EP2518210 - Methods for bonding structural elements of paper machine and industrial fabrics to one another and fabrics produced thereby [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.07.2017 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.07.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 15.08.2018 [2018/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Albany International Corp. 216 Airport Drive Rochester, NH 03867 / US | [2016/36] |
Former [2012/44] | For all designated states Albany International Corporation 1373 Broadway Albany, New York 12204 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Davenport, Francis, L. 29 North Hill Road Ballston Lake, NY 12019 / US | 02 /
Kramer, Charles, E. 7 Metacomet Street Walpole, MA 02081 / US | 03 /
O'Connor, Joseph, G. 14 Ben's Way Hopedale, MA 01747 / US | 04 /
Paquin, Maurice P.O. Box 2251 Plainville, MA 02762 / US | [2012/44] | Representative(s) | Broydé, Marc Bugnion Genève Bugnion S.A. Conseils de Propriété Industrielle Route de Florissant 10, Case Postale 375 1211 Genève 12 / CH | [2013/11] |
Former [2012/44] | Forstmeyer, Dietmar, et al BOETERS & LIECK Oberanger 32 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12005319.4 | 06.11.2003 | [2012/44] | Priority number, date | US20020334249 | 31.12.2002 Original published format: US 334249 | [2012/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2518210 | Date: | 31.10.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2518210 | Date: | 07.09.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.10.2012 | Classification | IPC: | D21F1/00, D21F7/08, D21F7/10, B32B7/14, B32B5/02, B29C53/58, B29C65/02, B29C65/48, B29C65/52, B32B5/26 | [2012/44] | CPC: |
B29C53/58 (EP,US);
D06N7/00 (KR);
B29C65/02 (EP,US);
B29C65/08 (EP,US);
B29C65/522 (EP,US);
B29C66/1122 (EP,US);
B29C66/21 (EP,US);
B29C66/43 (EP,US);
B29C66/69 (EP,US);
B29C66/729 (EP,US);
B32B5/02 (KR);
D04H3/04 (EP,US);
D04H3/12 (EP,US);
D21F1/00 (KR);
D21F1/0027 (EP,US);
D21F1/0036 (EP,US);
D21F1/0054 (EP,US);
D21F7/00 (KR);
B29C65/4835 (EP,US);
B29C65/484 (EP,US);
B29C65/4845 (EP,US);
B29C65/485 (EP,US);
B29C65/4875 (EP,US);
B29C66/71 (EP,US);
B29C66/9672 (EP,US);
B29K2023/00 (EP,US);
B29K2067/00 (EP,US);
B29K2075/00 (EP,US);
B29K2077/00 (EP,US);
B29K2077/10 (EP,US);
B29K2105/0854 (EP,US);
B29K2313/00 (EP,US);
Y10S162/90 (EP,US);
Y10S162/902 (EP,US);
Y10S162/903 (EP,US);
Y10S162/904 (EP,US);
Y10T428/192 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24777 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24785 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24793 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2481 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24826 (EP,US);
Y10T442/2738 (EP,US);
Y10T442/3179 (EP,US);
Y10T442/3195 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
B29C66/71, B29K2023/00 (EP,US);
B29C66/71, B29K2067/00 (US,EP);
B29C66/71, B29K2075/00 (US,EP);
B29C66/71, B29K2077/00 (EP,US); | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/36] |
Former [2012/44] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Binden von Strukturelementen einer Papiermaschine und von Industriegeweben sowie damit hergestellte Gewebe | [2012/44] | English: | Methods for bonding structural elements of paper machine and industrial fabrics to one another and fabrics produced thereby | [2012/44] | French: | Procédés de liaison d'éléments structurels de machine à papier et tissus industriels et tissus ainsi produits | [2012/44] | Examination procedure | 30.04.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.04.2013 | Examination requested [2013/24] | 25.06.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.10.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.06.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.10.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.05.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.07.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 29.07.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.07.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP03781789.7 / EP1581691 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20030781789) is 12.07.2010 | Opposition(s) | 08.06.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 18.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 18.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 26.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 26.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 30.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 20.07.2012 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   18.01.2013 | 20.07.2012 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   18.01.2013 | 20.07.2012 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   18.01.2013 | 20.07.2012 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   18.01.2013 | 20.07.2012 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   18.01.2013 | 20.07.2012 | 08   M06   Fee paid on   18.01.2013 | 20.07.2012 | 09   M06   Fee paid on   18.01.2013 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 06.11.2003 | CY | 07.09.2016 | DK | 07.09.2016 | EE | 07.09.2016 | MC | 07.09.2016 | RO | 07.09.2016 | SI | 07.09.2016 | SK | 07.09.2016 | TR | 07.09.2016 | IE | 06.11.2016 | LU | 30.11.2016 | BG | 07.12.2016 | GR | 08.12.2016 | PT | 09.01.2017 | [2018/29] |
Former [2018/28] | HU | 06.11.2003 | |
CY | 07.09.2016 | ||
DK | 07.09.2016 | ||
EE | 07.09.2016 | ||
MC | 07.09.2016 | ||
RO | 07.09.2016 | ||
SI | 07.09.2016 | ||
SK | 07.09.2016 | ||
IE | 06.11.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
BG | 07.12.2016 | ||
GR | 08.12.2016 | ||
PT | 09.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | DK | 07.09.2016 | |
EE | 07.09.2016 | ||
RO | 07.09.2016 | ||
SI | 07.09.2016 | ||
SK | 07.09.2016 | ||
IE | 06.11.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
BG | 07.12.2016 | ||
GR | 08.12.2016 | ||
PT | 09.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/45] | DK | 07.09.2016 | |
EE | 07.09.2016 | ||
RO | 07.09.2016 | ||
SI | 07.09.2016 | ||
SK | 07.09.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
BG | 07.12.2016 | ||
GR | 08.12.2016 | ||
PT | 09.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/37] | DK | 07.09.2016 | |
EE | 07.09.2016 | ||
RO | 07.09.2016 | ||
SI | 07.09.2016 | ||
SK | 07.09.2016 | ||
BG | 07.12.2016 | ||
GR | 08.12.2016 | ||
PT | 09.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/34] | DK | 07.09.2016 | |
EE | 07.09.2016 | ||
RO | 07.09.2016 | ||
SK | 07.09.2016 | ||
BG | 07.12.2016 | ||
GR | 08.12.2016 | ||
PT | 09.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/32] | EE | 07.09.2016 | |
RO | 07.09.2016 | ||
SK | 07.09.2016 | ||
BG | 07.12.2016 | ||
GR | 08.12.2016 | ||
PT | 09.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/13] | GR | 08.12.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]US6120642 (LINDSAY JEFFREY DEAN [US], et al) [X] 14,19,20 * column 5, lines 57-66 * * column 6, lines 26-45 * [A] 1-13,17,18 [I] 15,16; | [XAI]US4439273 (CURRY THOMAS H [US]) [X] 14,19,20 * column 1, lines 13-15; figure .; claim . * * column 2, line 20 - column 3, line 52 * [A] 1-13,17,18 [I] 15,16; | [XAI]US4528236 (FINN WILLIAM A [US], et al) [X] 14,19,20 * column 1, lines 44-55; figure -; claim 1 * * column 3, lines 56-68 * [A] 1-13,17,18 [I] 15,16 | by applicant | US3042568 | US3673023 | US4109543 | US5240531 | US5360656 | US5713399 | US6350336 |