EP2532588 - Camouflaged aircraft [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.05.2017 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Airbus Defence and Space GmbH Willy-Messerschmitt-Straße 1 85521 Ottobrunn / DE | [2016/26] |
Former [2014/38] | For all designated states Airbus Defence and Space GmbH Willy-Messerschmitt-Straße 1 85521 Ottobrunn / DE | ||
Former [2012/50] | For all designated states EADS Deutschland GmbH Willy-Messerschmitt-Strasse 85521 Ottobrunn / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dornwald, Jochen Marianne-Brandt-Strasse 23 80807 München / DE | 02 /
Bichler, Bartholomäus Daschlweg 7 83064 Raubling / DE | [2012/50] | Representative(s) | LKGLOBAL Lorenz & Kopf Patentanwalt Attorney at Law PartG mbB Brienner Straße 11 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/26] | Kopf Westenberger Wachenhausen Patentanwälte PartG mbB Brienner Straße 11 80333 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12004166.0 | 31.05.2012 | [2012/50] | Priority number, date | DE201110106348 | 08.06.2011 Original published format: DE102011106348 | [2012/50] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2532588 | Date: | 12.12.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2532588 | Date: | 29.06.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.08.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B64D7/00, B64C1/00, B64C39/02 | [2012/50] | CPC: |
B64D7/00 (EP,KR,US);
B64C39/02 (EP,RU,US);
B64C39/10 (KR,RU,US);
B64C25/10 (US);
B64C25/16 (KR,US);
B64D1/06 (KR,US);
B64D1/10 (KR,RU);
B64D27/14 (KR,RU,US);
B64D33/04 (KR,RU);
B64D7/06 (US);
B64U10/25 (KR);
B64U20/10 (EP,KR,RU,US);
B64U50/12 (EP,RU,US);
B64U60/40 (EP,RU,US);
F41H3/00 (KR,RU);
H01Q17/00 (KR,RU);
B64C2001/0045 (KR,RU);
B64D27/10 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/50] | Title | German: | Getarntes Fluggerät | [2012/50] | English: | Camouflaged aircraft | [2012/50] | French: | Aéronef camouflé | [2012/50] | Examination procedure | 28.02.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.02.2013 | Examination requested [2013/17] | 05.01.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.05.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 02.05.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.05.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.01.2016 | Opposition(s) | 30.03.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 31.05.2012 | AL | 29.06.2016 | CY | 29.06.2016 | CZ | 29.06.2016 | DK | 29.06.2016 | EE | 29.06.2016 | FI | 29.06.2016 | HR | 29.06.2016 | IT | 29.06.2016 | LT | 29.06.2016 | LV | 29.06.2016 | MC | 29.06.2016 | MK | 29.06.2016 | MT | 29.06.2016 | NL | 29.06.2016 | PL | 29.06.2016 | RO | 29.06.2016 | RS | 29.06.2016 | SE | 29.06.2016 | SI | 29.06.2016 | SK | 29.06.2016 | SM | 29.06.2016 | TR | 29.06.2016 | BG | 29.09.2016 | NO | 29.09.2016 | GR | 30.09.2016 | IS | 29.10.2016 | PT | 31.10.2016 | [2020/15] |
