EP2472082 - Particle separator for a gas turbine engine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.02.2015 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.02.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.03.2015 [2015/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rolls-Royce North American Technologies, Inc. 2059 S. Tibbs Avenue, Mail Drop X12 Indianapolis, IN 46241 / US | [2012/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Snyder, Philip Harold 1650 South County Road 525 E. Avon, IN 46123 / US | [2012/35] | Representative(s) | Holmes, Matthew Peter, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 1 New York Street Manchester, M1 4HD / GB | [2012/27] | Application number, filing date | 12002357.7 | 20.06.2006 | [2012/27] | Priority number, date | US20050692430P | 20.06.2005 Original published format: US 692430 P | [2012/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2472082 | Date: | 04.07.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2472082 | Date: | 23.01.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.01.2013 | Classification | IPC: | F02C7/052, B01D45/08, B01D45/06 | [2012/27] | CPC: |
B01D45/06 (EP,US);
B01D45/08 (EP,US);
F02C7/052 (EP,US);
B01D2279/60 (EP,US);
F05D2250/71 (EP,US);
F05D2260/607 (EP,US);
Y02T50/60 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2012/27] | Title | German: | Teilchenseparator für einen Gasturbinenmotor | [2012/27] | English: | Particle separator for a gas turbine engine | [2012/27] | French: | Séparateur de particules pour moteur de turbine à gaz | [2012/27] | Examination procedure | 22.07.2013 | Examination requested [2013/36] | 05.11.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.06.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.10.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/12] | 12.11.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2015/12] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP06850500.7 / EP1896157 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 04.11.2013 | Request for further processing filed | 04.11.2013 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 20.11.2013 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2003024232 (SNYDER PHILIP H [US], et al) [X] 1-7 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0005]; figures 3-6 * * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0079] *; | [XI]US6698180 (SNYDER PHILIP H [US]) [X] 1,3,6,7 * figures 2-6,10 * * column 1, line 10 - column 1, line 29 * * column 1, line 66 - column 6, line 37 * [I] 2,4,5; | [X]US3673771 (DICKEY THOMAS A) [X] 1,2,6,7 * the whole document *; | [X]US3778983 (RYGG G) [X] 1,2,6,7 * column 2, line 24 - column 3, line 37; figures 1-3 *; | [X]US4704145 (NORRIS RICHARD M [US], et al) [X] 1,2,6,7 * column 2, line 62 - column 4, line 60; figures 1,4 *; | [X]US4928480 (OLIVER WAYNE R [US], et al) [X] 1-3,6,7 * page 2, line 59 - page 12, line 44; figures 1-4 * |