EP2538094 - Carabineer hook [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.09.2015 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ABA Hörtnagl GmbH Knappenweg 6 6166 Fulpmes / AT | [2014/47] |
Former [2012/52] | For all designated states ABA Hörtnagel GmbH Knappenweg 6 6166 Fulpmes / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hörtnagl, Andreas Auenweg 12 6166 Fulpmes / AT | [2012/52] | Representative(s) | Fechner, Thomas, et al Hofmann & Fechner Patentanwälte Hörnlingerstrasse 3 Postfach 5 6830 Rankweil / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2014/47] | Fechner, Thomas, et al Hofmann & Fechner Patentanwälte Hörnlingerstrasse 3 Postfach 50 6830 Rankweil / AT | ||
Former [2012/52] | Fechner, Thomas, et al Hofmann & Fechner Patentanwälte Egelseestraße 65a Postfach 61 6806 Feldkirch / AT | Application number, filing date | 12004559.6 | 18.06.2012 | [2012/52] | Priority number, date | AT20110000921 | 24.06.2011 Original published format: AT 9212011 | [2012/52] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2538094 | Date: | 26.12.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/52] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2538094 | Date: | 16.01.2013 | [2013/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2538094 | Date: | 19.11.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.12.2012 | Classification | IPC: | F16B45/02 | [2013/03] | CPC: |
F16B45/029 (EP,US);
F16B45/023 (EP,US);
F16B45/024 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/52] | Title | German: | Karabinerhaken | [2012/52] | English: | Carabineer hook | [2012/52] | French: | Crochet de mousqueton | [2012/52] | Examination procedure | 08.04.2013 | Examination requested [2013/21] | 19.08.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.10.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 07.10.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.10.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.08.2014 | Opposition(s) | 20.08.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 18.06.2012 | AL | 19.11.2014 | BG | 19.11.2014 | CY | 19.11.2014 | DK | 19.11.2014 | EE | 19.11.2014 | FI | 19.11.2014 | HR | 19.11.2014 | LT | 19.11.2014 | LV | 19.11.2014 | MC | 19.11.2014 | MK | 19.11.2014 | MT | 19.11.2014 | NL | 19.11.2014 | PL | 19.11.2014 | RO | 19.11.2014 | RS | 19.11.2014 | SE | 19.11.2014 | SI | 19.11.2014 | SM | 19.11.2014 | TR | 19.11.2014 | NO | 19.02.2015 | GR | 20.02.2015 | IS | 19.03.2015 | PT | 19.03.2015 | IE | 18.06.2015 | LU | 18.06.2015 | BE | 30.06.2015 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 18.06.2012 | |
BG | 19.11.2014 | ||
CY | 19.11.2014 | ||
DK | 19.11.2014 | ||
EE | 19.11.2014 | ||
FI | 19.11.2014 | ||
HR | 19.11.2014 | ||
LT | 19.11.2014 | ||
LV | 19.11.2014 | ||
MC | 19.11.2014 | ||
MK | 19.11.2014 | ||
MT | 19.11.2014 | ||
NL | 19.11.2014 | ||
PL | 19.11.2014 | ||
RO | 19.11.2014 | ||
RS | 19.11.2014 | ||
SE | 19.11.2014 | ||
SI | 19.11.2014 | ||
SM | 19.11.2014 | ||
TR | 19.11.2014 | ||
NO | 19.02.2015 | ||
GR | 20.02.2015 | ||
IS | 19.03.2015 | ||
PT | 19.03.2015 | ||
IE | 18.06.2015 | ||
LU | 18.06.2015 | ||
BE | 30.06.2015 | ||
Former [2017/38] | HU | 18.06.2012 | |
BG | 19.11.2014 | ||
CY | 19.11.2014 | ||
DK | 19.11.2014 | ||
EE | 19.11.2014 | ||
FI | 19.11.2014 | ||
HR | 19.11.2014 | ||
LT | 19.11.2014 | ||
LV | 19.11.2014 | ||
MC | 19.11.2014 | ||
MT | 19.11.2014 | ||
NL | 19.11.2014 | ||
PL | 19.11.2014 | ||
RO | 19.11.2014 | ||
RS | 19.11.2014 | ||
SE | 19.11.2014 | ||
SI | 19.11.2014 | ||
SM | 19.11.2014 | ||
TR | 19.11.2014 | ||
NO | 19.02.2015 | ||
GR | 20.02.2015 | ||
IS | 19.03.2015 | ||
PT | 19.03.2015 | ||
IE | 18.06.2015 | ||
LU | 18.06.2015 | ||
BE | 30.06.2015 | ||
Former [2017/03] | CY | 19.11.2014 | |
