EP2518133 - Grease for electrical contact and slide electricity structure, power switch, vacuum circuit breaker, vacuum-insulated switchgear assembling method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 01.09.2017 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.09.2017 | Withdrawal of application | published on 04.10.2017 [2017/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi Industrial Equipment Systems Co., Ltd. 3, Kanda Neribei-cho Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101-0022 / JP | For all designated states NOK Klueber Co., Ltd. 1-12-15, Shibadaimon Minato-ku Tokyo 105-0012 / JP | [2017/10] |
Former [2012/44] | For all designated states HITACHI, LTD. 6-6, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8280 / JP | ||
For all designated states NOK Klueber Co., Ltd. 1-12-15, Shibadaimon Minato-ku Tokyo 105-0012 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sato, Takashi c/o Hitachi, Ltd. Intellectual Property Group 12th Floor, Marunouchi Center Building 6-1, Marunouchi, 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | 02 /
Sato, Kazuhiro c/o Hitachi, Ltd. Intellectual Property Group 12th Floor, Marunouchi Center Building 6-1, Marunouchi, 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | 03 /
Morita, Ayumu c/o Hitachi, Ltd. Intellectual Property Group 12th Floor, Marunouchi Center Building 6-1, Marunouchi, 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | 04 /
Tsuchiya, Kenji c/o Hitachi, Ltd. Intellectual Property Group 12th Floor, Marunouchi Center Building 6-1, Marunouchi, 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | 05 /
Kanno, Takao NOK Klueber Co., Ltd. 955-4, Aza Oishi Isohara Isohara-machi, Kitaibaraki-shi Ibaraki 319-1541 / JP | 06 /
Nitta, Toshio NOK Klueber Co., Ltd. 955-4, Aza Oishi Isohara Isohara-machi, Kitaibaraki-shi Ibaraki 319-1541 / JP | [2012/44] | Representative(s) | Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 80538 München / DE | [2012/44] | Application number, filing date | 12002943.4 | 26.04.2012 | [2012/44] | Priority number, date | JP20110098999 | 27.04.2011 Original published format: JP 2011098999 | JP20120093846 | 17.04.2012 Original published format: JP 2012093846 | [2012/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2518133 | Date: | 31.10.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/44] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2518133 | Date: | 13.03.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.02.2013 | Classification | IPC: | C10M169/02, H01H1/38, H01H33/66, H01R13/03, H01R13/24, H01H33/666, H01H3/62, // C10N50/10, C10N20/04, C10N20/06 | [2013/11] | CPC: |
C10M169/02 (EP,KR,US);
H01H1/60 (EP,KR,US);
H01H3/62 (EP,KR,US);
H01H33/6606 (EP,KR,US);
H01H33/666 (EP,KR,US);
C10M2213/0606 (EP,KR,US);
C10M2213/0626 (EP,KR,US);
C10N2020/04 (EP,US);
C10N2020/06 (EP,US);
C10N2040/14 (EP,US);
C10N2040/17 (EP,US);
C10N2050/10 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49204 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2012/44] | C10M169/02, H01H1/38, H01H33/66, H01R13/03, H01R13/24, H01H33/666, // C10N50/10, C10N20/04, C10N20/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/44] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Fett für elektrische und elektrische Schiebestrukturen, Schaltnetzteil, Vakuumschalter, vakuumisoliertes Schaltanlagenmontageverfahren | [2012/44] | English: | Grease for electrical contact and slide electricity structure, power switch, vacuum circuit breaker, vacuum-insulated switchgear assembling method | [2012/44] | French: | Graisse pour contact électrique et structure d'électricité coulissante, disjoncteur, disjoncteur à vide, procédé d'assemblage d'appareillage de commutation à isolation par le vide | [2012/44] | Examination procedure | 28.08.2012 | Examination requested [2012/44] | 11.09.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.08.2017 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2017/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]US2008032904 (WATANABE YUJI [JP], et al) [X] 1-3 * paragraphs [0067] , [0068]; example -; tables 1,2 * [Y] 10 [I] 4; | [X]EP1520906 (SOLVAY SOLEXIS SPA [IT]) [X] 1-3 * example 4 *; | [X]WO2008065163 (SOLVAY SOLEXIS SPA [IT], et al) [X] 1-3 * examples 13,20,22 *; | [Y]US6396018 (KINOSHITA HIROTSUGU [JP], et al) [Y] 10 * column 7, lines 27-33; figure -; table 1 *; | [Y]WO2004049366 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP], et al) [Y] 10 * figure - *; | [Y]WO2009001778 (MEIDENSHA ELECTRIC MFG CO LTD [JP], et al) [Y] 10 * abstract *; | [Y]JPH1197293 (MEIDENSHA ELECTRIC MFG CO LTD) [Y] 10 * abstract *; | [IA]JPH03244694 (N O K KURIYUUBAA KK) [I] 1-3 * abstract * [A] 10 | by applicant | JP3920253B | JP2007080764 | EP1770154 |