EP2522512 - Extending tool of sheet-like material [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.11.2014 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.11.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.12.2014 [2014/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kasuya, Furetsu 8-14 Tsudamachi 1 chome Kodaira-shi Tokyo 187-0025 / JP | [2012/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2012/46] | Representative(s) | Farrington, Graham, et al Ladas & Parry London Limited Temple Chambers 3-7 Temple Avenue London EC4Y 0DA / GB | [2014/24] |
Former [2012/46] | Wotherspoon, Hugh Robert, et al Langner Parry 1-2 Bolt Court London EC4A 3DQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 12005007.5 | 08.02.2007 | [2012/46] | Priority number, date | JP20060031145 | 08.02.2006 Original published format: JP 2006031145 | [2012/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2522512 | Date: | 14.11.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/46] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2522512 | Date: | 04.12.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.11.2013 | Classification | IPC: | B41F15/36, B44D3/18, G09F15/00, B05C17/08, B41C1/14, B41N1/24, H05K3/12 | [2012/46] | CPC: |
G09F15/0025 (EP,KR,US);
B41F15/36 (EP,KR,US);
B41N1/248 (EP,KR,US);
B44D3/18 (EP,KR,US);
B44D3/185 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2012/46] | Title | German: | Verlängerungswerkzeug aus plattenähnlichem Material | [2012/46] | English: | Extending tool of sheet-like material | [2012/46] | French: | Outil d'extension d'un matériau du type feuille | [2012/46] | Examination procedure | 05.06.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/52] | 11.07.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2014/52] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP07713927.7 / EP1982834 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20070713927) is 06.07.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2014 | 08   M06   Fee paid on   29.08.2014 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US3914887 (NEWMAN DON) [Y] 1 * figures 2,4,10,12 *; | [Y]US4023488 (ZIMMER PETER) [Y] 1 * column 2, lines 29-40; figures 1,3 *; | [A]JPH0219532U (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) [A] 1 * figures 1a,1b * * the whole document *; | [A]US5076162 (GOIN BOBBY G [US]) [A] 1* figures 1-4 *; | [A]WO03025302 (KLUTH MANFRED [DE]) [A] 1 * figures 4,6 *; | [I]GB2388073 (TANNLIN LTD [GB]) [I] 1 * figures 1a,2a,4a,4b,5,7c,10d *; | [Y]FR2840851 (NOVATEC SA SOC [FR]) [Y] 1 * page 12, lines 12-21; figure 5 *; | [Y]JP2004262216 (DAISHIN SEIKI KK) [Y] 1 * the whole document *; | [I]US2005034614 (KASUYA FURETSU [JP]) [I] 1 * figures 3a,4,5,7 * | by applicant | US3482343 | US3485165 | JPS55136533U | JPH01141027 | JPH01141027U | US5076162 | WO9203231 | US5113611 | US5265534 | US5271171 | US5802971 | WO02055304 | US6427588 |