DK | 19.11.2014 | ||
EE | 19.11.2014 | ||
FI | 19.11.2014 | ||
HR | 19.11.2014 | ||
LT | 19.11.2014 | ||
LV | 19.11.2014 | ||
MC | 19.11.2014 | ||
MT | 19.11.2014 | ||
NL | 19.11.2014 | ||
PL | 19.11.2014 | ||
RO | 19.11.2014 | ||
RS | 19.11.2014 | ||
SE | 19.11.2014 | ||
SI | 19.11.2014 | ||
NO | 19.02.2015 | ||
GR | 20.02.2015 | ||
IS | 19.03.2015 | ||
PT | 19.03.2015 | ||
IE | 18.06.2015 | ||
LU | 18.06.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | CY | 19.11.2014 | |
DK | 19.11.2014 | ||
EE | 19.11.2014 | ||
FI | 19.11.2014 | ||
HR | 19.11.2014 | ||
LT | 19.11.2014 | ||
LV | 19.11.2014 | ||
MC | 19.11.2014 | ||
NL | 19.11.2014 | ||
PL | 19.11.2014 | ||
RO | 19.11.2014 | ||
RS | 19.11.2014 | ||
SE | 19.11.2014 | ||
SI | 19.11.2014 | ||
NO | 19.02.2015 | ||
GR | 20.02.2015 | ||
IS | 19.03.2015 | ||
PT | 19.03.2015 | ||
IE | 18.06.2015 | ||
LU | 18.06.2015 | ||
Former [2016/11] | CY | 19.11.2014 | |
DK | 19.11.2014 | ||
EE | 19.11.2014 | ||
FI | 19.11.2014 | ||
HR | 19.11.2014 | ||
LT | 19.11.2014 | ||
LV | 19.11.2014 | ||
MC | 19.11.2014 | ||
NL | 19.11.2014 | ||
PL | 19.11.2014 | ||
RO | 19.11.2014 | ||
RS | 19.11.2014 | ||
SE | 19.11.2014 | ||
SI | 19.11.2014 | ||
NO | 19.02.2015 | ||
GR | 20.02.2015 | ||
IS | 19.03.2015 | ||
PT | 19.03.2015 | ||
LU | 18.06.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | CY | 19.11.2014 | |
DK | 19.11.2014 | ||
EE | 19.11.2014 | ||
FI | 19.11.2014 | ||
HR | 19.11.2014 | ||
LT | 19.11.2014 | ||
LV | 19.11.2014 | ||
MC | 19.11.2014 | ||
NL | 19.11.2014 | ||
PL | 19.11.2014 | ||
RO | 19.11.2014 | ||
RS | 19.11.2014 | ||
SE | 19.11.2014 | ||
NO | 19.02.2015 | ||
GR | 20.02.2015 | ||
IS | 19.03.2015 | ||
PT | 19.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | CY | 19.11.2014 | |
DK | 19.11.2014 | ||
EE | 19.11.2014 | ||
FI | 19.11.2014 | ||
HR | 19.11.2014 | ||
LT | 19.11.2014 | ||
LV | 19.11.2014 | ||
NL | 19.11.2014 | ||
PL | 19.11.2014 | ||
RO | 19.11.2014 | ||
RS | 19.11.2014 | ||
SE | 19.11.2014 | ||
NO | 19.02.2015 | ||
GR | 20.02.2015 | ||
IS | 19.03.2015 | ||
PT | 19.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | CY | 19.11.2014 | |
DK | 19.11.2014 | ||
EE | 19.11.2014 | ||
FI | 19.11.2014 | ||
HR | 19.11.2014 | ||
LT | 19.11.2014 | ||
LV | 19.11.2014 | ||
NL | 19.11.2014 | ||
PL | 19.11.2014 | ||
RS | 19.11.2014 | ||
SE | 19.11.2014 | ||
NO | 19.02.2015 | ||
GR | 20.02.2015 | ||
IS | 19.03.2015 | ||
PT | 19.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/26] | CY | 19.11.2014 | |
FI | 19.11.2014 | ||
HR | 19.11.2014 | ||
LT | 19.11.2014 | ||
LV | 19.11.2014 | ||
NL | 19.11.2014 | ||
PL | 19.11.2014 | ||
RS | 19.11.2014 | ||
SE | 19.11.2014 | ||
NO | 19.02.2015 | ||
GR | 20.02.2015 | ||
IS | 19.03.2015 | ||
PT | 19.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/24] | FI | 19.11.2014 | |
HR | 19.11.2014 | ||
LT | 19.11.2014 | ||
LV | 19.11.2014 | ||
NL | 19.11.2014 | ||
PL | 19.11.2014 | ||
RS | 19.11.2014 | ||
SE | 19.11.2014 | ||
NO | 19.02.2015 | ||
GR | 20.02.2015 | ||
IS | 19.03.2015 | ||
PT | 19.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/23] | FI | 19.11.2014 | |
LT | 19.11.2014 | ||
NL | 19.11.2014 | ||
NO | 19.02.2015 | ||
IS | 19.03.2015 | ||
PT | 19.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/22] | LT | 19.11.2014 | |
NO | 19.02.2015 | ||
PT | 19.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/21] | LT | 19.11.2014 | |
NO | 19.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/20] | LT | 19.11.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE9102003U ; | [A]WO9519505 (STUBAI WERKZEUGIND [AT], et al); | [AD]DE29610293U (KONG DEUTSCHLAND GMBH [DE]); | [A]US6588076 (CHOATE GARY E [US]); | [A]WO2005073571 (THOMPSON ROCKE P [US]); | [A]US2011023275 (THOMPSON ROCKE P [US]) | by applicant | DE29610293U |