EP2522402 - Fire-fighting system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.03.2017 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Isolcell S.p.A. Via Antonio Meucci 7 39055 Laives (Bolzano) / IT | [2016/19] |
Former [2012/46] | For all designated states ISOLCELL ITALIA S.P.A. Via Antonio Meucci 7 39055 Laives (BZ) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pruneri, Marco Via del Rio 8 39040 Ora (Bolzano) / IT | 02 /
Vlaic, Andrea Via Fago 21 39100 Bolzano / IT | [2012/46] | Representative(s) | Forattini, Amelia Internazionale Brevetti Ingg. ZINI, MARANESI & C. S.r.l. Piazza Castello 1 20121 Milano / IT | [2016/19] |
Former [2012/46] | Forattini, Amelia Internazionale Brevetti Ingg. ZINI, MARANESI & C. S.r.l. Piazza Castello 1 20121 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 12002762.8 | 20.04.2012 | [2012/46] | Priority number, date | IT2011MI00686 | 21.04.2011 Original published format: IT MI20110686 | [2012/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2522402 | Date: | 14.11.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2522402 | Date: | 11.05.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.10.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A62C37/40 | [2012/46] | CPC: |
A62C37/40 (EP);
A62C99/0018 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/19] |
Former [2012/46] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Feuerbekämpfungssystem | [2012/46] | English: | Fire-fighting system | [2012/46] | French: | Système de lutte contre les incendies | [2012/46] | Examination procedure | 11.03.2013 | Examination requested [2013/17] | 26.11.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.03.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 21.03.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.03.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.11.2015 | Opposition(s) | 14.02.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 20.04.2012 | AL | 11.05.2016 | BE | 11.05.2016 | BG | 11.05.2016 | CY | 11.05.2016 | CZ | 11.05.2016 | DK | 11.05.2016 | EE | 11.05.2016 | FI | 11.05.2016 | HR | 11.05.2016 | LT | 11.05.2016 | LV | 11.05.2016 | MC | 11.05.2016 | MK | 11.05.2016 | NL | 11.05.2016 | PL | 11.05.2016 | RO | 11.05.2016 | RS | 11.05.2016 | SI | 11.05.2016 | SK | 11.05.2016 | SM | 11.05.2016 | GR | 12.08.2016 | IS | 11.09.2016 | [2020/33] |
Former [2019/51] | HU | 20.04.2012 | |
AL | 11.05.2016 | ||
BE | 11.05.2016 | ||
BG | 11.05.2016 | ||
CY | 11.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 11.05.2016 | ||
DK | 11.05.2016 | ||
EE | 11.05.2016 | ||
FI | 11.05.2016 | ||
HR | 11.05.2016 | ||
LT | 11.05.2016 | ||
LV | 11.05.2016 | ||
MC | 11.05.2016 | ||
MK | 11.05.2016 | ||
NL | 11.05.2016 | ||
PL | 11.05.2016 | ||
RO | 11.05.2016 | ||
RS | 11.05.2016 | ||
SI | 11.05.2016 | ||
SK | 11.05.2016 | ||
SM | 11.05.2016 | ||
GR | 12.08.2016 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 20.04.2012 | |
AL | 11.05.2016 | ||
BE | 11.05.2016 | ||
BG | 11.05.2016 | ||
CY | 11.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 11.05.2016 | ||
DK | 11.05.2016 | ||
EE | 11.05.2016 | ||
FI | 11.05.2016 | ||
HR | 11.05.2016 | ||
LT | 11.05.2016 | ||
LV | 11.05.2016 | ||
MC | 11.05.2016 | ||
NL | 11.05.2016 | ||
PL | 11.05.2016 | ||
RO | 11.05.2016 | ||
RS | 11.05.2016 | ||
SI | 11.05.2016 | ||
SK | 11.05.2016 | ||
SM | 11.05.2016 | ||
GR | 12.08.2016 | ||
Former [2019/39] | HU | 20.04.2012 | |
AL | 11.05.2016 | ||
BE | 11.05.2016 | ||
BG | 11.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 11.05.2016 | ||
DK | 11.05.2016 | ||
EE | 11.05.2016 | ||
FI | 11.05.2016 | ||
HR | 11.05.2016 | ||
LT | 11.05.2016 | ||
LV | 11.05.2016 | ||
MC | 11.05.2016 | ||
NL | 11.05.2016 | ||
PL | 11.05.2016 | ||
RO | 11.05.2016 | ||
RS | 11.05.2016 | ||
