EP2676544 - Pet grooming glove [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.12.2014 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.01.2015 [2015/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Daily Life, LLC. A Ohio Corporation 415 E. Main Street Suite 340 Canfield OH 44406 / US | [2013/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Zavoral, Ernest 5375 Mission Hills Drive Canfield OH 44406 / US | 02 /
Stathopoulos, Rose 115 Sandcherry Court Pickering Ontario L1V 6V8 / CA | [2013/52] | Representative(s) | Grosse Schumacher Knauer von Hirschhausen Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schloss Schellenberg - Backhaus Renteilichtung 1 45134 Essen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/52] | GROSSE SCHUMACHER KNAUER VON HIRSCHHAUSEN Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Frühlingstrasse 43A 45133 Essen / DE | Application number, filing date | 12004692.5 | 22.06.2012 | [2013/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2676544 | Date: | 25.12.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.10.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A01K13/00, A41D19/00, A47L13/18 | [2013/52] | CPC: |
A01K13/001 (EP);
A41D19/0024 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/52] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Handschuh zum Pflegen von Haustieren | [2013/52] | English: | Pet grooming glove | [2013/52] | French: | Gant de toilettage pour animaux | [2013/52] | Examination procedure | 26.06.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/02] | 01.08.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2015/02] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2014 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US1533732 (LIVINGSTONE FROST RUPERT) [Y] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [Y]US836181 (CRAY JAMES [US]) [Y] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [A]US1530327 (REDLICK WILLIAM G) [A] 1-11 * the whole document * | by applicant | US5524575 | US5722349 | US5441335 | US5169251 | US5682837 | US6968808 | US6109214 | US6834619 |