EP2579117 - Method of adjusting the position of origin of a machine and a machine having a function for adjusting the position of origin [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.05.2016 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 21.11.2018 [2018/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FANUC CORPORATION 3580 Shibokusa Aza-Komanba Oshino-mura Minamitsuru-gun Yamanashi 401-0597 / JP | [2013/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Abe, Hiroyuki c/o FANUC CORPORATION 3580, Shibokusa Aza-Komanba Oshino-mura Minamitsuru-gun Yamanashi 401-0597 / JP | [2013/15] | Representative(s) | Thum, Bernhard Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/27] | Thum, Bernhard Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | ||
Former [2013/15] | Thum, Bernhard Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12005463.0 | 26.07.2012 | [2013/15] | Priority number, date | JP20110223216 | 07.10.2011 Original published format: JP 2011223216 | [2013/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2579117 | Date: | 10.04.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/15] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2579117 | Date: | 19.06.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2579117 | Date: | 01.07.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.05.2013 | Classification | IPC: | G05B19/404 | [2013/25] | CPC: |
G05B19/404 (EP,US);
G05B2219/37153 (EP,US);
G05B2219/50025 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2013/15] | G05B19/401 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/27] |
Former [2013/15] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Anpassung der Ursprungsposition einer Maschine, und Maschine mit einer Funktion zur Anpassung der Ursprungsposition | [2013/15] | English: | Method of adjusting the position of origin of a machine and a machine having a function for adjusting the position of origin | [2013/15] | French: | Procédé de réglage de la position d'origine d'une machine et machine ayant une fonction de réglage de la position d'origine | [2013/15] | Examination procedure | 19.04.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.04.2013 | Examination requested [2013/22] | 12.02.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.05.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.02.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.05.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 18.05.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.05.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.02.2014 | Opposition(s) | 04.04.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 26.07.2012 | AL | 01.07.2015 | AT | 01.07.2015 | BE | 01.07.2015 | BG | 01.07.2015 | CY | 01.07.2015 | CZ | 01.07.2015 | DK | 01.07.2015 | EE | 01.07.2015 | ES | 01.07.2015 | FI | 01.07.2015 | HR | 01.07.2015 | IT | 01.07.2015 | LT | 01.07.2015 | LV | 01.07.2015 | MC | 01.07.2015 | MK | 01.07.2015 | MT | 01.07.2015 | NL | 01.07.2015 | PL | 01.07.2015 | RO | 01.07.2015 | RS | 01.07.2015 | SE | 01.07.2015 | SI | 01.07.2015 | SK | 01.07.2015 | SM | 01.07.2015 | TR | 01.07.2015 | IE | 26.07.2015 | LU | 26.07.2015 | FR | 01.09.2015 | NO | 01.10.2015 | GR | 02.10.2015 | IS | 01.11.2015 | PT | 02.11.2015 | [2018/47] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 26.07.2012 | |
AT | 01.07.2015 | ||
BE | 01.07.2015 | ||
BG | 01.07.2015 | ||
CY | 01.07.2015 | ||
CZ | 01.07.2015 | ||
DK | 01.07.2015 | ||
EE | 01.07.2015 | ||
ES | 01.07.2015 | ||
FI | 01.07.2015 | ||
HR | 01.07.2015 | ||
IT | 01.07.2015 | ||
LT | 01.07.2015 | ||
LV | 01.07.2015 | ||
MC | 01.07.2015 | ||
MK | 01.07.2015 | ||
MT | 01.07.2015 | ||
NL | 01.07.2015 | ||
PL | 01.07.2015 | ||
