EP2472765 - Hearability improvements for reference signals [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.04.2018 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2024 | New entry: Date of oral proceedings | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Qualcomm Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego CA 92121-1714 / US | [2012/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Agrawal, Avneesh 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego CA 92121 / US | 02 /
Sampath, Ashwin 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego CA 92121 / US | 03 /
Palanki, Ravi 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego CA 92121 / US | 04 /
Bhushan, Naga 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego CA 92121 / US | 05 /
Bachu, Raja, Sekhar 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego CA 92121 / US | 06 /
Khandekar, Aamod, D. 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego CA 92121 / US | [2012/27] | Representative(s) | Carstens, Dirk Wilhelm, et al Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstraße 5 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/27] | Carstens, Dirk Wilhelm, et al Wagner & Geyer Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12002375.9 | 06.01.2010 | [2012/27] | Priority number, date | US20090142784P | 06.01.2009 Original published format: US 142784 P | US20090144075P | 12.01.2009 Original published format: US 144075 P | US20090149647P | 03.02.2009 Original published format: US 149647 P | US20090151128P | 09.02.2009 Original published format: US 151128 P | US20090163429P | 25.03.2009 Original published format: US 163429 P | US20100651838 | 04.01.2010 Original published format: US 651838 | [2012/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2472765 | Date: | 04.07.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.05.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H04L5/00 | [2012/27] | CPC: |
H04L5/0082 (EP,BR,KR,US);
H04L5/0048 (EP,BR,KR,US);
H04L5/005 (US);
H04L1/1893 (US);
H04W72/30 (US);
H04W72/566 (EP,BR,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/27] | Title | German: | Hörbarkeitsverbesserungen für Referenzsignale | [2012/27] | English: | Hearability improvements for reference signals | [2012/27] | French: | Améliorations de la capacité d'écoute pour signaux de référence | [2012/27] | Examination procedure | 30.03.2012 | Examination requested [2012/27] | 04.01.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.04.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.10.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.01.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.11.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.02.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.10.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 21.12.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.05.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.11.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.03.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.07.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.11.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.03.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.09.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.01.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.01.2025 | Date of oral proceedings | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP10701410.2 / EP2386157 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20100701410) is 17.02.2017 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 21.12.2020 | Request for further processing filed | 21.12.2020 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 15.01.2021 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 04.11.2019 | Request for further processing filed | 04.11.2019 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 11.11.2019 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 08.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 09.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 10.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 12.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 13.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 11.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 11.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2013 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   29.04.2013 | 31.01.2014 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   26.03.2014 | 31.01.2015 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   08.04.2015 | 31.01.2016 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   30.03.2016 | 31.01.2017 | 08   M06   Fee paid on   28.04.2017 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |