EP2543657 - Methods for the synthesis of acrylic acid and derivatives from fumaric acid [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.06.2017 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.06.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.08.2017 [2017/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Genomatica, Inc. 4757 Nexus Center Drive San Diego, CA 92121 / US | [2014/52] |
Former [2013/33] | For all designated states Genomatica, Inc. 10520 Wateridge Circle San Diego, CA 92121 / US | ||
Former [2013/02] | For all designated states Genomatica, Inc. 5405 Morehouse Drive, Suite 210 San Diego, CA 92121 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Burk, Mark, J. 12634 Intermezzo Way San Diego CA 92130 / US | 02 /
Pharkya, Priti 11125 Caminito Alvarez San Diego CA 92126 / US | 03 /
Van Dien, Stephen, J. c/o Gonomatica, Inc. 10520 Waterbridge Circle San Diego CA 92121 / US | 04 /
Burgard, Anthony, P. 237 Walker Crossing Bellefonte PA 16823 / US | 05 /
Schilling, Christopher, H. 12541-G El Camino Real San Diego CA 92130 / US | [2013/02] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/02] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte Grafinger Straße 2 81671 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12005853.2 | 08.08.2008 | [2013/02] | Priority number, date | US20070955321P | 10.08.2007 Original published format: US 955321 P | [2013/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2543657 | Date: | 09.01.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/02] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2543657 | Date: | 14.08.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.07.2013 | Classification | IPC: | C07C51/347, C07C51/353, C07C57/04, C07C57/15, C07C67/08, C07C67/333, C07C69/60, C07C69/54, C12P7/40, C12P7/46, C12P7/62, C07C57/08 | [2013/33] | CPC: |
C07C51/353 (EP,US);
C07C51/38 (US);
C07C57/04 (EP,US);
C07C67/08 (EP,US);
C07C67/32 (US);
C07C67/333 (EP,US);
C12P7/40 (EP,US);
C12P7/46 (EP,US);
C12P7/62 (EP,US);
Y02P20/10 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C07C51/353, C07C57/04 (EP,US);
C07C67/08, C07C69/60 (US,EP);
C07C67/333, C07C69/54 (US,EP)
|
Former IPC [2013/02] | C07C51/347, C07C51/353, C07C57/04, C07C57/15, C07C67/08, C07C67/333, C07C69/60, C07C69/54, C12P7/40, C12P7/46, C12P7/62 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2013/02] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Synthese von Acrylsäure und Derivaten aus Fumarsäure | [2013/02] | English: | Methods for the synthesis of acrylic acid and derivatives from fumaric acid | [2013/02] | French: | Procédés pour la synthèse d'acide acrylique et dérivés à partir de l'acide fumarique | [2013/02] | Examination procedure | 14.02.2014 | Examination requested [2014/13] | 30.05.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.03.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/31] | 28.03.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2017/31] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP08835789.2 / EP2188243 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20080835789) is 17.08.2010 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 30.05.2014 | Request for further processing filed | 30.05.2014 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 13.06.2014 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2016 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2004062763 (CARGILL INC [US], et al) [X] 1 * example -; claim - *; | [A]EP1075482 (BASF AG [DE]) [A] 1-5 * paragraph [0027] *; | [Y]WO2006031424 (RICE UNIVERSITY [US]) [Y] 1-5 * the whole document *; | [AP]WO2008024023 (LTD LIABILITY COMPANY UNITED R [RU], et al) [AP] 1-5 * abstract *; | [A] - FOMINE S ET AL, "Cross-metathesis of dimethyl maleate and ethylene catalyzed by second generation ruthenium carbene complexes: B3LYP and MPW1K comparison study", JOURNAL OF ORGANOMETALLIC CHEMISTRY, ELSEVIER-SEQUOIA S.A. LAUSANNE, CH, vol. 691, no. 24-25, doi:10.1016/J.JORGANCHEM.2006.07.039, ISSN 0022-328X, (20061201), pages 5189 - 