EP2555435 - Unified binarization for CABAC/CAVLC entropy coding [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.03.2017 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.03.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.04.2017 [2017/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Broadcom Corporation 5300 California Avenue Irvine, CA 92617 / US | [2013/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Heng, Brian 22 Peony Irvine CA 92618 / US | 02 /
Shen, Ba-Zhong 28 Great Lawn Irvine CA 92620 / US | [2013/06] | Representative(s) | Jehle, Volker Armin Bosch Jehle Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Flüggenstrasse 13 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/06] | Jehle, Volker Armin Bosch Jehle Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Flüggenstrasse 13 80639 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12005122.2 | 11.07.2012 | [2013/06] | Priority number, date | US201161515819P | 05.08.2011 Original published format: US 201161515819 P | US201213523818 | 14.06.2012 Original published format: US201213523818 | [2013/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2555435 | Date: | 06.02.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.11.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H03M7/40, H04N7/26 | [2013/06] | CPC: |
H03M7/4006 (EP,US);
H04N7/24 (KR);
H03M7/40 (EP,US);
H03M7/4018 (EP,US);
H04N1/41 (KR);
H04N19/13 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/06] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Vereinigte Binärisierung für CABAC/CAVLC-Entropiecodierung | [2013/06] | English: | Unified binarization for CABAC/CAVLC entropy coding | [2013/06] | French: | Binarisation unifiée pour codage dýentropie CABAC/CAVLC | [2013/06] | Examination procedure | 06.08.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.08.2013 | Examination requested [2013/37] | 11.07.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.11.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/17] | 20.12.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/17] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.07.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2010079312 (CHOO KI HYUN [KR], et al) [X] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [X]WO2008053755 (CANON KK [JP], et al) [X] 1-3,5-10,13-15 * the whole document *; | [A]EP2150061 (NEC CORP [JP]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0030]; figures 12, 13 * |