EP2512093 - IMPROVEMENTS TO AN AGILE NETWORK PROTOCOL FOR SECURE COMMUNICATIONS WITH ASSURED SYSTEM AVAILABILITY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2012/42] | Improvements to an agile network protocol for secure communications with assured system availability | ||
[2019/28] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.10.2020 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.11.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.06.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.10.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.11.2020 [2020/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VirnetX Inc. 308 Dorla Court, Suite 206 P.O. Box 439 Zephyr Cove, NV 89448-0439 / US | [2019/49] |
Former [2012/42] | For all designated states VirnetX Inc. 308 Dorla Court, Suite 206 P.O. Box 439 Zephyr Cove, NV 89448-0439 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Larson, Victor 12026 Lisa Marie Court Fairfax, VA 22033 / US | 02 /
Short, Robert Durham III 38710 Goose Creek Lane Leesburg, VA 20175 / US | 03 /
Munger, Edmund Colby 1101 Opaca Court Crownsville, MD 21032 / US | 04 /
Schmidt, Douglas Charles 230 Oak Court Severna Park, MD 21146 / US | 05 /
Williamson, Michael 26203 Ocala Circle South Riding, VA 20152 / US | [2019/49] |
Former [2012/42] | 01 /
Larson, Victor 12026 Lisa Marie Court Fairfax VA 22033 / US | ||
02 /
Short, Robert Durham III 38710 Goose Creek Lane Leesburg VA 20175 / US | |||
03 /
Munger, Edmund Colby 1101 Opaca Court Crownsville MD 21032 / US | |||
04 /
Schmidt, Douglas Charles 230 Oak Court Severna Park MD 21146 / US | |||
05 /
Williamson, Michael 26203 Ocala Circle South Riding VA 20152 / US | Representative(s) | Finnegan Europe LLP 1 London Bridge London SE1 9BG / GB | [2019/49] |
Former [2013/12] | Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | ||
Former [2012/42] | Benech, Frédéric 146-150, Avenue des Champs-Elysées 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 12004353.4 | 25.04.2001 | [2012/42] | Priority number, date | US20000558209 | 26.04.2000 Original published format: US 558209 | [2012/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2512093 | Date: | 17.10.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2512093 | Date: | 04.12.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.09.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/701, H04L12/707, H04L12/703, H04L29/12, H04L29/06 | [2019/26] | CPC: |
H04L63/162 (EP);
H04L45/24 (EP);
H04L45/28 (EP);
H04L61/00 (EP);
H04L61/35 (EP);
H04L61/5007 (EP);
H04L61/5076 (EP);
H04L61/5092 (EP);
H04L63/0272 (EP);
H04L63/029 (EP);
H04L63/0414 (EP);
H04L63/1491 (EP);
H04L63/164 (EP);
H04L2101/604 (EP);
H04L61/45 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2012/42] | H04L29/06, H04L29/12 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, GB, IT, LI, NL [2012/42] | Title | German: | VERBESSERUNGEN AN EINEM AGILEN NETZWERKPROTOKOLL FÜR SICHERE KOMMUNIKATIONEN MIT GESICHERTER SYSTEMVERFÜGBARKEIT | [2019/28] | English: | IMPROVEMENTS TO AN AGILE NETWORK PROTOCOL FOR SECURE COMMUNICATIONS WITH ASSURED SYSTEM AVAILABILITY | [2019/28] | French: | AMÉLIORATIONS D'UN PROTOCOLE DE RÉSEAU AGILE POUR COMMUNICATIONS SÉCURISÉES AVEC UNE DISPONIBILITÉ DU SYSTÈME ASSURÉE | [2019/28] |
Former [2012/42] | Verbesserungen an einem agilen Netzwerkprotokoll für sichere Kommunikationen mit gesicherter Systemverfügbarkeit | ||
Former [2012/42] | Improvements to an agile network protocol for secure communications with assured system availability | ||
Former [2012/42] | Améliorations dýun protocole de réseau agile pour communications sécurisées avec une disponibilité du système assurée | Examination procedure | 08.06.2012 | Examination requested [2012/42] | 17.04.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.04.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.09.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.10.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.05.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 30.07.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.06.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.10.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 26.10.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.10.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP01932629.7 / EP1302047 | EP06014500.0 / EP1755315 | Opposition(s) | 07.09.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/46] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 30.07.2018 | Request for further processing filed | 30.07.2018 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 08.08.2018 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 02.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 02.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 02.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 02.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 29.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 28.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 27.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 11.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 10.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 17 | 11.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 18 | 15.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 19 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9859470 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE], et al) [A] 1-22 * abstract ** page 3, line 4 - page 5, line 5 *; | [X]GB2340702 (SUN MICROSYSTEMS INC [US]) [X] 1-22 * abstract * * page 12, line 4 - page 18, line 24 * * page 21, line 1 - page 22, line 5 * * figure 1 *; | [E]WO0161922 (SCIENCE APPLIC INT CORP [US], et al) [E] 1-22 * abstract * * page 61, line 10 - page 64, line 9 * |