EP2506231 - Covert camera with a fixed lens [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 06.03.2020 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2020 | Withdrawal of application | published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROSEMOUNT AEROSPACE INC. 14300 Judicial Road Burnsville MN 55306-4898 / US | [2012/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Peterson, Ericka, A. 9600 50th St. W Lonsdale Minnesota 55406 / US | 02 /
Schwartz, Richard, A. 13375 Fox Lake Trail Faribault Minnesota 55021 / US | [2012/40] | Representative(s) | Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/19] | Leckey, David Herbert, et al Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | ||
Former [2012/40] | Bailey, Richard Alan Marks & Clerk LLP 20 Imperial Square Cheltenham GL50 1QZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 12004766.7 | 16.06.2009 | [2012/40] | Priority number, date | US20080242253 | 30.09.2008 Original published format: US 242253 | [2012/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2506231 | Date: | 03.10.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.08.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G08B13/196, G03B17/55, H04N5/225, // G08B13/194 | [2012/40] | CPC: |
G03B17/55 (EP,US);
H04N23/51 (EP,US);
G08B13/19619 (EP,US);
G08B13/19626 (EP,US);
G08B13/19628 (EP,US);
G08B13/1965 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2012/40] | Title | German: | Versteckte Kamera mit einem feststehenden Objektiv | [2012/40] | English: | Covert camera with a fixed lens | [2012/40] | French: | Composition antimicrobienne | [2012/40] | Examination procedure | 03.07.2012 | Examination requested [2012/40] | 27.02.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.12.2015 | Invitation to indicate the basis for amendments (Time limit: M01) | 05.02.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 12.04.2016 | Reply to an invitation to indicate the basis for amendments | 07.02.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.08.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.04.2019 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 14.05.2019 | 14.05.2019 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 03.03.2020 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2020/15] | 03.03.2020 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 18.06.2020 | 18.06.2020 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP09007891.6 / EP2169642 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20090007891) is 20.07.2010 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 12.04.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 12.04.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 21.04.2016 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 22.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 22.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 21.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4803557 (BRIDGES MARK E [US]) [A] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [A]US6072529 (MUTZE ULRICH [DE]) [A] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [I]WO03047240 (THALES AVIONICS IN FLIGHT SYST [US]) [I] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [A]US2003137426 (ANTHONY ERIC [US], et al) [A] 1-6* the whole document *; | [I]US2007172227 (DROEGE FRANK [DE], et al) [I] 1-6 * the whole document * |