015 | ||
LU | 29.03.2015 | ||
CH | 31.03.2015 | ||
FR | 31.03.2015 | ||
LI | 31.03.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | CY | 30.07.2014 | |
CZ | 30.07.2014 | ||
DK | 30.07.2014 | ||
EE | 30.07.2014 | ||
ES | 30.07.2014 | ||
FI | 30.07.2014 | ||
HR | 30.07.2014 | ||
IT | 30.07.2014 | ||
LT | 30.07.2014 | ||
LV | 30.07.2014 | ||
MC | 30.07.2014 | ||
NL | 30.07.2014 | ||
PL | 30.07.2014 | ||
RO | 30.07.2014 | ||
SE | 30.07.2014 | ||
SI | 30.07.2014 | ||
SK | 30.07.2014 | ||
BG | 30.10.2014 | ||
NO | 30.10.2014 | ||
GR | 31.10.2014 | ||
IS | 30.11.2014 | ||
PT | 02.12.2014 | ||
IE | 29.03.2015 | ||
LU | 29.03.2015 | ||
CH | 31.03.2015 | ||
FR | 31.03.2015 | ||
LI | 31.03.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | CY | 30.07.2014 | |
CZ | 30.07.2014 | ||
DK | 30.07.2014 | ||
EE | 30.07.2014 | ||
ES | 30.07.2014 | ||
FI | 30.07.2014 | ||
HR | 30.07.2014 | ||
IT | 30.07.2014 | ||
LT | 30.07.2014 | ||
LV | 30.07.2014 | ||
MC | 30.07.2014 | ||
NL | 30.07.2014 | ||
PL | 30.07.2014 | ||
RO | 30.07.2014 | ||
SE | 30.07.2014 | ||
SI | 30.07.2014 | ||
SK | 30.07.2014 | ||
BG | 30.10.2014 | ||
NO | 30.10.2014 | ||
GR | 31.10.2014 | ||
IS | 30.11.2014 | ||
PT | 02.12.2014 | ||
IE | 29.03.2015 | ||
LU | 29.03.2015 | ||
CH | 31.03.2015 | ||
LI | 31.03.2015 | ||
Former [2016/06] | CY | 30.07.2014 | |
CZ | 30.07.2014 | ||
DK | 30.07.2014 | ||
EE | 30.07.2014 | ||
ES | 30.07.2014 | ||
FI | 30.07.2014 | ||
HR | 30.07.2014 | ||
IT | 30.07.2014 | ||
LT | 30.07.2014 | ||
LV | 30.07.2014 | ||
MC | 30.07.2014 | ||
NL | 30.07.2014 | ||
PL | 30.07.2014 | ||
RO | 30.07.2014 | ||
SE | 30.07.2014 | ||
SI | 30.07.2014 | ||
SK | 30.07.2014 | ||
BG | 30.10.2014 | ||
NO | 30.10.2014 | ||
GR | 31.10.2014 | ||
IS | 30.11.2014 | ||
PT | 02.12.2014 | ||
LU | 29.03.2015 | ||
CH | 31.03.2015 | ||
LI | 31.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | CY | 30.07.2014 | |
CZ | 30.07.2014 | ||
DK | 30.07.2014 | ||
EE | 30.07.2014 | ||
ES | 30.07.2014 | ||
FI | 30.07.2014 | ||
HR | 30.07.2014 | ||
IT | 30.07.2014 | ||
LT | 30.07.2014 | ||
LV | 30.07.2014 | ||
MC | 30.07.2014 | ||
NL | 30.07.2014 | ||
PL | 30.07.2014 | ||
RO | 30.07.2014 | ||
SE | 30.07.2014 | ||
SI | 30.07.2014 | ||
SK | 30.07.2014 | ||
BG | 30.10.2014 | ||
NO | 30.10.2014 | ||
GR | 31.10.2014 | ||
IS | 30.11.2014 | ||
PT | 02.12.2014 | ||
LU | 29.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/47] | CY | 30.07.2014 | |
CZ | 30.07.2014 | ||
DK | 30.07.2014 | ||
EE | 30.07.2014 | ||
ES | 30.07.2014 | ||
FI | 30.07.2014 | ||
HR | 30.07.2014 | ||
IT | 30.07.2014 | ||
LT | 30.07.2014 | ||
LV | 30.07.2014 | ||
MC | 30.07.2014 | ||
NL | 30.07.2014 | ||
PL | 30.07.2014 | ||
RO | 30.07.2014 | ||
SE | 30.07.2014 | ||
SK | 30.07.2014 | ||
BG | 30.10.2014 | ||
NO | 30.10.2014 | ||
GR | 31.10.2014 | ||
IS | 30.11.2014 | ||
PT | 02.12.2014 | ||
