EP2690060 - Catalyst for thermochemical water splitting [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.07.2018 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.07.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.08.2018 [2018/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Saudi Basic Industries Corporation P.O. Box 5101 Riyadh 11422 / SA | [2014/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Idriss, Hicham Saudi Basic Industries Corporation P.O. Box 5101 11422 Riyadh / SA | 02 /
Al-Shankiti, Braheam Saudi Basic Industries Corporation P.O. Box 5101 11422 Riyadh / SA | 03 /
Choi, Yong Man Saudi Basic Industries Corporation P.O. Box 5101 11422 Riyadh / SA | 04 /
Al-Otaibi, Faisa Mohammed Saudi Basic Industries Corporation P.O. Box 5101 11422 Riyadh / SA | [2014/05] | Representative(s) | Modiano, Micaela Nadia, et al Modiano & Partners Thierschstrasse 11 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/09] | Modiano, Micaela Nadia, et al Modiano & Partners Thierschstrasse 11 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12005418.4 | 25.07.2012 | [2014/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2690060 | Date: | 29.01.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.02.2013 | Classification | IPC: | C01B3/04, C01B31/18, B01J23/12, B01J23/10, B01J21/06, B01J37/03, B01J23/00 | [2014/05] | CPC: |
B01J23/12 (EP,US);
B01J21/066 (US);
B01J23/10 (US);
B01J35/00 (US);
B01J35/30 (EP,US);
B01J35/613 (EP,US);
B01J37/031 (EP,US);
B01J37/08 (US);
B01J37/10 (EP,US);
B01J37/12 (EP,US);
B01J37/16 (EP,US);
C01B3/045 (EP,US);
C01B3/063 (US);
C01B32/40 (EP,US);
B01J2523/00 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
B01J2523/00, B01J2523/3712, B01J2523/397, B01J2523/48 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/05] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Katalysator für thermochemische Wassertrennung | [2014/05] | English: | Catalyst for thermochemical water splitting | [2014/05] | French: | Catalyseur pour hydrolyse thermochimique | [2014/05] | Examination procedure | 29.07.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.07.2014 | Examination requested [2014/37] | 06.11.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.03.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/34] | 12.04.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/34] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.11.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB1489054 (COMP GENERALE ELECTRICITE); |