Former [2019/51] | HU | 31.05.2012 | |
AL | 29.06.2016 | ||
CY | 29.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 29.06.2016 | ||
DK | 29.06.2016 | ||
EE | 29.06.2016 | ||
FI | 29.06.2016 | ||
HR | 29.06.2016 | ||
IT | 29.06.2016 | ||
LT | 29.06.2016 | ||
LV | 29.06.2016 | ||
MC | 29.06.2016 | ||
MK | 29.06.2016 | ||
MT | 29.06.2016 | ||
NL | 29.06.2016 | ||
PL | 29.06.2016 | ||
RO | 29.06.2016 | ||
RS | 29.06.2016 | ||
SE | 29.06.2016 | ||
SI | 29.06.2016 | ||
SK | 29.06.2016 | ||
SM | 29.06.2016 | ||
BG | 29.09.2016 | ||
NO | 29.09.2016 | ||
GR | 30.09.2016 | ||
IS | 29.10.2016 | ||
PT | 31.10.2016 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 31.05.2012 | |
AL | 29.06.2016 | ||
CY | 29.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 29.06.2016 | ||
DK | 29.06.2016 | ||
EE | 29.06.2016 | ||
FI | 29.06.2016 | ||
HR | 29.06.2016 | ||
IT | 29.06.2016 | ||
LT | 29.06.2016 | ||
LV | 29.06.2016 | ||
MC | 29.06.2016 | ||
MT | 29.06.2016 | ||
NL | 29.06.2016 | ||
PL | 29.06.2016 | ||
RO | 29.06.2016 | ||
RS | 29.06.2016 | ||
SE | 29.06.2016 | ||
SI | 29.06.2016 | ||
SK | 29.06.2016 | ||
SM | 29.06.2016 | ||
BG | 29.09.2016 | ||
NO | 29.09.2016 | ||
GR | 30.09.2016 | ||
IS | 29.10.2016 | ||
PT | 31.10.2016 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 31.05.2012 | |
AL | 29.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 29.06.2016 | ||
DK | 29.06.2016 | ||
EE | 29.06.2016 | ||
FI | 29.06.2016 | ||
HR | 29.06.2016 | ||
IT | 29.06.2016 | ||
LT | 29.06.2016 | ||
LV | 29.06.2016 | ||
MC | 29.06.2016 | ||
MT | 29.06.2016 | ||
NL | 29.06.2016 | ||
PL | 29.06.2016 | ||
RO | 29.06.2016 | ||
RS | 29.06.2016 | ||
SE | 29.06.2016 | ||
SI | 29.06.2016 | ||
SK | 29.06.2016 | ||
SM | 29.06.2016 | ||
BG | 29.09.2016 | ||
NO | 29.09.2016 | ||
GR | 30.09.2016 | ||
IS | 29.10.2016 | ||
PT | 31.10.2016 | ||
Former [2018/46] | AL | 29.06.2016 | |
CZ | 29.06.2016 | ||
DK | 29.06.2016 | ||
EE | 29.06.2016 | ||
FI | 29.06.2016 | ||
HR | 29.06.2016 | ||
IT | 29.06.2016 | ||
LT | 29.06.2016 | ||
LV | 29.06.2016 | ||
MC | 29.06.2016 | ||
MT | 29.06.2016 | ||
NL | 29.06.2016 | ||
PL | 29.06.2016 | ||
RO | 29.06.2016 | ||
RS | 29.06.2016 | ||
SE | 29.06.2016 | ||
SI | 29.06.2016 | ||
SK | 29.06.2016 | ||
SM | 29.06.2016 | ||
BG | 29.09.2016 | ||
NO | 29.09.2016 | ||
GR | 30.09.2016 | ||
IS | 29.10.2016 | ||
PT | 31.10.2016 | ||
Former [2018/43] | CZ | 29.06.2016 | |
DK | 29.06.2016 | ||
EE | 29.06.2016 | ||
FI | 29.06.2016 | ||
HR | 29.06.2016 | ||
IT | 29.06.2016 | ||
LT | 29.06.2016 | ||
LV | 29.06.2016 | ||
MC | 29.06.2016 | ||
MT | 29.06.2016 | ||
NL | 29.06.2016 | ||
PL | 29.06.2016 | ||
RO | 29.06.2016 | ||
RS | 29.06.2016 | ||
SE | 29.06.2016 | ||
SI | 29.06.2016 | ||
SK | 29.06.2016 | ||
SM | 29.06.2016 | ||
BG | 29.09.2016 | ||
NO | 29.09.2016 | ||
GR | 30.09.2016 | ||
IS | 29.10.2016 | ||
PT | 31.10.2016 | ||
Former [2018/06] | CZ | 29.06.2016 | |
