EP2510906 - A prosthesis and a prosthetic device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.04.2016 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 21.11.2018 [2018/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RSL Steeper Group Limited 51 Riverside Medway City Estate Rochester Kent ME2 4DP / GB | [2014/19] |
Former [2012/42] | For all designated states Rslsteeper Group Limited 51 Riverside Med way City Estate Rochester Kent ME2 4DP / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hunter, Mark 125 Eastwind Street No.2 Marina Del Rey California 90292 / US | 02 /
Al-Kazaz, Laith 61 Oakhall Park Bradford West Yorkshire BD13 3QW / GB | 03 /
Haggas, John Stephen 389 Cutler Heights Lane Bradford West Yorkshire BD4 9JL / GB | 04 /
Hamilton, Ian 99 York Road Tadcaster North Yorkshire LS24 8AR / GB | [2012/42] | Representative(s) | Crouch, David John, et al Bromhead Johnson LLP 57-59 High Street Twyford, Berkshire RG10 9AJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/42] | Crouch, David John, et al Bromhead Johnson Sovereign House 212-224 Shaftesbury Avenue London WC2H 8HQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 12004446.6 | 28.06.2010 | [2012/42] | Priority number, date | GB20090011510 | 02.07.2009 Original published format: GB 0911510 | GB20090011511 | 02.07.2009 Original published format: GB 0911511 | GB20100001443 | 28.01.2010 Original published format: GB 201001443 | GB20100007272 | 30.04.2010 Original published format: GB 201007272 | [2012/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2510906 | Date: | 17.10.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2510906 | Date: | 20.03.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2510906 | Date: | 10.06.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.02.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/58, A61F2/68, A61F2/54, A61F2/72, // A61F2/50 | [2013/12] | CPC: |
A61F2/583 (EP,US);
A61F2/586 (EP,US);
A61F2/70 (EP,US);
A61F2/585 (EP,US);
A61F2002/5001 (EP,US);
A61F2002/5093 (EP,US);
A61F2002/701 (EP,US);
A61F2002/704 (US);
A61F2002/762 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2012/42] | A61F2/58, A61F2/68 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/24] |
Former [2012/42] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Prothese und prothetische Vorrichtung | [2012/42] | English: | A prosthesis and a prosthetic device | [2012/42] | French: | Dispositif de prothèse et prothèse | [2014/13] |
Former [2012/42] | Dispositif de prothèse et aprothèse | Examination procedure | 03.06.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.09.2013 | Examination requested [2013/44] | 11.04.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.07.2014 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 09.01.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.04.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 30.04.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.04.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP10731553.3 / EP2448528 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.04.2014 | Opposition(s) | 11.03.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.06.2010 | AL | 10.06.2015 | BE | 10.06.2015 | CY | 10.06.2015 | CZ | 10.06.2015 | DK | 10.06.2015 | EE | 10.06.2015 | ES | 10.06.2015 | FI | 10.06.2015 | HR | 10.06.2015 | LT | 10.06.2015 | LV | 10.06.2015 | MC | 10.06.2015 | MK | 10.06.2015 | MT | 10.06.2015 | NL | 10.06.2015 | PL | 10.06.2015 | RO | 10.06.2015 | SI | 10.06.2015 | SK | 10.06.2015 | SM | 10.06.2015 | TR | 10.06.2015 | IE | 28.06.2015 | LU | 28.06.2015 | BG | 10.09.2015 | NO | 10.09.2015 | GR | 11.09.2015 | IS | 10.10.2015 | PT | 12.10.2015 | [2018/47] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 28.06.2010 | |
