EP2574113 - SMART METER MEDIA ACCESS CONTROL (MAC) FOR SINGLE USER, MULTIPLE USER, MULTIPLE ACCESS, AND/OR MIMO WIRELESS COMMUNICATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2013/13] | Smart meter media access control (MAC) for single user, multiple user, multiple access, and/or mimo wireless communications | ||
[2017/21] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.07.2018 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 18.08.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.04.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Avago Technologies General IP (Singapore) Pte. Ltd. 1 Yishun Avenue 7 Singapore 768923 / SG | [2017/29] |
Former [2013/13] | For all designated states Broadcom Corporation 5300 California Avenue Irvine, CA 92617 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Amini, Peiman 555 W. Middlefield Road N103 Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | 02 /
Fischer, Matthew 1426 Meadow Lane Mountain View, CA 94040 / US | [2013/13] | Representative(s) | Jehle, Volker Armin Bosch Jehle Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Flüggenstrasse 13 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/13] | Jehle, Volker Armin Bosch Jehle Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Flüggenstrasse 13 80639 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12005530.6 | 30.07.2012 | [2013/13] | Priority number, date | US201161539357P | 26.09.2011 Original published format: US 201161539357 P | US201161539352P | 26.09.2011 Original published format: US 201161539352 P | US201213539194 | 29.06.2012 Original published format: US201213539194 | [2013/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2574113 | Date: | 27.03.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/13] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2574113 | Date: | 14.09.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2574113 | Date: | 20.09.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.08.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H04W52/02, H04W56/00 | [2017/19] | CPC: |
H04W56/0015 (EP,US);
H04W52/0216 (EP,KR,US);
H04B7/0413 (KR);
H04L67/12 (US);
H04W52/0229 (EP,KR,US);
Y02D30/70 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2013/13] | H04W52/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/16] |
Former [2013/13] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | MEDIENZUGANGSKONTROLLE (MAC) MIT INTELLIGENTEM MESSGERÄT FÜR EINZELBENUTZER-, MEHRFACHBENUTZER-, MEHRFACHZUGRIFF- UND/ODER DRAHTLOSE MIMO-KOMMUNIKATIONEN | [2017/21] | English: | SMART METER MEDIA ACCESS CONTROL (MAC) FOR SINGLE USER, MULTIPLE USER, MULTIPLE ACCESS, AND/OR MIMO WIRELESS COMMUNICATIONS | [2017/21] | French: | COMMANDE D'ACCÈS AU SUPPORT (MAC) D'UN COMPTEUR INTELLIGENT POUR COMMUNICATIONS À UTILISATEUR UNIQUE, À PLUSIEURS UTILISATEURS, À ACCÈS MULTIPLE ET/OU SANS FIL MIMO | [2017/21] |
Former [2013/13] | Medienzugangskontrolle (MAC) mit intelligentem Messgerät für Einzelbenutzer-, Mehrfachbenutzer-, Mehrfachzugriff- und/oder drahtlose MIMO-Kommunikationen | ||
Former [2013/13] | Smart meter media access control (MAC) for single user, multiple user, multiple access, and/or mimo wireless communications | ||
