EP2669341 - Cleaning agent [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.05.2016 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.05.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.06.2016 [2016/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LCM GmbH Siemensstrasse 26-28 32120 Hiddenhausen / DE | [2013/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ludewig, Daniel Südholzstrasse 120 32257 Bünde / DE | [2013/49] | Representative(s) | Schober, Mirko Thielking & Elbertzhagen Patentanwälte Gadderbaumer Strasse 14 33602 Bielefeld / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/49] | Schober, Mirko Patentanwälte Thielking & Elbertzhagen Gadderbaumer Strasse 14 33602 Bielefeld / DE | Application number, filing date | 12004210.6 | 01.06.2012 | [2013/49] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2669341 | Date: | 04.12.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.10.2012 | Classification | IPC: | C09D9/00, C11D7/26, C11D7/32, C11D7/34, C11D11/00 | [2013/49] | CPC: |
C11D7/5022 (EP);
C09D9/04 (EP);
C11D7/266 (EP);
C11D7/3272 (EP);
C11D7/34 (EP);
C11D2111/20 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/49] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Reinigungsmittel | [2013/49] | English: | Cleaning agent | [2013/49] | French: | Produit de nettoyage | [2013/49] | Examination procedure | 04.06.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.06.2014 | Examination requested [2014/29] | 05.01.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/24] | 08.02.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2016/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2015 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE3815589 (SCHWARZWAELDER GOTTLOB [DE]) [X] 1-13 * example -; claim - *; | [X]DE19539394 (LOBECK CONCEPT AG [CH]) [X] 1-13 * example -; claim - *; | [X]EP0755987 (CFM GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-13 * example -; claim - *; | [X]US6159915 (MACHAC JR JAMES R [US], et al) [X] 1-13 * example -; claim - *; | [X]US6284720 (OPRE JAMES E [US]) [X] 1-13 * example -; claim - *; | [X]WO2009137096 (RHODIA [US], et al) [X] 1-13 * paragraph [0011]; example -; claim - *; | [X]WO2011018366 (RHODIA OPERATIONS [FR], et al) [X] 1-13* example -; claim - *; | [X]EP2345702 (COGNIS IP MAN GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-13 * example -; claim - * |