BE | 10.06.2015 | ||
CY | 10.06.2015 | ||
CZ | 10.06.2015 | ||
DK | 10.06.2015 | ||
EE | 10.06.2015 | ||
ES | 10.06.2015 | ||
FI | 10.06.2015 | ||
HR | 10.06.2015 | ||
LT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LV | 10.06.2015 | ||
MC | 10.06.2015 | ||
MK | 10.06.2015 | ||
MT | 10.06.2015 | ||
NL | 10.06.2015 | ||
PL | 10.06.2015 | ||
RO | 10.06.2015 | ||
SI | 10.06.2015 | ||
SK | 10.06.2015 | ||
SM | 10.06.2015 | ||
TR | 10.06.2015 | ||
IE | 28.06.2015 | ||
LU | 28.06.2015 | ||
BG | 10.09.2015 | ||
NO | 10.09.2015 | ||
GR | 11.09.2015 | ||
IS | 10.10.2015 | ||
PT | 12.10.2015 | ||
Former [2018/02] | HU | 28.06.2010 | |
BE | 10.06.2015 | ||
CY | 10.06.2015 | ||
CZ | 10.06.2015 | ||
DK | 10.06.2015 | ||
EE | 10.06.2015 | ||
ES | 10.06.2015 | ||
FI | 10.06.2015 | ||
HR | 10.06.2015 | ||
LT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LV | 10.06.2015 | ||
MC | 10.06.2015 | ||
MT | 10.06.2015 | ||
NL | 10.06.2015 | ||
PL | 10.06.2015 | ||
RO | 10.06.2015 | ||
SI | 10.06.2015 | ||
SK | 10.06.2015 | ||
SM | 10.06.2015 | ||
TR | 10.06.2015 | ||
IE | 28.06.2015 | ||
LU | 28.06.2015 | ||
BG | 10.09.2015 | ||
NO | 10.09.2015 | ||
GR | 11.09.2015 | ||
IS | 10.10.2015 | ||
PT | 12.10.2015 | ||
Former [2017/38] | HU | 28.06.2010 | |
BE | 10.06.2015 | ||
CY | 10.06.2015 | ||
CZ | 10.06.2015 | ||
DK | 10.06.2015 | ||
EE | 10.06.2015 | ||
ES | 10.06.2015 | ||
FI | 10.06.2015 | ||
HR | 10.06.2015 | ||
LT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LV | 10.06.2015 | ||
MC | 10.06.2015 | ||
MT | 10.06.2015 | ||
NL | 10.06.2015 | ||
PL | 10.06.2015 | ||
RO | 10.06.2015 | ||
SI | 10.06.2015 | ||
SK | 10.06.2015 | ||
SM | 10.06.2015 | ||
TR | 10.06.2015 | ||
IE | 28.06.2015 | ||
BG | 10.09.2015 | ||
NO | 10.09.2015 | ||
GR | 11.09.2015 | ||
IS | 10.10.2015 | ||
PT | 12.10.2015 | ||
Former [2017/03] | BE | 10.06.2015 | |
CZ | 10.06.2015 | ||
DK | 10.06.2015 | ||
EE | 10.06.2015 | ||
ES | 10.06.2015 | ||
FI | 10.06.2015 | ||
LT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LV | 10.06.2015 | ||
MC | 10.06.2015 | ||
MT | 10.06.2015 | ||
PL | 10.06.2015 | ||
RO | 10.06.2015 | ||
SI | 10.06.2015 | ||
SK | 10.06.2015 | ||
IE | 28.06.2015 | ||
BG | 10.09.2015 | ||
NO | 10.09.2015 | ||
GR | 11.09.2015 | ||
IS | 10.10.2015 | ||
PT | 12.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/24] | CZ | 10.06.2015 | |
DK | 10.06.2015 | ||
EE | 10.06.2015 | ||
ES | 10.06.2015 | ||
FI | 10.06.2015 | ||
LT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LV | 10.06.2015 | ||
MC | 10.06.2015 | ||
PL | 10.06.2015 | ||
RO | 10.06.2015 | ||
SI | 10.06.2015 | ||
SK | 10.06.2015 | ||
IE | 28.06.2015 | ||
BG | 10.09.2015 | ||
NO | 10.09.2015 | ||
GR | 11.09.2015 | ||
IS | 10.10.2015 | ||
PT | 12.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | CZ | 10.06.2015 | |