SI | 11.05.2016 | ||
SK | 11.05.2016 | ||
SM | 11.05.2016 | ||
GR | 12.08.2016 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 20.04.2012 | |
AL | 11.05.2016 | ||
BE | 11.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 11.05.2016 | ||
DK | 11.05.2016 | ||
EE | 11.05.2016 | ||
FI | 11.05.2016 | ||
HR | 11.05.2016 | ||
LT | 11.05.2016 | ||
LV | 11.05.2016 | ||
MC | 11.05.2016 | ||
NL | 11.05.2016 | ||
PL | 11.05.2016 | ||
RO | 11.05.2016 | ||
RS | 11.05.2016 | ||
SI | 11.05.2016 | ||
SK | 11.05.2016 | ||
SM | 11.05.2016 | ||
GR | 12.08.2016 | ||
Former [2018/46] | AL | 11.05.2016 | |
BE | 11.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 11.05.2016 | ||
DK | 11.05.2016 | ||
EE | 11.05.2016 | ||
FI | 11.05.2016 | ||
HR | 11.05.2016 | ||
LT | 11.05.2016 | ||
LV | 11.05.2016 | ||
MC | 11.05.2016 | ||
NL | 11.05.2016 | ||
PL | 11.05.2016 | ||
RO | 11.05.2016 | ||
RS | 11.05.2016 | ||
SI | 11.05.2016 | ||
SK | 11.05.2016 | ||
SM | 11.05.2016 | ||
GR | 12.08.2016 | ||
Former [2018/01] | BE | 11.05.2016 | |
CZ | 11.05.2016 | ||
DK | 11.05.2016 | ||
EE | 11.05.2016 | ||
FI | 11.05.2016 | ||
HR | 11.05.2016 | ||
LT | 11.05.2016 | ||
LV | 11.05.2016 | ||
MC | 11.05.2016 | ||
NL | 11.05.2016 | ||
PL | 11.05.2016 | ||
RO | 11.05.2016 | ||
RS | 11.05.2016 | ||
SI | 11.05.2016 | ||
SK | 11.05.2016 | ||
SM | 11.05.2016 | ||
GR | 12.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | BE | 11.05.2016 | |
CZ | 11.05.2016 | ||
DK | 11.05.2016 | ||
EE | 11.05.2016 | ||
FI | 11.05.2016 | ||
HR | 11.05.2016 | ||
LT | 11.05.2016 | ||
LV | 11.05.2016 | ||
NL | 11.05.2016 | ||
PL | 11.05.2016 | ||
RO | 11.05.2016 | ||
RS | 11.05.2016 | ||
SI | 11.05.2016 | ||
SK | 11.05.2016 | ||
SM | 11.05.2016 | ||
GR | 12.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | BE | 11.05.2016 | |
CZ | 11.05.2016 | ||
DK | 11.05.2016 | ||
EE | 11.05.2016 | ||
FI | 11.05.2016 | ||
HR | 11.05.2016 | ||
LT | 11.05.2016 | ||
LV | 11.05.2016 | ||
NL | 11.05.2016 | ||
PL | 11.05.2016 | ||
RO | 11.05.2016 | ||
RS | 11.05.2016 | ||
SK | 11.05.2016 | ||
SM | 11.05.2016 | ||
GR | 12.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | BE | 11.05.2016 | |
CZ | 11.05.2016 | ||
DK | 11.05.2016 | ||
EE | 11.05.2016 | ||
FI | 11.05.2016 | ||
HR | 11.05.2016 | ||
LT | 11.05.2016 | ||
LV | 11.05.2016 | ||
NL | 11.05.2016 | ||
PL | 11.05.2016 | ||
RO | 11.05.2016 | ||
RS | 11.05.2016 | ||
SK | 11.05.2016 | ||
GR | 12.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | CZ | 11.05.2016 | |
DK | 11.05.2016 | ||
EE | 11.05.2016 | ||
FI | 11.05.2016 | ||
HR | 11.05.2016 | ||
LT | 11.05.2016 | ||
LV | 11.05.2016 | ||
NL | 11.05.2016 | ||
RO | 11.05.2016 | ||
RS | 11.05.2016 | ||
GR | 12.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | DK | 11.05.2016 | |
FI | 11.05.2016 | ||
HR | 11.05.2016 | ||
LT | 11.05.2016 | ||
LV | 11.05.2016 | ||
NL | 11.05.2016 | ||
RS | 11.05.2016 | ||
GR | 12.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | FI | 11.05.2016 | |
HR | 11.05.2016 | ||
LT | 11.05.2016 | ||
LV | 11.05.2016 | ||
NL | 11.05.2016 | ||
RS | 11.05.2016 | ||
GR | 12.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | FI | 11.05.2016 | |
HR | 11.05.2016 | ||
LT | 11.05.2016 | ||
LV | 11.05.2016 | ||
NL | 11.05.2016 | ||
RS | 11.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | FI | 11.05.2016 | |
LT | 11.05.2016 | ||
NL | 11.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | LT | 11.05.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE19934118 (WAGNER ALARM SICHERUNG [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]US2003058114 (MILLER MARK S [US], et al) [A] 1 * figure 1 *; | [A]CH572752 (CERBERUS AG) [A] 1 * figures 1,2 *; | [A]WO03056325 (WAGNER ALARM SICHERUNG [DE], et al) [A] 1 * abstract * | by applicant | DE19934118 |