EP2549710 - Process management system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.04.2018 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.08.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.04.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.05.2018 [2018/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ABB Schweiz AG Brown Boveri Strasse 6 5400 Baden / CH | [2016/33] |
Former [2013/04] | For all designated states ABB Technology AG Affolternstrasse 44 8050 Zürich / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dewitz, Gerd, Dipl.-Ing. Weimarer Strase 12 32107 Bad Salzuflen / DE | 02 /
Prytz, Gunnar Soendre Boelstadvei 20 3430 Spikkestad / NO | 03 /
Gienke, Michael Klewergarten 12 30449 Hannover / DE | 04 /
Schierholz, Ragnar Dorfstrasse 49 5436 Würenlos / CH | 05 /
Bollmeyer, Stefan Kerkweg 10 32425 Minden / DE | 06 /
Pauly, Thomas Fagelviksvägen 56 723 48 Västeras / SE | [2013/04] | Representative(s) | Marks, Frank C/o ABB AG, GF-IP Oberhausener Str. 33 40472 Ratingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/04] | Marks, Frank C/o ABB AG, GF-IP Oberhausener Str. 33 40472 Ratingen / DE | Application number, filing date | 12005128.9 | 11.07.2012 | [2013/04] | Priority number, date | DE201110108003 | 19.07.2011 Original published format: DE102011108003 | [2013/04] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2549710 | Date: | 23.01.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/04] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2549710 | Date: | 08.06.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.05.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/06, H04L12/22, G06F21/64, H04L9/32 | [2016/23] | CPC: |
H04L63/12 (EP,US);
G06F21/64 (EP,US);
H04L63/0823 (EP,US);
H04L9/3263 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2013/04] | H04L29/06, H04L12/22 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/02] |
Former [2013/04] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Prozessleitsystem | [2013/04] | English: | Process management system | [2013/04] | French: | Système de commande de processus | [2013/04] | Examination procedure | 11.07.2012 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.12.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.12.2016 | Examination requested [2017/02] | 14.08.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.01.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/21] | 18.01.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/21] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.08.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2017 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP1403749 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1-20 * abstract * * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0021] * * paragraph [0026] * * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0037] *; | [X]US2011167257 (GOSSEL SVEN [DE]) [X] 1-20 * abstract * * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0020] * * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0034] *; | [A]US2001019614 (MADOUKH ASHRAF [US]) [A] 1-20 * abstract * * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0012] * * paragraph [0037] - paragraph [0042] * * paragraph [0046] - paragraph [0050] * | by applicant | EP0597561 |