Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2522402 | Global Dossier | 11.05.2016 | B1 | EP2522402 | 14.11.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | ITMI20110686 | 21.04.2011 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2585831T | 10.10.2016 | T3 | Priority number | Date | ITMI20110686 | 21.04.2011 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ITMI20110686 | 22.10.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | ITMI20110686 | 21.04.2011 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | PT2522402T | 12.08.2016 | T | Priority number | Date | ITMI20110686 | 21.04.2011 |