Former [2013/13] | Commande d'accès au support (MAC) d'un compteur intelligent pour communications à utilisateur unique, à plusieurs utilisateurs, à accès multiple et/ou sans fil MIMO | Examination procedure | 30.07.2012 | Examination requested [2013/13] | 31.08.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.12.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.04.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.08.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 04.08.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.08.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 31.08.2016 | Opposition(s) | 21.06.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.07.2012 | AL | 20.09.2017 | AT | 20.09.2017 | CY | 20.09.2017 | CZ | 20.09.2017 | DK | 20.09.2017 | EE | 20.09.2017 | ES | 20.09.2017 | FI | 20.09.2017 | HR | 20.09.2017 | IT | 20.09.2017 | LT | 20.09.2017 | LV | 20.09.2017 | MC | 20.09.2017 | MK | 20.09.2017 | NL | 20.09.2017 | PL | 20.09.2017 | PT | 20.09.2017 | RO | 20.09.2017 | RS | 20.09.2017 | SE | 20.09.2017 | SI | 20.09.2017 | SK | 20.09.2017 | SM | 20.09.2017 | TR | 20.09.2017 | BG | 20.12.2017 | NO | 20.12.2017 | GR | 21.12.2017 | IS | 20.01.2018 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 30.07.2012 | |
AT | 20.09.2017 | ||
CY | 20.09.2017 | ||
CZ | 20.09.2017 | ||
DK | 20.09.2017 | ||
EE | 20.09.2017 | ||
ES | 20.09.2017 | ||
FI | 20.09.2017 | ||
HR | 20.09.2017 | ||
IT | 20.09.2017 | ||
LT | 20.09.2017 | ||
LV | 20.09.2017 | ||
MC | 20.09.2017 | ||
MK | 20.09.2017 | ||
NL | 20.09.2017 | ||
PL | 20.09.2017 | ||
PT | 20.09.2017 | ||
RO | 20.09.2017 | ||
RS | 20.09.2017 | ||
SE | 20.09.2017 | ||
SI | 20.09.2017 | ||
SK | 20.09.2017 | ||
SM | 20.09.2017 | ||
TR | 20.09.2017 | ||
BG | 20.12.2017 | ||
NO | 20.12.2017 | ||
GR | 21.12.2017 | ||
IS | 20.01.2018 | ||
Former [2020/27] | HU | 30.07.2012 | |
AT | 20.09.2017 | ||
CZ | 20.09.2017 | ||
DK | 20.09.2017 | ||
EE | 20.09.2017 | ||
ES | 20.09.2017 | ||
FI | 20.09.2017 | ||
HR | 20.09.2017 | ||
IT | 20.09.2017 | ||
LT | 20.09.2017 | ||
LV | 20.09.2017 | ||
MC | 20.09.2017 | ||
NL | 20.09.2017 | ||
PL | 20.09.2017 | ||
PT | 20.09.2017 | ||
RO | 20.09.2017 | ||
RS | 20.09.2017 | ||
SE | 20.09.2017 | ||
SI | 20.09.2017 | ||
SK | 20.09.2017 | ||
SM | 20.09.2017 | ||
TR | 20.09.2017 | ||
BG | 20.12.2017 | ||
NO | 20.12.2017 | ||
GR | 21.12.2017 | ||
IS | 20.01.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AT | 20.09.2017 | |
CZ | 20.09.2017 | ||
DK | 20.09.2017 | ||
EE | 20.09.2017 | ||
ES | 20.09.2017 | ||
FI | 20.09.2017 | ||
HR | 20.09.2017 | ||
IT | 20.09.2017 | ||
LT | 20.09.2017 | ||
LV | 20.09.2017 | ||
MC | 20.09.2017 | ||
NL | 20.09.2017 | ||
PL | 20.09.2017 | ||
RO | 20.09.2017 | ||
RS | 20.09.2017 | ||
SE | 20.09.2017 | ||
SI | 20.09.2017 | ||
SK | 20.09.2017 | ||
SM | 20.09.2017 | ||
TR | 20.09.2017 | ||
BG | 20.12.2017 | ||
NO | 20.12.2017 | ||
GR | 21.12.2017 | ||
IS | 20.01.2018 | ||
Former [2019/15] | AT | 20.09.2017 | |
CZ | 20.09.2017 | ||
DK | 20.09.2017 | ||
EE | 20.09.2017 | ||
ES | 20.09.2017 | ||
FI | 20.09.2017 | ||
HR | 20.09.2017 | ||
IT | 20.09.2017 | ||
LT | 20.09.2017 | ||
LV | 20.09.2017 | ||
MC | 20.09.2017 | ||
NL | 20.09.2017 | ||
PL | 20.09.2017 | ||
RO | 20.09.2017 | ||
RS | 20.09.2017 | ||
SE | 20.09.2017 | ||
SI | 20.09.2017 | ||
SK | 20.09.2017 | ||
SM | 20.09.2017 | ||
BG | 20.12.2017 | ||
NO | 20.12.2017 | ||
GR | 21.12.2017 | ||
IS | 20.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 20.09.2017 | |
CZ | 20.09.2017 | ||
DK | 20.09.2017 | ||
EE | 20.09.2017 | ||
ES | 20.09.2017 | ||
FI | 20.09.2017 | ||
HR | 20.09.2017 | ||
IT | 20.09.2017 | ||
LT | 20.09.2017 | ||
LV | 20.09.2017 | ||
NL | 20.09.2017 | ||
PL | 20.09.2017 | ||
RO | 20.09.2017 | ||
RS | 20.09.2017 | ||
SE | 20.09.2017 | ||
SI | 20.09.2017 | ||
SK | 20.09.2017 | ||
