EP2479854 - Optical communication light source unit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2012/30] | Optical communication light source unit and wavelength monitoring control method | ||
[2013/13] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.07.2014 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.08.2014 [2014/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nippon Telegraph And Telephone Corporation 3-1 Otemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8116 / JP | [2012/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kawai, Shingo c/o NTT Intellectual Property Center 9-11 Midori-cho 3-Chome Musashino-shi Tokyo 180-8585 / JP | 02 /
Matsumoto, Kiyoshi c/o NTT Intellectual Property Center 9-11 Midori-cho 3-Chome Musashino-shi Tokyo 180-8585 / JP | 03 /
Kawata, Hideo c/o NTT Intellectual Property Center 9-11 Midori-cho 3-Chome Musashino-shi Tokyo 180-8585 / JP | 04 /
Yoshimoto, Naoto c/o NTT Intellectual Property Center 9-11 Midori-cho 3-Chome Musashino-shi Tokyo 180-8585 / JP | 05 /
Iwatsuki, Katsumi c/o NTT Intellectual Property Center 9-11 Midori-cho 3-Chome Musashino-shi Tokyo 180-8585 / JP | [2012/30] | Representative(s) | Prinz & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Rundfunkplatz 2 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/30] | Prinz & Partner Patentanwälte Rundfunkplatz 2 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12002642.2 | 02.02.2006 | [2012/30] | Priority number, date | JP20050075245 | 16.03.2005 Original published format: JP 2005075245 | JP20050236375 | 17.08.2005 Original published format: JP 2005236375 | [2012/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2479854 | Date: | 25.07.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/30] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2479854 | Date: | 19.09.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2479854 | Date: | 18.09.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.08.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H01S5/0687 | [2013/13] | CPC: |
H01S5/0687 (EP,US);
H01S5/0683 (EP,KR,US);
H01S5/0617 (EP,US);
H01S5/06804 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2012/30] | H01S5/0683 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2012/30] | Title | German: | Optische Kommunikationslichtquelleneinheit | [2013/13] | English: | Optical communication light source unit | [2013/13] | French: | Unité de source lumineuse de communication optique | [2013/13] |
Former [2012/30] | Optische Kommunikationslichtquelleneinheit und Wellenlängenüberwachungssteuerverfahren | ||
Former [2012/30] | Optical communication light source unit and wavelength monitoring control method | ||
Former [2012/30] | Unité de source lumineuse de communication optique et procédé de contrôle de surveillance de longueur d'onde | Examination procedure | 10.01.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.01.2013 | Examination requested [2013/09] | 16.04.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.08.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 01.08.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP06712946.0 / EP1772932 | EP09014056.7 / EP2146409 | Opposition(s) | 19.06.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2003224326 (NTT ELECTRONICS CORP) [A] 1-10 * abstract * * paragraphs [0064] , [0069] *; | [A]EP1345296 (AGILENT TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [A] 1-10 * paragraphs [0039] , [0053] - [0055]; figure 1 *; | [A]US2004028099 (HONGO KAZUHIRO [JP], et al) [A] 1-3,10 * abstract * * paragraphs [0012] - [0015] - [0035] - [0037] *; | [A]US2004032889 (HIDAKA HIROTOSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-3,10 * paragraphs [0006] - [0007] - [0023] - [0029]; figure 1 *; | [A]US5982794 (TAMURA TOSHIMASA [JP]) [A] 1-3 * abstract * * column 2, line 57 - column 3, line 5 * * column 9, line 14 - column 10, line 6 *; | [A]US6393041 (SATO KAZUYOSHI [JP]) [A] 1-3 * abstract * * column 4, line 61 - column 6, line 65 *; | [A]US6590686 (SEKIYA MOTOYOSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-3 * abstract * * column 1, lines 55-59 * * column 5, line 42 - column 6, line 19 *; | [A]WO2004102754 (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE [JP], et al) [A] 1-9 * abstract *; | EP1624543 [ ] (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE [JP]) [ ] * abstract * * paragraphs [0025] , [0026] , [0035] , [0049] - [0052] - [0057] - [0059] - [0065] * | by applicant | JP2003224326 | - TAKAGI ET AL., 25 GHZ-SPACING INTERVAL WAVELENGTH MONITOR INTEGRATED DFB LASER MODULE, (2002), page 349 | - A. ZADOK, "Spectral shift and broadening of DFB lasers under direct modulation", IEEE PHOTON. TECHNOL. LETT., (1998), vol. 10, no. 12, pages 1709 - 1711 | - ITU-T RECOMMENDATION, (2001), vol. 1 |