5196, (20061201), XP028048250 [A] 1-5 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jorganchem.2006.07.039 | [A] - CHATTERJEE A K ET AL, "A GENERAL MODEL FOR SELECTIVITY IN OLEFIN CROSS METATHESIS", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, US, (20030101), vol. 125, no. 37, doi:10.1021/JA0214882, ISSN 0002-7863, pages 11360 - 11370, XP009060868 [A] 1-5 *scheme 6* DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ja0214882 | [Y] - KACLIKOVA E ET AL, "Fumaric acid overproduction in yeast mutants deficient in fumarase", FEMS MICROBIOLOGY LETTERS, BLACKWELL PUBLISHING, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 91, no. 2, doi:10.1111/J.1574-6968.1992.TB05192.X, ISSN 0378-1097, (19920301), pages 101 - 106, (19920301), XP023921886 [Y] 1-5 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1574-6968.1992.tb05192.x | [Y] - Todd Werpy and Gene Petersen, editors, "Top Value Added Chemicals from BiomassVolume I-Results of Screening for Potential Candidates from Sugars and Synthesis Gas", (200408), pages 1 - 67, URL: http://www1.eere.energy.gov/biomass/pdfs/35523.pdf, (20110408), XP002632221 [Y] 1-5 * figure 3; tables 2,3 * * page 22 - page 23 * | [A] - REAXYS, Elsevier Properties SA, XP002632222 [A] 1-5 * RX-ID: 715357 and 5957085 * | [ ] - VOLMAR, COMPTES RENDUS HEBDOMADAIRES DES SEANCES DE L'ACADEMIE DES SCIENCES, (1925), vol. 181, page 467 | by applicant | US2002012939 | US2003224363 | US2004029149 | US2004072723 | US2003059792 | US2002168654 | US2004009466 | US7127379 | US2002040123 | - FROST, J.W., "Redefining chemical manufacture", IND. BIOTECHNOL., (2005), vol. 1, doi:doi:10.1089/ind.2005.1.23, pages 23 - 24, XP001539123 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1089/ind.2005.1.23 | - GRUBBS, R.H., "Olefin Metathesis", TETRAHEDRON, (2004), vol. 60, pages 7117 - 40 | - BAI ET AL., ORG. BIOMOL. CHEM., (2005), vol. 3, pages 4139 - 42 | - GIBSON ET AL., CHEM. COMM., (1997), pages 1107 - 08 | - CHATTERJEE ET AL., J AM. CHEM. SOC., (2003), vol. 125, pages 11360 - 70 | - FOMINE, S.; TLENKOPATCHEV, M.A., J ORG. CHEM., (2006), vol. 691, pages 5189 - 96 | - LLOYD-JONES ET AL., CHEMIE, INT. ED., (2005), vol. 44, pages 7442 - 7 | - DIAS ET AL., J AM. CHEM. SOC., (1997), vol. 119, pages 3887 - 3897 | - TEBBE ET AL., J AM. CHEM. SOC., (1979), vol. 101, page 5075 | - WENGROVIUS ET AL., J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (1980), vol. 102, page 4515 | - OSBORN ET AL., CHEM. COMMUN., (1980), pages 431 - 432 | - PINE ET AL., J AM. CHEM. SOC., (1980), vol. 102, page 3270 | - HOWARD ET AL., J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (1980), vol. 102, page 6876 | - KRESS ET AL., J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (1987), vol. 109, page 899 | - WENGROVIUS ET AL., J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (1980), vol. 102, pages 4515 - 4516 | - QUIGNARD ET AL., ANGEW. CHEM. INT. ED. ENGL., (1992), vol. 31, no. 5, pages 628 - 631 | - SCHROCK ET AL., J AM. CHEM. SOC., (1988), vol. 110, pages 1423 - 1435 | - LYNN ET AL., J AM. CHEM. SOC., (1996), vol. 118, pages 784 - 90 | - LYNN ET AL., J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (1998), vol. 120, pages 1627 - 28 | - BURGARD ET AL., BIOTECHNOL BIOENG, (2003), vol. 84, pages 647 - 57 | - SCHILLING ET AL., J THEOR. BIOL., (2000), vol. 203, pages 229 - 248 | - SCHILLING ET AL., BIOTECH. BIOENG., (2000), vol. 71, pages 286 - 306 | - SCHILLING ET AL., BIOTECH. PROG., (1999), vol. 15, pages 288 - 295 | - VARMA; PALSSON, BIOTECH. BIOENG, (1994), vol. 12, pages 994 - 998 | - FELL; SMALL, J BIOCHEM., (1986), vol. 138, pages 781 - 786 | - MAJEWSKI; DOMACH, BIOTECH. BIOENG., (1990), vol. 35, pages 732 - 738 | - VANROLLEGHEM ET AL., BIOTECH. PROG., (1996), vol. 12, pages 434 - 448 | - EDWARDS; PALSSON, PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI., (2000), vol. 97, pages 5528 - 5533 | - EDWARDS; PALSSON, J. BIO. CHEM., (1999), vol. 274, pages 17410 - 17416 | - EDWARDS ET AL., NATURE BIOTECH., (2001), vol. 19, pages 125 - 130 | WO2002US00660 | WO2003US18838 |