EP2530997 - Adaptive video encoding based on predicted wireless channel conditions [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.04.2015 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.04.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.05.2015 [2015/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Broadcom Corporation 5300 California Avenue Irvine, CA 92617 / US | [2012/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Agarwal, Peyush 755 E. Capitol Avenue Apt. O307 95035 Milpitas California / US | 02 /
Rajakarunanayake, Yasantha 2639 Casella Way 94582 San Ramon California / US | 03 /
Bennet, James D. Velky Rybnik 21 36301 Hroznetin / CZ | 04 /
Dougherty, James F. III. 1150 Appian Way 95037 Morgan Hill California / US | 05 /
MacInnis Alexander G. 285 Hawthorne Avenue 94022 Los Altos California / US | [2012/49] | Representative(s) | Jehle, Volker Armin Bosch Jehle Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Flüggenstrasse 13 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/49] | Jehle, Volker Armin Bosch Jehle Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Flüggenstrasse 13 80639 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12003862.5 | 16.05.2012 | [2012/49] | Priority number, date | US201161491838P | 31.05.2011 Original published format: US 201161491838 P | US201113244584 | 25.09.2011 Original published format: US201113244584 | [2012/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2530997 | Date: | 05.12.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.09.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H04W88/18, H04L1/00, H04N13/04, H04W4/18 | [2012/49] | CPC: |
H04W88/181 (EP,US);
H04L1/0014 (EP,US);
H04L1/0015 (EP,US);
H04L1/0035 (EP,US);
H04W4/18 (EP,US);
H04L1/0026 (EP,US);
H04L1/0034 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/49] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Adaptive Videocodierung basierend auf vorhergesagten Drahtlos-Kanalbedingungen | [2012/49] | English: | Adaptive video encoding based on predicted wireless channel conditions | [2012/49] | French: | Codage vidéo adaptatif basé sur des conditions prédites de canal sans fil | [2012/49] | Examination procedure | 16.05.2012 | Examination requested [2012/49] | 19.10.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.02.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.12.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/20] | 09.01.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2015/20] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.10.2012 | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2014 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO2009084896 (KOREA ELECTRONICS TELECOMM [KR], et al) [X] 1,12,13 * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0014] * * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0033] * * paragraph [0038] - paragraph [0040] * [I] 2-11,14,15; | [XI]US2006095944 (DEMIRCIN MEHMET U [US], et al) [X] 1,12,13 * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0081] - paragraph [0086] * * paragraph [0191] - paragraph [0200] * * paragraph [0295] * [I] 2-11,14,15 | by applicant | - THOMAS WIEGAND ET AL., "WD3: Working Draft 3 of High-Efficiency Video Coding, Joint Collaborative Team on Video Coding (JCT-VC", ITU-T SG 16 WP3 AND ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11, (20110316), page 215 | US20080197781 |