SM | 20.09.2017 | ||
BG | 20.12.2017 | ||
NO | 20.12.2017 | ||
GR | 21.12.2017 | ||
IS | 20.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | AT | 20.09.2017 | |
CZ | 20.09.2017 | ||
DK | 20.09.2017 | ||
EE | 20.09.2017 | ||
ES | 20.09.2017 | ||
FI | 20.09.2017 | ||
HR | 20.09.2017 | ||
IT | 20.09.2017 | ||
LT | 20.09.2017 | ||
LV | 20.09.2017 | ||
NL | 20.09.2017 | ||
PL | 20.09.2017 | ||
RO | 20.09.2017 | ||
RS | 20.09.2017 | ||
SE | 20.09.2017 | ||
SK | 20.09.2017 | ||
SM | 20.09.2017 | ||
BG | 20.12.2017 | ||
NO | 20.12.2017 | ||
GR | 21.12.2017 | ||
IS | 20.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/24] | AT | 20.09.2017 | |
CZ | 20.09.2017 | ||
EE | 20.09.2017 | ||
ES | 20.09.2017 | ||
FI | 20.09.2017 | ||
HR | 20.09.2017 | ||
IT | 20.09.2017 | ||
LT | 20.09.2017 | ||
LV | 20.09.2017 | ||
NL | 20.09.2017 | ||
PL | 20.09.2017 | ||
RO | 20.09.2017 | ||
RS | 20.09.2017 | ||
SE | 20.09.2017 | ||
SK | 20.09.2017 | ||
SM | 20.09.2017 | ||
BG | 20.12.2017 | ||
NO | 20.12.2017 | ||
GR | 21.12.2017 | ||
IS | 20.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 20.09.2017 | |
CZ | 20.09.2017 | ||
EE | 20.09.2017 | ||
ES | 20.09.2017 | ||
FI | 20.09.2017 | ||
HR | 20.09.2017 | ||
LT | 20.09.2017 | ||
LV | 20.09.2017 | ||
NL | 20.09.2017 | ||
PL | 20.09.2017 | ||
RO | 20.09.2017 | ||
RS | 20.09.2017 | ||
SE | 20.09.2017 | ||
SK | 20.09.2017 | ||
BG | 20.12.2017 | ||
NO | 20.12.2017 | ||
GR | 21.12.2017 | ||
IS | 20.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/21] | CZ | 20.09.2017 | |
FI | 20.09.2017 | ||
HR | 20.09.2017 | ||
LT | 20.09.2017 | ||
LV | 20.09.2017 | ||
NL | 20.09.2017 | ||
RS | 20.09.2017 | ||
SE | 20.09.2017 | ||
BG | 20.12.2017 | ||
NO | 20.12.2017 | ||
GR | 21.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/15] | FI | 20.09.2017 | |
HR | 20.09.2017 | ||
LT | 20.09.2017 | ||
LV | 20.09.2017 | ||
NL | 20.09.2017 | ||
RS | 20.09.2017 | ||
SE | 20.09.2017 | ||
BG | 20.12.2017 | ||
NO | 20.12.2017 | ||
GR | 21.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/12] | FI | 20.09.2017 | |
HR | 20.09.2017 | ||
LT | 20.09.2017 | ||
LV | 20.09.2017 | ||
RS | 20.09.2017 | ||
SE | 20.09.2017 | ||
BG | 20.12.2017 | ||
NO | 20.12.2017 | ||
GR | 21.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | FI | 20.09.2017 | |
HR | 20.09.2017 | ||
LT | 20.09.2017 | ||
RS | 20.09.2017 | ||
SE | 20.09.2017 | ||
BG | 20.12.2017 | ||
NO | 20.12.2017 | ||
GR | 21.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | FI | 20.09.2017 | |
LT | 20.09.2017 | ||
SE | 20.09.2017 | ||
NO | 20.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/08] | FI | 20.09.2017 | |
LT | 20.09.2017 | ||
NO | 20.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/07] | LT | 20.09.2017 | |
NO | 20.12.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2007161364 (SURINENI SHRAVAN K [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0009] , [0 44] , [0 50] , [0 61] , [0 62] *; | [Y]WO2011087826 (INTERDIGITAL PATENT HOLDINGS [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * paragraphs [0003] , [0 27] , [0 28] , [0 67] , [0 68] , [0 95] , [0 98]; figures 1b, 3; claim 5 *; | [A] - LIN WANG ET AL, "Power saving mechanism consideration for 802.11ah framework ; 11-11-1204-01-00ah-power-saving-mechanism-consideration-for-802-11ah-framework", IEEE SA MENTOR; 11-11-1204-01-00AH-POWER-SAVING-MECHANISM-CONSIDERATION-FOR-802-11AH-FRAMEWORK, IEEE-SA MENTOR, PISCATAWAY, NJ USA, (20110919), vol. 802.11ah, no. 1, pages 1 - 9, XP068037318 [A] 1,2,6,7,9,10 * the whole document * |