LU | 29.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/46] | CY | 30.07.2014 | |
CZ | 30.07.2014 | ||
DK | 30.07.2014 | ||
EE | 30.07.2014 | ||
ES | 30.07.2014 | ||
FI | 30.07.2014 | ||
HR | 30.07.2014 | ||
IT | 30.07.2014 | ||
LT | 30.07.2014 | ||
LV | 30.07.2014 | ||
MC | 30.07.2014 | ||
NL | 30.07.2014 | ||
PL | 30.07.2014 | ||
RO | 30.07.2014 | ||
SE | 30.07.2014 | ||
SK | 30.07.2014 | ||
BG | 30.10.2014 | ||
NO | 30.10.2014 | ||
GR | 31.10.2014 | ||
IS | 30.11.2014 | ||
PT | 02.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/23] | CY | 30.07.2014 | |
CZ | 30.07.2014 | ||
DK | 30.07.2014 | ||
EE | 30.07.2014 | ||
ES | 30.07.2014 | ||
FI | 30.07.2014 | ||
HR | 30.07.2014 | ||
IT | 30.07.2014 | ||
LT | 30.07.2014 | ||
LV | 30.07.2014 | ||
NL | 30.07.2014 | ||
PL | 30.07.2014 | ||
RO | 30.07.2014 | ||
SE | 30.07.2014 | ||
SK | 30.07.2014 | ||
BG | 30.10.2014 | ||
NO | 30.10.2014 | ||
GR | 31.10.2014 | ||
IS | 30.11.2014 | ||
PT | 02.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/22] | CY | 30.07.2014 | |
DK | 30.07.2014 | ||
ES | 30.07.2014 | ||
FI | 30.07.2014 | ||
HR | 30.07.2014 | ||
IT | 30.07.2014 | ||
LT | 30.07.2014 | ||
LV | 30.07.2014 | ||
NL | 30.07.2014 | ||
PL | 30.07.2014 | ||
RO | 30.07.2014 | ||
SE | 30.07.2014 | ||
BG | 30.10.2014 | ||
NO | 30.10.2014 | ||
GR | 31.10.2014 | ||
IS | 30.11.2014 | ||
PT | 02.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | CY | 30.07.2014 | |
ES | 30.07.2014 | ||
FI | 30.07.2014 | ||
HR | 30.07.2014 | ||
LT | 30.07.2014 | ||
LV | 30.07.2014 | ||
NL | 30.07.2014 | ||
PL | 30.07.2014 | ||
SE | 30.07.2014 | ||
BG | 30.10.2014 | ||
NO | 30.10.2014 | ||
GR | 31.10.2014 | ||
IS | 30.11.2014 | ||
PT | 02.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | CY | 30.07.2014 | |
ES | 30.07.2014 | ||
FI | 30.07.2014 | ||
LT | 30.07.2014 | ||
PL | 30.07.2014 | ||
SE | 30.07.2014 | ||
BG | 30.10.2014 | ||
NO | 30.10.2014 | ||
GR | 31.10.2014 | ||
PT | 02.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | ES | 30.07.2014 | |
FI | 30.07.2014 | ||
LT | 30.07.2014 | ||
SE | 30.07.2014 | ||
BG | 30.10.2014 | ||
NO | 30.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | FI | 30.07.2014 | |
LT | 30.07.2014 | ||
SE | 30.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | LT | 30.07.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [E]EP2380947 (JNC CORP [JP], et al) [E] 1-10,12-21,23,25-30 * examples 4, 5, 14, 15, 18, 23, 41-48 * * claim - *; | [Y]DE102008036248 (MERCK PATENT GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1-30 * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0035]; compound - * * page 20; compounds CY23, CY24 * * page 23; compounds PY17 - PY20 * * paragraph [0091]; compounds DK8 - DK10 * * paragraph [0093]; compounds Y14 - Y16 * * paragraph [0101]; compounds O2, O4 * * page 40; compounds VK1 - VK4 * * paragraph [0110]; compound CC1 * * paragraphs [0007] , [ 17 ] , [ 136 ] , [ 