RO | 01.07.2015 | ||
RS | 01.07.2015 | ||
SE | 01.07.2015 | ||
SI | 01.07.2015 | ||
SK | 01.07.2015 | ||
SM | 01.07.2015 | ||
TR | 01.07.2015 | ||
IE | 26.07.2015 | ||
LU | 26.07.2015 | ||
FR | 01.09.2015 | ||
NO | 01.10.2015 | ||
GR | 02.10.2015 | ||
IS | 01.11.2015 | ||
PT | 02.11.2015 | ||
Former [2018/02] | HU | 26.07.2012 | |
AT | 01.07.2015 | ||
BE | 01.07.2015 | ||
BG | 01.07.2015 | ||
CY | 01.07.2015 | ||
CZ | 01.07.2015 | ||
DK | 01.07.2015 | ||
EE | 01.07.2015 | ||
ES | 01.07.2015 | ||
FI | 01.07.2015 | ||
HR | 01.07.2015 | ||
IT | 01.07.2015 | ||
LT | 01.07.2015 | ||
LV | 01.07.2015 | ||
MC | 01.07.2015 | ||
MT | 01.07.2015 | ||
NL | 01.07.2015 | ||
PL | 01.07.2015 | ||
RO | 01.07.2015 | ||
RS | 01.07.2015 | ||
SE | 01.07.2015 | ||
SI | 01.07.2015 | ||
SK | 01.07.2015 | ||
SM | 01.07.2015 | ||
TR | 01.07.2015 | ||
IE | 26.07.2015 | ||
LU | 26.07.2015 | ||
FR | 01.09.2015 | ||
NO | 01.10.2015 | ||
GR | 02.10.2015 | ||
IS | 01.11.2015 | ||
PT | 02.11.2015 | ||
Former [2017/38] | HU | 26.07.2012 | |
AT | 01.07.2015 | ||
BE | 01.07.2015 | ||
BG | 01.07.2015 | ||
CY | 01.07.2015 | ||
CZ | 01.07.2015 | ||
DK | 01.07.2015 | ||
EE | 01.07.2015 | ||
ES | 01.07.2015 | ||
FI | 01.07.2015 | ||
HR | 01.07.2015 | ||
IT | 01.07.2015 | ||
LT | 01.07.2015 | ||
LV | 01.07.2015 | ||
MC | 01.07.2015 | ||
MT | 01.07.2015 | ||
NL | 01.07.2015 | ||
PL | 01.07.2015 | ||
RO | 01.07.2015 | ||
RS | 01.07.2015 | ||
SE | 01.07.2015 | ||
SI | 01.07.2015 | ||
SK | 01.07.2015 | ||
SM | 01.07.2015 | ||
TR | 01.07.2015 | ||
IE | 26.07.2015 | ||
FR | 01.09.2015 | ||
NO | 01.10.2015 | ||
GR | 02.10.2015 | ||
IS | 01.11.2015 | ||
PT | 02.11.2015 | ||
Former [2017/22] | AT | 01.07.2015 | |
BE | 01.07.2015 | ||
CZ | 01.07.2015 | ||
DK | 01.07.2015 | ||
EE | 01.07.2015 | ||
ES | 01.07.2015 | ||
FI | 01.07.2015 | ||
HR | 01.07.2015 | ||
IT | 01.07.2015 | ||
LT | 01.07.2015 | ||
LV | 01.07.2015 | ||
MC | 01.07.2015 | ||
MT | 01.07.2015 | ||
PL | 01.07.2015 | ||
RO | 01.07.2015 | ||
RS | 01.07.2015 | ||
SE | 01.07.2015 | ||
SI | 01.07.2015 | ||
SK | 01.07.2015 | ||
IE | 26.07.2015 | ||
FR | 01.09.2015 | ||
NO | 01.10.2015 | ||
GR | 02.10.2015 | ||
IS | 01.11.2015 | ||
PT | 02.11.2015 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 01.07.2015 | |
BE | 01.07.2015 | ||
CZ | 01.07.2015 | ||
DK | 01.07.2015 | ||
EE | 01.07.2015 | ||
ES | 01.07.2015 | ||
FI | 01.07.2015 | ||
HR | 01.07.2015 | ||
IT | 01.07.2015 | ||
LT | 01.07.2015 | ||
LV | 01.07.2015 | ||
MC | 01.07.2015 | ||
PL | 01.07.2015 | ||
RO | 01.07.2015 | ||
RS | 01.07.2015 | ||
SE | 01.07.2015 | ||
SI | 01.07.2015 | ||
SK | 01.07.2015 | ||
IE | 26.07.2015 | ||
FR | 01.09.2015 | ||
NO | 01.10.2015 | ||
GR | 02.10.2015 | ||
IS | 01.11.2015 | ||
PT | 02.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/50] | AT | 01.07.2015 | |
CZ | 01.07.2015 | ||
DK | 01.07.2015 | ||
EE | 01.07.2015 | ||
ES | 01.07.2015 | ||
FI | 01.07.2015 | ||
HR | 01.07.2015 | ||
IT | 01.07.2015 | ||
LT | 01.07.2015 | ||
LV | 01.07.2015 | ||
MC | 01.07.2015 | ||
PL | 01.07.2015 | ||
RO | 01.07.2015 | ||
RS | 01.07.2015 | ||
SE | 01.07.2015 | ||
SI | 01.07.2015 | ||
SK | 01.07.2015 | ||
IE | 26.07.2015 | ||
FR | 01.09.2015 | ||
NO | 01.10.2015 | ||
GR | 02.10.2015 | ||
IS | 01.11.2015 | ||
PT | 02.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 01.07.2015 | |
CZ | 01.07.2015 | ||
DK | 01.07.2015 | ||
EE | 01.07.2015 | ||
ES | 01.07.2015 | ||
FI | 01.07.2015 | ||
HR | 01.07.2015 | ||
IT | 01.07.2015 | ||
LT | 01.07.2015 | ||
LV | 01.07.2015 | ||
MC | 01.07.2015 | ||
PL | 01.07.2015 | ||
RO | 01.07.2015 | ||
RS | 01.07.2015 | ||
SE | 01.07.2015 | ||
SI | 01.07.2015 | ||
SK | 01.07.2015 | ||
IE | 26.07.2015 | ||
NO | 01.10.2015 | ||
GR | 02.10.2015 | ||
