Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN104619942B | Global Dossier | 15.08.2017 | B | CN104619942 | 13.05.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2013EP66780 | 12.08.2013 | EP12005895 | 16.08.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR112015003247 | 04.07.2017 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2013EP66780 | 12.08.2013 | EP12005895 | 16.08.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EA026626 | 28.04.2017 | B1 | EA201590376 | 29.05.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2013EP66780 | 12.08.2013 | EP12005895 | 16.08.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | UA114422 | 12.06.2017 | C2 | Priority number | Date | WO2013EP66780 | 12.08.2013 | EP12005895 | 16.08.2012 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2014026942 | Global Dossier | 20.02.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP12005895 | 16.08.2012 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2698492 | Global Dossier | 10.10.2018 | B1 | EP2698492 | 19.02.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP12005895 | 16.08.2012 |