158] - [0161] * * claim - *; | [Y]WO2008145297 (MERCK PATENT GMBH [DE], et al) [Y] 1-30 * page 5, line 1 - page 9, line 15; compound - * * page 14, line 5 - page 15, line 30; compound - * * examples 1-20; compounds CPGP.5.3, CCPC.3.4 * * claim - *; | [Y]EP1889894 (MERCK PATENT GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1-30 * paragraphs [0010] - [0019] - [0021] , [0034] * * page 18 - page 20; compounds Xa, Xb, XIa, XIb, XIc, XIIa, XIIb,XIV, XV * * paragraph [0050]; compound XVIIIa * * example -; claim - *; | [Y]DE102008035718 (MERCK PATENT GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1-30 * page 24; figures CY23, CY24 * * page 27; compounds PY17 - PY20 * * page 29; compounds DK8 - DK10 * * page 43; compounds VK1 - VK4 * * paragraph [0106]; compounds O2, O4 * * paragraphs [0111] , [0115]; compounds CC, CC1 * * paragraphs [0033] , [0141] , [0144] , [0145] * * example -; claim - *; | [YD]EP1378557 (MERCK PATENT GMBH [DE]) [YD] 1-30 * page 10; compounds VIa, VIb * * pages 11-12; compounds VIIIa, VIIIb, IXa. IXb, IXc, Xa, Xb, XIII * * example -; claim - *; | [A]WO2008009417 (MERCK PATENT GMBH [DE], et al) [A] 1-30 * page 44 - page 46; compounds II.8A - II.11B * * page 50; compounds III.8 - III.11 * * page 58; compounds III.10A, III.10B * * page 75, line 15 - line 30; compound - * * page 87, line 15 - page 88, line 5; compound - * * page 100, line 5 - line 11 * * page 102, line 5 - line 15 * * examples 2.1, 2.4; compound CCOC * * page 157, line 25 - line 35 * * claim - *; | [A]WO2004033584 (MERCK PATENT GMBH [DE], et al) [A] 1-30 * page 3, line 20 - page 13, line 25; compounds I, VII, VIII, IX,X * * pages 26-27; table 1; compound CCPC.3.4 * * claim - *; | [A]US7425355 (KLASEN-MEMMER MELANIE [DE], et al) [A] 1-30 * example -; claim -; compounds CPYP, CPYG *; | [A]DE19927627 (MERCK PATENT GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-30 * example -; claim -; compounds CPYC-2-3 , CYYC-2-3 * | by applicant | JPH1036847 | EP1170626 | EP1378557 | EP1498468 | US2004191428 | US2006066793 | US2006103804 | US6177972 | EP0364538 | DE2636684 | DE3321373 | DE2209127 | DE2240864 | DE2321632 | DE2338281 | DE2450088 | DE2637430 | DE2853728 | GB2314839 | US6511719 | US7223450 | WO0234739 | US7041345 | US7060331 | US7318950 | US6818261 | US6916940 | US7060200 | US2006172090 | - S.H. JUNG ET AL., JPN. J. APPL. PHYS., (2004), vol. 43, no. 3, page 1028 | - T.-J- CHEN ET AL., JPN. J. APPL. PHYS., (2006), vol. 45, pages 2702 - 2704 | - S. H. KIM; L.-C- CHIEN, JPN. J. APPL. PHYS., (2004), vol. 43, pages 7643 - 7647 | - APPL. PHYS. LETT., (1999), vol. 75, no. 21, page 3264 | - OPTICS EXPRESS, (2004), vol. 12, no. 7, page 1221 | - PURE APPL. CHEM., (2001), vol. 73, no. 5, page 888 | - C. TSCHIERSKE; G. PELZL; S. DIELE, ANGEW. CHEM., (2004), vol. 116, pages 6340 - 6368 | - HALLER ET AL., MOL. CRYST. LIQ. CRYST., (1973), vol. 24, pages 249 - 258 |