DK | 10.06.2015 | ||
EE | 10.06.2015 | ||
ES | 10.06.2015 | ||
FI | 10.06.2015 | ||
LT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LV | 10.06.2015 | ||
MC | 10.06.2015 | ||
PL | 10.06.2015 | ||
RO | 10.06.2015 | ||
SK | 10.06.2015 | ||
IE | 28.06.2015 | ||
BG | 10.09.2015 | ||
NO | 10.09.2015 | ||
GR | 11.09.2015 | ||
IS | 10.10.2015 | ||
PT | 12.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/18] | CZ | 10.06.2015 | |
EE | 10.06.2015 | ||
ES | 10.06.2015 | ||
FI | 10.06.2015 | ||
LT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LV | 10.06.2015 | ||
MC | 10.06.2015 | ||
PL | 10.06.2015 | ||
RO | 10.06.2015 | ||
SK | 10.06.2015 | ||
BG | 10.09.2015 | ||
NO | 10.09.2015 | ||
GR | 11.09.2015 | ||
IS | 10.10.2015 | ||
PT | 12.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | CZ | 10.06.2015 | |
EE | 10.06.2015 | ||
ES | 10.06.2015 | ||
FI | 10.06.2015 | ||
LT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LV | 10.06.2015 | ||
PL | 10.06.2015 | ||
RO | 10.06.2015 | ||
SK | 10.06.2015 | ||
BG | 10.09.2015 | ||
NO | 10.09.2015 | ||
GR | 11.09.2015 | ||
IS | 10.10.2015 | ||
PT | 12.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | EE | 10.06.2015 | |
ES | 10.06.2015 | ||
FI | 10.06.2015 | ||
LT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LV | 10.06.2015 | ||
BG | 10.09.2015 | ||
NO | 10.09.2015 | ||
GR | 11.09.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | ES | 10.06.2015 | |
FI | 10.06.2015 | ||
LT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LV | 10.06.2015 | ||
BG | 10.09.2015 | ||
NO | 10.09.2015 | ||
GR | 11.09.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | ES | 10.06.2015 | |
FI | 10.06.2015 | ||
LT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LV | 10.06.2015 | ||
NO | 10.09.2015 | ||
GR | 11.09.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2008030419 (HUNTER MARK [US]) [X] 1-8 * abstract * * page 3, line 20 - page 6, line 9 * * page 11, line 11 - page 16, line 16 * * page 22, line 2 - page 24, line 14 * * page 25, line 20 - page 27, line 17 *; | [X]DE102007013660 (GENESIS ADAPTIVE SYSTEME DEUTS [DE]) [X] 1-8 * abstract * * paragraphs [0005] - [0016] - [0030] , [0035] - [0040] *; | [XA]WO2008098072 (HANGER ORTHOPEDIC GROUP INC [US], et al) [X] 1-7 * abstract * * paragraphs [0002] , [0031] - [0033] - [0036] , [0041] * [A] 8; | [A]DE102007017417 (FESTO AG & CO KG [DE]) [A] 1-8 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] , [0004] , [0010] , [0020] , [0035] *; | [A]EP0516932 (SCHWEIZ UNFALLVERSICHERUNG [CH]) [A] 1-8 * abstract * * column 1, line 42 - column 2, line 27 *; | [A]US1267121 (SAKOWSKI MAX [US]) [A] 1-8 * figure - * * page 1, line 82 - page 2, line 39 *; | [A]DE10237373 (FRANKE MARC [DE]) [A] 9-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0010] - [0016] - [0024] , [0025] *; | [A]US4685924 (MASSEY PEYTON L [US]) [A] 9-15 * abstract * * column 6, line 55 - column 8, line 17 *; | [A]US2435614 (TUREMAN JR GARNET R) [A] 9-15 * abstract * * column 2, line 9 - column 3, line 44 *; | [A]GB170419 (DUNCAN MACKENZIE ANDERSON) [A] 9-15 * figure - * * page 1, line 63 - page 2, line 120 * * page 4, line 17 - page 5, line 29 *; | [A]US2542316 (FARRAR JR WILLIAM G) [A] 9-15 * figure - * * column 2, line 13 - column 3, line 26 * |