DK | 29.06.2016 | ||
EE | 29.06.2016 | ||
FI | 29.06.2016 | ||
HR | 29.06.2016 | ||
IT | 29.06.2016 | ||
LT | 29.06.2016 | ||
LV | 29.06.2016 | ||
MC | 29.06.2016 | ||
NL | 29.06.2016 | ||
PL | 29.06.2016 | ||
RO | 29.06.2016 | ||
RS | 29.06.2016 | ||
SE | 29.06.2016 | ||
SI | 29.06.2016 | ||
SK | 29.06.2016 | ||
SM | 29.06.2016 | ||
BG | 29.09.2016 | ||
NO | 29.09.2016 | ||
GR | 30.09.2016 | ||
IS | 29.10.2016 | ||
PT | 31.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/38] | CZ | 29.06.2016 | |
DK | 29.06.2016 | ||
EE | 29.06.2016 | ||
FI | 29.06.2016 | ||
HR | 29.06.2016 | ||
IT | 29.06.2016 | ||
LT | 29.06.2016 | ||
LV | 29.06.2016 | ||
NL | 29.06.2016 | ||
PL | 29.06.2016 | ||
RO | 29.06.2016 | ||
RS | 29.06.2016 | ||
SE | 29.06.2016 | ||
SI | 29.06.2016 | ||
SK | 29.06.2016 | ||
SM | 29.06.2016 | ||
BG | 29.09.2016 | ||
NO | 29.09.2016 | ||
GR | 30.09.2016 | ||
IS | 29.10.2016 | ||
PT | 31.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | CZ | 29.06.2016 | |
EE | 29.06.2016 | ||
FI | 29.06.2016 | ||
HR | 29.06.2016 | ||
IT | 29.06.2016 | ||
LT | 29.06.2016 | ||
LV | 29.06.2016 | ||
NL | 29.06.2016 | ||
PL | 29.06.2016 | ||
RO | 29.06.2016 | ||
RS | 29.06.2016 | ||
SE | 29.06.2016 | ||
SK | 29.06.2016 | ||
SM | 29.06.2016 | ||
NO | 29.09.2016 | ||
GR | 30.09.2016 | ||
IS | 29.10.2016 | ||
PT | 31.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | CZ | 29.06.2016 | |
EE | 29.06.2016 | ||
FI | 29.06.2016 | ||
HR | 29.06.2016 | ||
IT | 29.06.2016 | ||
LT | 29.06.2016 | ||
LV | 29.06.2016 | ||
NL | 29.06.2016 | ||
PL | 29.06.2016 | ||
RO | 29.06.2016 | ||
RS | 29.06.2016 | ||
SE | 29.06.2016 | ||
SK | 29.06.2016 | ||
NO | 29.09.2016 | ||
GR | 30.09.2016 | ||
IS | 29.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | CZ | 29.06.2016 | |
EE | 29.06.2016 | ||
FI | 29.06.2016 | ||
HR | 29.06.2016 | ||
IT | 29.06.2016 | ||
LT | 29.06.2016 | ||
LV | 29.06.2016 | ||
NL | 29.06.2016 | ||
RO | 29.06.2016 | ||
RS | 29.06.2016 | ||
SE | 29.06.2016 | ||
NO | 29.09.2016 | ||
GR | 30.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/52] | FI | 29.06.2016 | |
HR | 29.06.2016 | ||
LT | 29.06.2016 | ||
LV | 29.06.2016 | ||
NL | 29.06.2016 | ||
RS | 29.06.2016 | ||
SE | 29.06.2016 | ||
NO | 29.09.2016 | ||
GR | 30.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | FI | 29.06.2016 | |
HR | 29.06.2016 | ||
LT | 29.06.2016 | ||
LV | 29.06.2016 | ||
RS | 29.06.2016 | ||
NO | 29.09.2016 | ||
GR | 30.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | FI | 29.06.2016 | |
HR | 29.06.2016 | ||
LT | 29.06.2016 | ||
LV | 29.06.2016 | ||
RS | 29.06.2016 | ||
NO | 29.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | FI | 29.06.2016 | |
LT | 29.06.2016 | ||
NO | 29.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | LT | 29.06.2016 | |
NO | 29.09.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6129308 (NASTASI RICHARD F [US], et al); |