IS | 01.11.2015 | ||
PT | 02.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/33] | AT | 01.07.2015 | |
CZ | 01.07.2015 | ||
DK | 01.07.2015 | ||
EE | 01.07.2015 | ||
ES | 01.07.2015 | ||
FI | 01.07.2015 | ||
HR | 01.07.2015 | ||
IT | 01.07.2015 | ||
LT | 01.07.2015 | ||
LV | 01.07.2015 | ||
MC | 01.07.2015 | ||
PL | 01.07.2015 | ||
RO | 01.07.2015 | ||
RS | 01.07.2015 | ||
SE | 01.07.2015 | ||
SK | 01.07.2015 | ||
IE | 26.07.2015 | ||
NO | 01.10.2015 | ||
GR | 02.10.2015 | ||
IS | 01.11.2015 | ||
PT | 02.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/23] | AT | 01.07.2015 | |
CZ | 01.07.2015 | ||
DK | 01.07.2015 | ||
EE | 01.07.2015 | ||
ES | 01.07.2015 | ||
FI | 01.07.2015 | ||
HR | 01.07.2015 | ||
IT | 01.07.2015 | ||
LT | 01.07.2015 | ||
LV | 01.07.2015 | ||
MC | 01.07.2015 | ||
PL | 01.07.2015 | ||
RO | 01.07.2015 | ||
RS | 01.07.2015 | ||
SE | 01.07.2015 | ||
SK | 01.07.2015 | ||
NO | 01.10.2015 | ||
GR | 02.10.2015 | ||
IS | 01.11.2015 | ||
PT | 02.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 01.07.2015 | |
CZ | 01.07.2015 | ||
DK | 01.07.2015 | ||
EE | 01.07.2015 | ||
ES | 01.07.2015 | ||
FI | 01.07.2015 | ||
HR | 01.07.2015 | ||
IT | 01.07.2015 | ||
LT | 01.07.2015 | ||
LV | 01.07.2015 | ||
MC | 01.07.2015 | ||
PL | 01.07.2015 | ||
RS | 01.07.2015 | ||
SE | 01.07.2015 | ||
NO | 01.10.2015 | ||
GR | 02.10.2015 | ||
IS | 01.11.2015 | ||
PT | 02.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/21] | AT | 01.07.2015 | |
DK | 01.07.2015 | ||
ES | 01.07.2015 | ||
FI | 01.07.2015 | ||
HR | 01.07.2015 | ||
IT | 01.07.2015 | ||
LT | 01.07.2015 | ||
LV | 01.07.2015 | ||
MC | 01.07.2015 | ||
PL | 01.07.2015 | ||
RS | 01.07.2015 | ||
SE | 01.07.2015 | ||
NO | 01.10.2015 | ||
GR | 02.10.2015 | ||
IS | 01.11.2015 | ||
PT | 02.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | AT | 01.07.2015 | |
DK | 01.07.2015 | ||
ES | 01.07.2015 | ||
FI | 01.07.2015 | ||
HR | 01.07.2015 | ||
LT | 01.07.2015 | ||
LV | 01.07.2015 | ||
MC | 01.07.2015 | ||
PL | 01.07.2015 | ||
RS | 01.07.2015 | ||
SE | 01.07.2015 | ||
NO | 01.10.2015 | ||
GR | 02.10.2015 | ||
IS | 01.11.2015 | ||
PT | 02.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/18] | AT | 01.07.2015 | |
ES | 01.07.2015 | ||
FI | 01.07.2015 | ||
HR | 01.07.2015 | ||
LT | 01.07.2015 | ||
LV | 01.07.2015 | ||
MC | 01.07.2015 | ||
PL | 01.07.2015 | ||
RS | 01.07.2015 | ||
SE | 01.07.2015 | ||
NO | 01.10.2015 | ||
GR | 02.10.2015 | ||
IS | 01.11.2015 | ||
PT | 02.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/11] | AT | 01.07.2015 | |
ES | 01.07.2015 | ||
FI | 01.07.2015 | ||
HR | 01.07.2015 | ||
LT | 01.07.2015 | ||
LV | 01.07.2015 | ||
PL | 01.07.2015 | ||
RS | 01.07.2015 | ||
SE | 01.07.2015 | ||
NO | 01.10.2015 | ||
GR | 02.10.2015 | ||
IS | 01.11.2015 | ||
PT | 02.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | ES | 01.07.2015 | |
FI | 01.07.2015 | ||
HR | 01.07.2015 | ||
LT | 01.07.2015 | ||
LV | 01.07.2015 | ||
PL | 01.07.2015 | ||
RS | 01.07.2015 | ||
SE | 01.07.2015 | ||
NO | 01.10.2015 | ||
GR | 02.10.2015 | ||
IS | 01.11.2015 | ||
PT | 02.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | FI | 01.07.2015 | |
LT | 01.07.2015 | ||
LV | 01.07.2015 | ||
NO | 01.10.2015 | ||
GR | 02.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/08] | LT | 01.07.2015 | |
NO | 01.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | LT | 01.07.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5465036 (YASUHARA MASATERU [JP]) [A] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [A]US5034672 (SAKAMOTO KEIJI [JP], et al) [A] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [A]US2004232870 (MIZUKAMI YUUJI [JP]) [A] 1-4 * the whole document * | by applicant | JPS6295604 |