EP2551970 - Audio jack and electronic apparatus containing the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.12.2015 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.12.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.01.2016 [2016/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Mobile Communications AB Nya Vattentornet 221 88 Lund / SE | [2013/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tian, Xiyong 16F, Sony Ericsson Building No. 16, Guangshun South Street Wangjing Chaoyang District Beijing 100102 / CN | 02 /
Li, Lingchang 15F, Sony Ericsson Building No. 16, Guangshun South Street Wangjing Chaoyang District Beijing 100102 / CN | 03 /
Liu, Yinong 16F, Sony Ericsson Building No. 16, Guangshun South Street Wangjing Chaoyang District Beijing 100102 / CN | [2013/05] | Representative(s) | Banzer, Hans-Jörg, et al Kraus & Weisert Patentanwälte PartGmbB Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/05] | Banzer, Hans-Jörg, et al Kraus & Weisert Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12005460.6 | 26.07.2012 | [2013/05] | Priority number, date | CN20111214112 | 28.07.2011 Original published format: CN201110214112 | US201213556600 | 24.07.2012 Original published format: US201213556600 | [2013/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2551970 | Date: | 30.01.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/05] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2551970 | Date: | 06.02.2013 | [2013/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.01.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H01R27/00, H01R29/00, // H01R24/58, H01R107/00 | [2013/06] | CPC: |
H01R27/00 (EP);
H01R29/00 (EP);
H01R2107/00 (EP);
H01R24/58 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/05] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Audio Buchse und dazu gehörigendes Gerät | [2013/05] | English: | Audio jack and electronic apparatus containing the same | [2013/05] | French: | Prise audio et appareil la contenant | [2013/05] | Examination procedure | 31.07.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.07.2013 | Examination requested [2013/40] | 26.03.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.08.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/01] | 01.09.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/01] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.03.2015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2015 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]WO2007049175 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [X] 1 * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0032]; claim 1 * * figures 2,3 * [Y] 2-11; | [Y]US2009176414 (CHIEN MIN-LUNG [TW], et al) [Y] 2-11 * figures 2, 4E, 5 * |